|
|
Litigation Releases Archives 1996
Archive of older Litigation Releases available include:
Fourth Quarter | Third Quarter | Second Quarter | First Quarter
Additional Archives
2009 | 2008 | 2007 | 2006 | 2005 | 2004 | 2003 | 2002 | 2001 | 2000 | 1999 | 1998 | 1997 | 1996 | 1995
Release No. |
Date |
Action |
Fourth Quarter |
LR-15202 | Dec. 30, 1996 | Nicholas A. Rudi, Public Capital Advisors, Inc.,
Joseph C. Salema, George L. Tuttle, Jr., and Alexander S.Williams | LR-15201 | Dec. 30, 1996 | Theta Group L.L.C., Shadowstone Partners I,
L.L.C., Scott S. Bell and R. Scot Rubel | LR-15200 | Dec. 30, 1996 | Marguerite Lenfest's | LR-15199 | Dec. 26, 1996 | Richard M. Simonson | LR-15198 | Dec. 26, 1996 | Rehan Malik | LR-15197 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Oscar William Olson, Jr. | LR-15196 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Blythe Olin Selden and Shiawassee Shores
Retirement Park, Inc. | LR-15195 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Lynn Roy Oyler | LR-15194 | Dec. 19,
1996 | Lancaster Broadcasting Partners, Raymond P.
O'Connor and R.P. O'Connor and Associates, Inc. | LR-15193 | Dec. 19, 1996 | Mark S. Ferber | LR-15192 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Michael Donald McGahee | LR-15191 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Michael R. Warren | LR-15190 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Parris H. Holmes, Jr. | LR-15189 | Dec. 18, 1996 | Morris Dabah, Robert Reiss, Stanley A.
Greenstein and David Keery | LR-15188 | Dec. 16, 1996 | Michael Levine | LR-15187 |
Dec. 16, 1996 | Bernard F. Bradstreet and Thomas E. Campbell | LR-15186 | Dec. 12, 1996
| Hugh Keith and Stephen Wolis | LR-15185 | Dec. 12, 1996 | Nancy Ellis Davis, Jack Weinstein, Nancy
Weinstein, Adobe Galleries Inc. d/b/a Tower of Jewels, Loretta
Davis, Barclay Davis, William Daw, Sonya Daw, Mary Jane Hubbard,
David Goldstein, Starlog Franchise Corp., Hope Associates,
L.L.C., Michael Michaelson, Raymond J. Markman, Herman Rush, Mark
Savel, George Holsten, J.S. Holdings, Inc., Jeffrey Szur, Lynda
Lou Kane, also known as Lynda Lou Kraft, and Investors
Associates, Inc. | LR-15184 | Dec. 12, 1996 | Georgia Pooley Helliwell | LR-15183 | Dec. 11,
1996 | Environmental Chemicals Group, Inc., Curtis A.
Younts, Jr., Calvin Shenkir, Jr. and Calvin Moerbe | LR-15182 |
Dec. 10, 1996 | Met Capital Corporation and Jeffrey Hackman | LR-15181 | Dec. 9, 1996 | R. E. Anderson Cain | LR-15180 | Dec. 9, 1996 | Charles Brumfield | LR-15179 | Dec. 6, 1996 | Thomas S. Mackie, Jr. | LR-15178 | Dec. 6, 1996 | Pleasure Time, Inc., Minette Acra Kelly, Minette
Acra Kelly (Acra), and Richard A. Welch | LR-15177 |
Dec. 5, 1996 | Gerald P. Hirsch and Churchill Securities, Inc. | LR-15176 | Dec.
4, 1996 | Gerald P. Hirsch and Churchill Securities, Inc. | LR-15175 | Dec.
3, 1996 | Robert C. Cowan and Cowan Asset Management, Inc. | LR-15174 | Dec. 3, 1996 | William Dennis Brosseau | LR-15173 | Dec. 3, 1996 | Randy Glad and Howard Ray | LR-15172 | Dec. 3, 1996 | Paul B. Kravitz | LR-15171 | Dec.
2, 1996 | Brett L. Bouchy and Richard C. Whelan | LR-15170 | Dec. 2, 1996 | Mitchell S. Rosenthal | LR-15169 | Dec. 2, 1996 | Howard S. Hoover, Jr. | LR-15168 | Nov. 26, 1996 | Gateways to Space, Inc. | LR-15167 | Nov. 26,
1996 | American Education Corporation | LR-15166 | Nov. 25, 1996 | Hyannis Trading Advisors, Inc., Jeremiah J. Hegarty and
Michael P. Hegarty | LR-15164 | Nov. 21, 1996 | Montedison, S.p.A. | LR-15163 | Nov.
21, 1996 | Joseph A. Bremont, Comcar International, Ltd.,
Commercial Capital Resources, Inc., and Jimmy B. Sanchez | LR-15162 | Nov. 20, 1996 | Robert Clifford Cowan | LR-15161 | Nov. 20, 1996 | Philip S. Sindler | LR-15160 | Nov. 20, 1996 | CS First Boston Corporation, Jerry L. Nowlin and
Douglas S. Montague | LR-15159 | Nov. 19, 1996 | Teresa V. Fernandez | LR-15158 | Nov. 14, 1996 | Richard Beckwitt | LR-15157 | Nov. 13, 1996 | Christopher K. Bagdasarian | LR-15156 | Nov. 13,
1996 | Peter Buccheri and David S. Weil | LR-15155 | Nov. 12, 1996 | Peter Appleton Jones | LR-15154 | Nov. 7, 1996 | Robert C.Cowan, CS Investments Trust, and Cowan
Asset Management, Inc. | LR-15153 |
Nov. 7, 1996 | Charles O. Huttoe, Huttoe & Associates, Inc.,
Word Corporation, National Trading Services, Inc., Karen
Purvis, Tammy Jo Perkins, Josephine Brooks, SGA Goldstar Research
Inc., Theodore R. Melcher, Jr., Shannon B. Terry, Systems of
Excellence, Inc., Alpha Securities Ltd., and Dunbar Holdings Ltd | LR-15152 | Nov. 7, 1996 | W. Ralph Wills, III and ProFinancial Advisors,
Inc. | LR-15151 | Nov. 5, 1996 | Frederick Aug.us Moran | LR-15150 | Nov. 5, 1996 | Consumer Plus, L.C., Palmer Research and
Development and David R. Palmer | LR-15149 | Nov.
5, 1996 | Shaner & Company, Inc., and Mark Shaner | LR-15148 | Nov. 5, 1996 | George J. Handgis | LR-15147 | Nov. 4, 1996 | Gary V. Lewellyn | LR-15146 | Nov. 4, 1996 | Paul A. Bilzerian | LR-15145 | Nov. 4, 1996 | John Glen Kendall | LR-15144 | Nov. 4,
1996 | Michael W. Crow and Peter F. Kuebler | LR-15143 | Nov. 1, 1996 | Shahryar Soroosh | LR-15142 | Nov. 1, 1996 | Michael J. Colello | LR-15141 | Oct. 30, 1996 | Shahryar Soroosh | LR-15140 | Oct. 29, 1996 | John F. D'Acquisto, D'Acquisto Financial Group,
Inc., Doubleday Trust and Thomas F. Goodman | LR-15139 | Oct. 29, 1996 | Scott A. Frye | LR-15138 | Oct. 29, 1996 | Frank S. Colin | LR-15137 | Oct. 29, 1996 | Balance for Life, Inc., and Richard K. Steele,
Sr. | LR-15136 | Oct. 25, 1996 | Joseph Polichemi, Lyle Neal, Oscar William Olson,
Jr., and Charles Padilla | LR-15135 |
Oct. 24, 1996 | Harry Watson, Tracy French and Deltaur Partners | LR-15134 |
Oct. 23, 1996 | Western Executive Group, Inc., Cash Systems USA,
Inc., Charles R. Rietz, Robert R. Parrish and Robert J. Struth | LR-15133 | Oct. 22, 1996 | Darrell Sandy Marsh | LR-15132 | Oct. 22, 1996 | Benjamin Franklin Bush, III and Ben Bush
Investment Management, Inc. | LR-15131 | Oct. 22, 1996 | James M. Gleason, Michael C. Booth, Timothy M.
Choquette and Jeff R. Urbach | LR-15130 | Oct. 21, 1996 | James G. Freeman | LR-15129 | Oct. 21, 1996 | Don Haywood Pace | LR-15128 | Oct. 21,
1996 | Mark J. Aronds and Michael J. Garzoni | LR-15127 | Oct.
18, 1996 | Berbun Associates, Inc. and Donald Bunsis | LR-15126 |
Oct. 18, 1996 | Michael Jonsson and Objective Invest Holding S.A. | LR-15125 | Oct. 16, 1996 | Peter M. Harrington | LR-15124 | Oct. 16, 1996 | Healthcare Services Group, Inc., Daniel P.
McCartney, Thomas A. Cook and Melvyn B. Mason | LR-15123 | Oct. 15, 1996 | George A. Rotelli | LR-15122 | Oct. 15, 1996 | Kent Ahrens | LR-15121 | Oct. 15, 1996 | Western Executive Group, Inc., Cash Systems USA,
Inc., Charles R. Rietz, Robert R. Parrish, Robert J. Struth and R.
Stephen Edgel | LR-15120 | Oct. 11, 1996 | Bruce Franklin | LR-15119 |
Oct. 11, 1996 | Frank P. Zitkevitz and Charles S. Christopher | LR-15118 | Oct. 11, 1996 | James W. Adams | LR-15117 | Oct. 11,
1996 | James S. Faller, II, and Rolan Colon | LR-15116 | Oct.
9,
1996 | Richard Bertoli and Richard Cannistraro | LR-15115 | Oct. 9, 1996 | Frederick L. Cameron | LR-15114 | Oct. 9, 1996 | Axiom Security Solutions, Inc. and Paul L.
Parshall | LR-15113 | Oct. 8, 1996 | Robert F. Doviak, II | LR-15112 | Oct. 7, 1996 | James Russell Cleveland | LR-15111 |
Oct. 7, 1996 | Kenneth E. Edwards, Roger S. Chedester, Donald E.
Luna, A.R. Grant Morehouse and First American Companies, Inc. | LR-15110 | Oct. 4,
1996 | Anthony Sarivola and Donna Sarivola | LR-15109 | Oct. 4, 1996 | Grant R. Curtis, Leo J. Mangan, Timothy M. Masley,
Pedro Gomez, Ray Irangy, James W. Nearen | LR-15108 | Oct. 3, 1996 | Michael Tropiano | LR-15107 | Oct. 3, 1996 | Ronald A. Monzione, James D. Rocco and Arthur R.
Lapka | LR-15106 | Oct. 3, 1996 | Western Executive Group, Inc., Cash Systems USA, Inc., Charles R. Rietz; Robert R. Parrish, Robert J. Struth, R. Stephen Edgel; | LR-15105 | Oct. 2, 1996 | Gary W. Berus, Patricia S. Gale, Robert W. Harper
(Harper) and Nancy A. Swoffer | LR-15104 | Oct.
2, 1996 | Joseph P. Medsker, Unified Financial Services
Agency Corp. and Unified Financial Services Advisory Corp. | LR-15103 | Oct. 2, 1996 | John W. Walsh, Jr., InterCap Monitoring
Corporation, Security Data Group, Inc., InterCap Monitoring Income
Funds IV-A, B, C, and D, Ltd., InterCap Monitoring Income Funds V
and V-B, Ltd | LR-15102 |
Oct.
1, 1996 | The AppleTree Companies, Inc., Michael H.
Salit, David B. Lobel, Paul B. Kravitz and W. Scott Long III | LR-15101 | Oct. 1, 1996 | Benjamin Franklin Bush, III and Ben Bush
Investment Management, Inc. | LR-15100 | Oct. 3,
1996 | Casey Abe, Calbert Abe, Patricia Abe, Denise Abe
F/K/A/ Denise Miyasato, Gladys Tengan and Lena Lynch |
Third Quarter |
LR-15099 |
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Nu-Life International
of Georgia, Inc. and Gene Arthur |
LR-15098
|
Sep. 30, 1996 |
David E. Freitag |
LR-15097
|
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Surendra Gupta, Bhasker
B.Rao and R. Ramana Penumarty |
LR-15096
|
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Axiom Security
Solutions, Inc. and Paul L. Parshall |
LR-15095 |
Sep. 30, 1996 |
John G. Bennett, Jr. |
LR-15094 |
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Ted E. Mong, Liberty
Bell Association, Inc., and McKenzie Matthew, Inc. |
LR-15093
|
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Bollinger
Industries, Inc., Glenn Bollinger and Ronald Bollinger |
LR-15092 |
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Seaboard Investment
Advisers, Inc., and Eugene W. Hansen |
LR-15091
|
Sep. 30, 1996 |
Robert D. Poirier,
Robert J. Palm, James R. Vincent and Richard E. Wensel |
LR-15090
|
Sep. 30, 1996 |
M.T.L. International
Finance Inc., Equity Action Inc., John K. Robinson, Leon Howard and
Harry Walker |
LR-15089
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Danny Sterk |
LR-15088
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Betty Ann Rubin et al. |
LR-15087 |
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Barry Smith, Paul
Iwankowski and Tri-Star Communications, Inc. |
LR-15086
|
Sep. 27 1996 |
Gerard A. Spataro |
LR-15085
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
CNC Trading Company,
Inc., Charles N. Cugliari, Cindy J. Myers, Frank R. Sommerer, and Marvin
Sherman and Oscar R. Sierra |
LR-15084 |
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Gordon L. Hall and R.L.
Porter |
LR-15083
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Russell S. Smith,
James O. Foust, John E. Burse and James E. Fisher |
LR-15082 |
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Atlantic Capital
Corporation, Wall Street Marketing, Inc., Pullman Publications, Inc.,
Stephen DeCesare, Mark Missler, Patrick Kephart, Howard Jenkins, Scott
Mijares, Robert Thomas Beatty, Vincent St. Clair Beatty, Michael
Cardascia, David Scott Rossman, Adrian Wilson, Timothy B. Daley, and
David M. Connochi |
LR-15081
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Empower
Telecommunications Corporation, William H.B. Chan, Osvaldo N. Lorenzetti
and Donald E. Whorl |
LR-15080
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Pension &
Retirement Services Company and William Barney Thomas |
LR-15079
|
Sep. 27, 1996 |
Daniel E.
Goodman |
LR-15078 |
Sep. 26, 1996 |
Kathy S. Kingmore |
LR-15077 |
Sep. 26, 1996 |
Richard T. Taylor |
LR-15076 |
Sep. 26, 1996 |
Nir Kantor and Hanan
Waizman |
LR-15075
|
Sep. 26, 1996 |
Christopher Kent
Bagadasarian and Sam Lance White |
LR-15074
|
Sep. 26, 1996 |
Internet Wireless
Communications, Inc., California Financial Services, Inc., One Touch
Marketing, Inc., Commonwealth Communications Group, Capital Resources
Group, Inc., John C. Trimpin, Richard B. Parnell, John Larson and
MichaelGreen |
LR-15072 |
Sep. 26, 1996 |
Wye Resources, Inc. and
Rehan Malik |
LR-15071
|
Sep. 25, 1996 |
Michael W.
Crow |
LR-15070 |
Sep. 25, 1996 |
Selheimer & Co., and
Perry A. Selheimer |
LR-15069 |
Sep. 25, 1996 |
Bernard F. Bradstreet,
Thomas E. Campbell and Debra J. Murray |
LR-15068
|
Sep. 25, 1996 |
Healthcare Services
Group, Inc.,Daniel P. McCartney, Thomas A. Cook and Melvyn B.
Mason |
LR-15067 |
Sep. 25, 1996 |
Thomas J. Fox |
LR-15066
|
Sep. 24, 1996 |
Robert McClernon |
LR-15065
|
Sep. 24, 1996 |
Nilda Zim |
LR-15064 |
Sep. 23, 1996 |
Offshore Financial
Corporation, William R. Brosseau, Kenneth W. McKay and Charles E. Rose,
and North American Ventures, Inc.,Ken McKay Investment Company, Inc.,
Prodigal International, Inc.,and Tamara M. Wagner |
LR-15063 |
Sep. 23, 1996 |
Kimberly D. Goodman |
LR-15062 |
Sep. 23, 1996 |
Donald John Tyson and
Frederick Lee Cameron |
LR-15061
|
Sep. 23, 1996 |
Futrex, Inc., Futrex
Medical Instrumentation, Inc. and Robert D. Rosenthal |
LR-15060 |
Sep. 20, 1996 |
Direct Participation
Services, Inc. d/b/a GovernmentFinancial, Jeffrey A. Lobel, William
Rossi United Avalon Group, LTD. and Frank M. Naft |
LR-15059
|
Sep. 20, 1996 |
Boston Acceptance
Corporation d/b/a First LendersIndemnity Company, Jonathan P. Boston
f/k/a John R. Marsella and James A. Cunningham |
LR-15058
|
Sep. 20, 1996 |
Neil F.
Garfield |
LR-15057 |
Sep. 19,
1996 |
John P. Acord, Michael
L. Medkiff, Great WesternManagement Corp., Douglas H. Kennett, Equity
Assurance Corp., SeanOrtega, and Susan M. Hall |
LR-15056 |
Sep.19, 1996 |
Robert Reed Rogers and
Gregory Armijo |
LR-15055 |
Sep.19, 1996 |
Robert Pierce,
Carrie Williams Pierce, Pierce andInvestments Co., a/k/a Pierce
Investments & Co., Inc. |
LR-15054 |
Sep. 18, 1996 |
Linda King |
LR-15053 |
Sep. 17, 1996 |
Michael Rosoff |
LR-15052 |
Sep. 16, 1996 |
Wincanton
Corporation |
LR-15051
|
Sep. 16, 1996 |
Duane V. Midgley |
LR-15050 |
Sep. 17, 1996 |
H. Ralph
Sylvester,Donald R. Krueger and John C.Hawver |
LR-15049 |
Sep. 16, 1996 |
James Herman O'Hagan |
LR-15048
|
Sep. 16, 1996
|
Anthony Escobar |
LR-15047 |
Sep. 16, 1996 |
Domenick Schina |
LR-15046 |
Sep. 16, 1996 |
Leonard S. Sands, First
Pacific Bancorp, andPacVen, Inc. |
LR-15045 |
Sep. 16,
1996 |
Certain Purchasers of
Call Options of Duracell |
LR-15044 |
Sep. 12, 1996 |
Tina M. Applegate,
Douglas A. Burnip, Dennis A.Dunlap, Stephen M. Jordan, Miguel A. Lucas
and Larry R. Ryan |
LR-15043 |
Sep. 12, 1996 |
Edmund M. Autuori |
LR-15042 |
Sep. 12, 1996 |
Donald B. Spencer and
IVT Systems, Inc. |
LR-15041 |
Sep. 12, 1996 |
William R. Palmer
Financial Services of America,Inc. |
LR-15040
|
Sep. 12, 1996 |
Mary Ann Shank, Kenneth
R. Roop, Donald M.Schwartz and Mildred Shank |
LR-15039 |
Sep. 12, 1996 |
Stephen R. Parker |
LR-15038 |
Sep. 12, 1996 |
Tudor Investment
Corporation |
LR-15037 |
Sep. 11, 1996 |
Trans-American Ostrich
Traders, Inc., Larry R.Earp, and David P. Silver |
LR-15036 |
Sep. 6,1996 |
William Scott Smith,
William G. Smith, AnthonySkulski, Alicia Grady Skulski and Raul N.
Rodriguez |
LR-15035 |
Sep. 5, 1996 |
Robert J.
Bretschneider |
LR-15034 |
Sep. 5,
1996 |
William R. Palmer and
Financial Services ofAmerica, Inc. |
LR-15033 |
Sep. 5, 1996 |
Abul Bhuiyan, Nilkanth
Patel, Hasmukh Patel, JanakC. Patel, Janak M. Patel and Kanubhai
Patel |
LR-15032 |
Sep. 5, 1996 |
Ernest W. Grendi |
LR-15031 |
Sep. 4, 1996 |
Robert Polansky,John
Capps and Anthony Guerriero |
LR-15030
|
Sep. 4, 1996 |
Gary L. Hamby and Gary
B. Ross |
LR-15029 |
Sep. 3, 1996 |
John Allen Hall, Jr.,
and Roger Alan Bishop |
LR-15028 |
Sep. 3,
1996 |
Jeffrey S. Norton |
LR-15027 |
Aug. 29, 1996 |
James Zimmerman and
Old Naples Securities, Inc. |
LR-15026 |
Aug. 29, 1996 |
John Fiebelkorn |
LR-15025 |
Aug. 28, 1996 |
Marcia Ann Coppertino |
LR-15024
|
Aug. 26, 1996 |
John
Jackson |
LR-15023
|
Aug. 23, 1996 |
Ronald Margolin |
LR-15022 |
Aug. 22, 1996 |
Laurence M.
Brown |
LR-15021
|
Aug. 22, 1996 |
Robert L. Shull,
Leonard E. Fiessel and Colleen A.Fiessel |
LR-15020 |
Aug. 23, 1996 |
Ulbery
Vermogensverwaltungs A.G.,BenjaminWeiss, Fasan Anstalt, Axteria
Establishment, Anstalt Ducata, AnstaltNifur, Gregory Stainow, Dornford
Holdings Ltd., and Melilla BusinessCorp. |
LR-15019
|
Aug. 20, 1996 |
Karl L. Dahlstrom,
Karla D. Dahlstrom, Hubert LeonLeopard, and Richard E.
Lopez |
LR-15018
|
Aug. 19, 1996 |
John C. Trimpin and
Nevada Impound Management,Inc. |
LR-15017
|
Aug. 15, 1996 |
Home Link Corporation,
Home Link of Florida,Inc.,Home Link of Nevada, Inc. and Matt
Matson |
LR-15016
|
Aug. 14, 1996 |
Harvey P. Tabb, Donald
R. Golan, AmericanTicketing Systems, Inc., Business Investment Group,
Inc. and SocalAmeritix Limited Partnership |
LR-15015
|
Aug. 14, 1996 |
Melvin H. Cox |
LR-15014
|
Aug. 12, 1996 |
Angelo A. Coronato and
Laurence W. Coronato |
LR-15013
|
Aug. 12, 1996 |
Edward Warren Eizman |
LR-15012
|
Aug. 12, 1996 |
William B. Sellin, II,
Zaitech Holdings, Inc. andBaccaratt Holdings, Inc. |
LR-15011
|
Aug. 12, 1996 |
Rufus L.
Jackson,Kingdom Industries Corporationd/b/a Kingdom Corporation, R.T.J.
Enterprises |
LR-15011
|
Aug. 12, 1996 |
Rufus L.
Jackson,Kingdom Industries Corporationd/b/a Kingdom Corporation, R.T.J.
Enterprises |
LR-15010
|
Aug. 12, 1996 |
Andrea Fiabane, Paolo
Mollo, Giorgio Piccinini,Giuseppe Fiabane |
LR-15009
|
Aug. 8, 1996 |
Richard Jenkins |
LR-15008
|
Aug. 8, 1996 |
Eddie Antar |
LR-15007
|
Aug. 8, 1996 |
Frank Duca |
LR-15006
|
Aug. 7, 1996 |
AmeriComm Properties,
Inc., Texas Communications,Inc., James Reinhart Coburn, Morris Wayne
Terry, Gerald SchwartzStein and Paul Jay Shiffman |
LR-15005
|
Aug. 7, 1996 |
Refco Securities,
Inc. |
LR-15004
|
Aug. 7, 1996 |
William B. Sellin, II,
Zaitech Holdings, Inc. andBaccaratt Holdings, Inc. |
LR-15003
|
Aug. 6, 1996 |
Jerald Beagelman, Fred
Lyman, Joseph Sanfellipoand Elliot Stumacher |
LR-15002
|
Aug. 6,1996 |
Roger D. Wyatt and
David L. Holewinski |
LR-15001
|
Aug. 6, 1996 |
LR-15001: Allan G.
Kern, Yale Hirsch and Malcolm McGuire,III |
LR-15000
|
Aug. 6, 1996 |
Jerry B. Silver |
LR-14999 |
Aug. 5, 1996 |
Joseph Silvestri, Charles Smith and Atlantic Pacific Guarantee Corporation |
LR-14998 |
Aug. 1, 1996 |
Joseph Polichemi, Lyle Neal, Oscar William Olson and Charles Padilla |
LR-14997 |
Aug. 1, 1996 |
Michael Levine |
LR-14996 |
Jul. 31, 1996 |
Cayman Resources Corporation |
LR-14995 |
Jul. 30, 1996 |
Kathryn A. Previte |
LR-14994 |
Jul. 30, 1996 |
Richard J. Line |
LR-14993 |
Jul. 30, 1996 |
Equity AU, Inc. |
LR-14992 |
Jul. 30, 1996 |
Bernard F. Bradstreet and Thomas E. Campbell |
LR-14991 |
Jul. 16, 1996 |
Patrick R. Bennett |
LR-14990 |
Jul. 24, 1996 |
Frank Duca |
LR-14989 |
Jul. 23,1996 |
John A. Prevost and Patricia O'Connell |
LR-14988 |
Jul. 23, 1996 |
Robert N. Taylor |
LR-14987 |
Jul. 23, 1996 |
A.R. Baron & Co., Inc. |
LR-14986 |
Jul. 22, 1996 |
The Hallwood Group Incorporated and Anthony J.Gumbiner |
LR-14985 |
Jul. 19, 1996 |
Joseph V. Cusenza |
LR-14984 |
Jul. 18, 1996 |
Peter C. Tosto |
LR-14982 |
Jul. 18, 1996 |
Hugo Aldo Sallustro, Anna Baroni, and Ferrucio Camponovo |
LR-14981 |
Jul. 16, 1996 |
Earl V. Young, and Automated Telephone Management Systems, Inc. |
LR-14980 |
Jul. 12, 1996 |
Richard Jenkins |
LR-14979 |
Jul. 11, 1996 |
Comparator Systems Corporation, Robert Reed Rogers, and Gregory Armijo |
LR-14978 |
Jul. 10, 1996 |
A.R. Baron |
LR-14977 |
Jul. 10, 1996 |
Fenchurch Capital Management, Ltd. |
LR-14976 |
Jul. 9, 1996 |
Shimon Gibori |
LR-14975 |
Jul. 9, 1996 |
Richard M. Lambert |
LR-14974 |
Jul. 9. 1996 |
Harvey P. Tabb, Donald R. Golan, American Ticketing Systems, Inc., Business Investment Group, Inc. and Socal Ameritix Limited Partnership |
LR-14973 |
Jul. 9, 1996 |
Mobile Services International, Corp. James C. Cobban, James M. Robinson and Jonathan D. Bennett |
LR-14972 |
Jul. 8, 1996 |
Milan International, Ltd., Milan National Corporation, Leona Enterprises, Inc., Standard Investment Holdings, Inc. and Eurobanc, Ltd. |
LR-14971 |
Jul. 8, 1996 |
Joseph Brooks |
LR-14970 |
Jul. 3, 1996 |
James G. Freeman |
LR-14969 |
Jul. 2, 1996 |
Douglas Laughlin and George Alma |
Second Quarter |
LR-14968 |
Jun. 28, 1996 |
Raymond C. Gross |
LR-14967
|
Jun. 28, 1996 |
William F. Kane |
LR-14966
|
Jun. 27, 1996 |
First Financial Acceptance Company,
Inc., Richard W. Brown and Robert I. Wilson |
LR-14965
|
Jun. 27, 1996 |
Frank J. Custable, Jr. and F.C.
Financial Corporation |
LR-14964 |
Jun. 26, 1996 |
Gerard A. Lyons |
LR-14963 |
Jun.25, 1996 |
Myron Barry Michaels and Holly S.
Michaels |
LR-14962
|
Jun. 25, 1996 |
Independence Asset Management and
Peter T. Jones |
LR-14961 |
Jun. 25, 1996 |
Jeffrey H. Reynolds, III |
LR-14960 |
Jun. 25, 1996 |
James Russell Cleveland and d/b/a
Central Texas Securities |
LR-14959
|
Jun. 24, 1996 |
Montgomery Medical Ventures,
L.P. |
LR-14958
|
Jun. 24, 1996 |
McDonnell Douglas Corporation |
LR-14957
|
Jun. 20, 1996 |
Gerard A. Spartaro |
LR-14956 |
Jun. 20, 1996 |
John O'Brien |
LR-14955
|
Jun. 20, 1996 |
Vincent F. Cestaro |
LR-14954
|
Jun. 20, 1996 |
Jacob H. Rivers |
LR-14953 |
Jun. 19, 1996 |
Donald Dickerson |
LR-14952
|
Jun. 19,1996 |
Pierce Lowery, Jr. and Richard
Estrin |
LR-14951
|
Jun. 19, 1996 |
James P. McLaughlin |
LR-14950 |
Jun. 19, 1996 |
William P. Dillon |
LR-14949
|
Jun. 19, 1996 |
Oscar William Olson, Jr |
LR-14948
|
Jun. 18, 1996 |
Sandee Russell |
LR-14947
|
Mar. 13, 1998 |
Michael Zaman and Smith, Benton
& Hughes |
LR-14946 |
Jun. 12,1996 |
Network Equipment Technologies,
Inc. |
LR-14945 |
Jun. 11, 1996 |
Michael Cunningham, Arthur Taylor
and Robert Urbine |
LR-14944 |
Jun. 11, 1996 |
David Stuart Zuckerman |
LR-14943
|
Jun. 11, 1996 |
Stanley J. Wasserman |
LR-14942
|
Jun. 11,1996 |
Michael J. Tidd and
Jeffrey L. Punzel |
LR-14941 |
Jun. 10, 1996 |
James F. Stewart |
LR-14940 |
Jun. 10, 1996 |
Ronald A. Cohen |
LR-14939 |
Jun. 7, 1996 |
David W. Granston |
LR-14938 |
Jun. 6, 1996 |
Joseph C. Palmisano |
LR-14937 |
Jun. 6, 1996 |
Daniel L. Osborn |
LR-14936 |
Jun. 6, 1996 |
George Ronkin and Janet Ronkin |
LR-14935
|
Jun. 6, 1996 |
Michael Hansen, William Straughan
and Lionel Reifler |
LR-14934
|
Jun. 6, 1996 |
Kevin P. Chapman |
LR-14933 |
Jun. 6, 1996 |
Timothy J. Moriarty |
LR-14932 |
Jun. 6, 1996 |
James M. League, Jr. |
LR-14931 |
Jun. 5, 1996 |
Cathleen M. Kane, Gary L. Kane,
Kevin Sakser, Alan Whiteside, and Joshua A. Alvarez |
LR-14930 |
Jun. 2, 1996 |
Michael J. Fousse |
LR-14929 |
Jun. 3, 1996 |
Russell W. Brown |
LR-14928
|
Jun. 3, 1996 |
Irving N. Boren |
LR-14927
|
May 31, 1996 |
Comparator Systems Corporation, Robert Reed Rogers, Gregory Armijo, Scott Hitt |
LR-14926
|
May 31, 1996 |
John Acord and Douglas H. Kennett |
LR-14925
|
May 31, 1996 |
William J. Campbell |
LR-14924 |
May 31, 1996 |
Keypoint Financial Corporation
and Michael Warren |
LR-14923 |
May 29, 1996 |
Nir Kantor |
LR-14922 |
May 29,1996 |
Rand Instrument Corporation, Alan
E. Rand |
LR-14921 |
May 29, 1996 |
Danny Sterk |
LR-14920 |
May 24, 1996 |
Churchill Securities, Inc.,
Churchill Mortgage Investment Corp. and Gerald P. Hirsch |
LR-14919
|
May 23, 1996 |
James Russell Cleveland |
LR-14918 |
May 23, 1996 |
Morris F. Baughman |
LR-14917 |
May 23, 1996 |
Benjamin Rex Moses |
LR-14916
|
May 22, 1996 |
Kevin P. Sisti |
LR-14915 |
May 21, 1996 |
Mary S. Pate |
LR-14914 |
May 21, 1996 |
Wilkins McNair, Jr. |
LR-14913
|
May 17 1996 |
Robert L. Citron and Matthew R.
Raabe |
LR-14912 |
May 16, 1996 |
Melvin H. Cox |
LR-14911 |
May 14, 1996 |
Eric Rosenfeld |
LR-14910 |
May 13, 1996 |
Oscar William Olson, Jr. |
LR-14909 |
May 13, 1996 |
Dan Stuart |
LR-14908 |
May 13, 1996 |
Randall E. Bradbury, The Bradbury
Financial Group Inc., TBFG International, Ltd. |
LR-14907
|
May 10, 1996 |
Thaddeus E. Watley, a/k/a Ted Watley,
Power 2000 and Ted's Neutral Corner, Inc. |
LR-14906 |
May 9, 1996 |
Kathleen Lane, James Propp, Paul
Tsang, Robert Guerin, Luther Knox and Julie Propp |
LR-14905 |
Jan. 22, 1998 |
Gerald R. Blackie, Jon R.
Erickson and Mark S. Tague |
LR-14904 |
May 8, 1996 |
Robert Rogoff |
LR-14903 |
May 7, 1996 |
Future Vision Direct Marketing,
Inc., Eastern Coordinated Financial, Philip Forma, James Barschow,
Bruce Schroeder, Joseph Glenski, Alan Herr, Herbert Herr, Stanley
Mindel,Frank Cardell, Thomas Ehrlich, Pacific Wireless
Communications, Inc., Nationwide Wireless Corporation, Ronald H. Michel,
StevenRegan, William Richard Horne, Daniel Kelly, and Philip
J.Caratozzolo |
LR-14902 |
May 6, 1996 |
Patrick J. McEnany and Royce
Laboratories, Inc. |
LR-14901 |
May 6, 1996 |
Arthur S. Feher |
LR-14900 |
May 3, 1996 |
Steven McMichael, Robert J.
Maietta, Edward C.Farni, Arthur J. Petrie, Douglas C. Selander, Dale E.
Barlage and Stephen D. Gellas |
LR-14899 |
May 2, 1996 |
Raejean S. Bonham, World Plus, Inc.
and Atlantic Pacific Funding Corporation |
LR-14898 |
May 2, 1996 |
Timax I General Partnership, FMJ
Financial Group,Inc., Norman J. Follis, Andrei S. Melchner, Allan R.
Jamison and Intervise, Inc. |
LR-14897 |
May 1, 1996 |
Robert N. Taylor |
LR-14896 |
May 1, 1996 |
Thaddeus E. Watley and Ted Watley |
LR-14895 |
Apr. 29, 1996 |
Kendall Square Research Corporation,
Henry Burkhardt III, Peter Appleton Jones and Karl G. Wassmann III |
LR-14894 |
Apr. 26, 1996 |
Cayman Resources Corporation |
LR-14893 |
Apr. 25, 1996 |
Lazare Industries, Inc.
and Richard J. Harley |
LR-14892 |
Apr. 25, 1996 |
Michael Lombardo, Bradley Turner,
I.B.T. FinancialGroup, Inc., David Munoz, Premier Capital Investments
& J.R. Munoz |
LR-14891
|
Apr. 25, 1996 |
James Frith and Chicago
Partnership Board, Inc., Defendants and Adbot, Inc., Relief Defendant |
LR-14890
|
Apr. 25, 1996 |
Roseann Martucci, Jay R.
Hartman and Garr Management Services, Inc. |
LR-14889
|
Apr. 24, 1996 |
Michael Anthony Pierce and Jocelyn
Jane O'Rourke |
LR-14888
|
Apr. 22,1996 |
Michael A. Whelchel |
LR-14887 |
Apr. 22, 1996 |
Michael J. Coello |
LR-14886
|
Apr. 22, 1996 |
Michael P. Angelos and G. Gregory
Russell |
LR-14885
|
Apr. 22, 1996 |
Thor G. Kupchynsky, Roman
Kupchynsky and Kim Bubolo: |
LR-14884
|
Apr. 19, 1996 |
Future Vision Direct Marketing,
Inc., Global Wireless,L.L.C. Marketing, Inc., Global Wireless L.L.C.,
Caracas Wireless Communication, L.P., Global Communications Holding Corp.
and S & G Management, Inc. |
LR-14883
|
Apr. 17, 1996 |
Weyman B. Sinyard |
LR-14882
|
Apr. 17, 1996 |
Stephen r. B. Bingham, Susan
McKenna Grant and William J. McClintock |
LR-14881
|
Apr. 16, 1996 |
Karola E. Jamison |
LR-14880
|
Apr. 16,1996 |
Melvin H. Cox and Fairfield
Investment Co. |
LR-14879
|
Apr. 16, 1996 |
Craig I. Deitchman |
LR-14878
|
Apr. 16 1996 |
Kenneth E. Rottenberg |
LR-14877
|
Apr. 16,1996 |
Tellus Industries, Inc., and Glen
E. Burke |
LR-14876
|
Apr. 15, 1996 |
John F. Long and James J. Baudo |
LR-14875
|
Apr. 15, 1996 |
Bennett Funding Group, Inc.,
Patrick r. Bennett, Benett Receivables Corporation, Bennett Receivables
Corporation-II, Bennett Management and Devlopment Corporation |
LR-14874
|
Apr. 15, 1996 |
Donald Lewis Estes |
LR-14873
|
Apr. 12, 1996 |
Carl E. Lovell and Danna Wale
Lovell |
LR-14872
|
Apr. 11, 1996 |
Jeffrey H. Reynolds, III |
LR-14871
|
Apr. 11, 1996 |
Sarah Delaney |
LR-14870
|
Apr. 11, 1996 |
John P. O'Grady |
LR-14869
|
Apr. 10, 1996 |
Michael Anthony Pierce, Pierce
& Associates and Jocelyn Jane O'Rourke |
LR-14868
|
Apr. 9, 1996 |
Harcourt Wilshire |
LR-14867
|
Apr. 9, 1996 |
Jetlease/Finance Corporation |
LR-14866
|
Apr. 9, 1996 |
KS Resources, Weststar
Exploration, Inc., John K. Judd, Jr. , Mark D. Seigel, and
Alexander L. Kahan |
LR-14865
|
Apr. 9, 1996 |
Gruntal & Co., Gruntal
Financial Corp., Edward E. Bao |
LR-14864
|
Apr. 9, 1996 |
Windgate Fund, LLC, CM Capital
Management Associates, Inc., Robert Moses and Donald Meyers |
LR-14863
|
Apr. 5, 1996 |
Jarco, Inc. |
LR-14862
|
Apr. 4, 1996 |
Atratech, Inc., Anthony Gurino,
Vincent Sorena, Patrick Borello,Aug.o Aufiero, Stanley Kaplan, Francis
J. O'Reilly, and RaymondStankey. |
LR-14861
|
Apr. 3, 1996 |
Frederick Aug.us Moran et al. |
LR-14860
|
Apr. 2, 1996 |
Alexander Charles Fuentes, Alcom
Trading, Inc. and Americorp & Associates, Inc. |
First Quarter |
LR-14859 |
Mar. 29, 1996 |
Dennis Lindsay
Helliwell |
LR-14858 |
Mar. 29, 1996 |
Homer W. Forster |
LR-14857 |
Mar. 29, 1996 |
American Cascade
Energy, Inc |
LR-14856 |
Mar. 29, 1996 |
Donald B. Spencer
and IVT Systems, Inc. |
LR-14855 |
Mar. 25, 1996 |
Michael Anthony
Pierce and Jocelyn Jane O'Rourke |
LR-14854 |
Mar. 25, 1996 |
Michael G. Sargent,
Dennis J. Shepard, Robert J. Scharn and Robert L. Baker |
LR-14853 |
Mar. 22, 1996 |
Stock and Option
Services, Inc., et al. and JoshuaFry |
LR-14852 |
Mar. 21, 1996 |
Investors Dynamics
Corporation and Steven L. Down |
LR-14851 |
Mar. 21, 1996 |
Victor r. Gomez |
LR-14850 |
Mar. 20, 1996 |
Michael P. Angelos
and G. Gregory Russell |
LR-14849 |
Mar. 20,1996 |
Life Partners, Inc.
and Brian D. Pardo |
LR-14848 |
Mar. 20, 1996 |
Parallel
Technologies, Inc. |
LR-14847 |
Mar. 20, 1996 |
John Dankovich and
Linda Dankovich |
LR-14846 |
Mar. 18, 1996 |
Sage Technology,
Inc., Jamie Edelkind and William r. Thiele |
LR-14845 |
Mar. 14, 1996 |
Ralph E. Kittrick |
LR-14844 |
Mar. 13, 1996 |
Investors Dynamics
Corporation and Steven L. Down |
LR-14843 |
Mar. 13, 1996 |
Donald C. Ferguson,
Renee Ferguson, David L. Fried, Albert L. Fried and Matthew C. Ferry |
LR-14842 |
Mar. 12, 1996 |
Drexel Bunham
Lambert |
LR-14841 |
Mar. 12, 1996 |
Thomas J. Kovalcjek
and Ethanol Resources, Inc. |
LR-14840 |
Mar. 12, 1996 |
American Interactive
Group, LLC, American Interactive Services, LLC, American Interactive,
LLC, David C. Connolly, Daniel Rivera, Sr. , Marc A. Remoli and American
Seminars, Inc. |
LR-14839 |
Mar. 7, 1996 |
Robert M. Simpson |
LR-14838 |
Mar. 7, 1996 |
Thomas F. Lanier |
LR-14837 |
Mar. 6, 1996 |
AYM Financial
Corporation and Thomas M. Paley and Adam S. Juechter |
LR-14836 |
Mar. 6, 1996 |
Gary S. Williky and
James J. Romano |
LR-14835 |
Mar. 5, 1996 |
Trans-American
Ostrich Traders, Inc., Larry r. Earp and David P. Silver |
LR-14834 |
Mar. 5, 1996 |
Sage Technology,
Inc., Jamie Edelkind and William r. Thiele |
LR-14833 |
Mar. 5, 1996 |
Harold Gantz |
LR-14832 |
Mar. 4, 1996 |
Capital Corporation,
Lionel Reifler, Susan Lachance Reifler, Gilbert Beall and the Estate of
John Knoblauch |
LR-14831 |
Mar. 4, 1996 |
Samuel L. Williams |
LR-14830 |
Mar. 1, 1996 |
Michael J. Markowski
and Joseph Riccio |
LR-14829 |
Feb. 27, 1996 |
Richard G. Marcus
and Carl M. Youngman |
LR-14828 |
Feb. 27, 1996 |
Renate Haag |
LR-14827 |
Feb. 27, 1996 |
Graeme Davies |
LR-14826 |
Feb. 27, 1996 |
Daniel Rae Morris
and Scott Fraiser |
LR-14825 |
Feb. 26,
1996 |
John C. Hicks |
LR-14824 |
Feb. 26, 1996 |
Carroll E. Siemens |
LR-14823 |
Feb. 23, 1996 |
Stefan Hislop and
Erik Hylander |
LR-14822 |
Feb. 22,
1996 |
Dennis Lindsay
Helliwell and The Helliwell Group Limited |
LR-14821 |
Feb. 22,
1996 |
Jeffrey L. Casperson
and Jerome L. Casperson |
LR-14820 |
Feb. 22, 1996 |
Douglas Frankel |
LR-14819 |
Feb. 16, 1996 |
John Anderson |
LR-14818 |
Feb. 15, 1996 |
Sage Technology,
Inc. |
LR-14817 |
Feb. 15, 1996 |
Donald M. Johnson |
LR-14816 |
Feb. 13, 1996 |
Dennis Lindsay
Helliwell and The Helliwell Group Limited |
LR-14815 |
Feb. 12,
1996 |
Citi Financial
Services, Citi Corp Realty Partners IV, Harold Goldstein, Richard Thomas
Mandell, Robert Singleton, Mark Barquera |
LR-14814 |
Feb. 12,
1996 |
Scorpion
Technologies, Inc., Terry G. Marsh, Richard Bauer, Eric C. Brown, Dudley
Mihran Freeland, J. Gordon Nevers and Albert Terranova |
LR-14813 |
Feb. 9,
1996 |
Michael P. Melnick,
Greenbriar Financial Services Corp. and Michael W. Crawford |
LR-14812 |
Feb. 7,
1996 |
Peter M. Harrington |
LR-14811 |
Feb. 6,
1996 |
Danny Omar Cheri |
LR-14810 |
Feb. 2,
1996 |
David M. Carmichael,
Anthony Kohl, Chris Adams and Robert Putnam |
LR-14809 |
Feb. 1, 1996 |
William Cho |
LR-14808 |
Feb. 1, 1996 |
Gary L. Holman |
LR-14807 |
Jan. 31, 1996 |
Donald Malcolm
Johnson and Freedom Services of Wisconsin, Inc. |
LR-14806 |
Jan. 31, 1996 |
Geoffrey Paul Adams,
Michael Donald McGahee, and GPA Growth Fund |
LR-14805 |
Jan. 31, 1996 |
Victor H. Strevel |
LR-14804 |
Jan. 30,
1996 |
Renate Haag |
LR-14803 |
Jan. 30,
1996 |
Ronald M. Zook and
Financial Concepts Group International, Inc. |
LR-14802 |
Jan. 30,
1996 |
John S. Griffin and
Oliver John Griffin |
LR-14801 |
Jan. 30, 1996 |
Marada Global
Corporation and Marada Capital, Inc. |
LR-14800 |
Jan. 29,
1996 |
Jay r. Bishop |
LR-14799 |
Jan. 29, 1996 |
Calvin L. Word |
LR-14797 |
Jan. 26, 1996 |
ANW, Inc. |
LR-14796 |
Jan. 25,
1996 |
Joseph M. Aaron and
Chartwell Financial |
LR-14795 |
Jan. 25,
1996 |
Sarah Delaney |
LR-14794 |
Jan. 25,
1996 |
James E. Hammonds
("Hammonds") and Raymond C. Gross |
LR-14793 |
Jan. 24, 1996 |
Frank S. Butler |
LR-14792 |
Jan. 24,
1996 |
Robert L. Citron and
Matthew r. Raabe |
LR-14791 |
Jan. 23, 1996 |
Gregory Lee Miller,
Capital Resource Specialists, Inc. and Telefund Partners |
LR-14790 |
Jan. 23,
1996 |
Jay DeForest Moore
and DeForest Company, Inc. |
LR-14789 |
Jan. 22, 1996 |
Citi Financial
Services, Citi Corp Realty Partners IV, Harold Goldstein, Richard Thomas
Mandell, Robert Singleton, Mark Barquera and Roberta Crampton |
LR-14788 |
Jan. 18, 1996 |
David Stuart
Zuckerman |
LR-14787 |
Jan. 18,
1996 |
PaineWebber
Incorporated |
LR-14786 |
Jan. 18,
1996 |
Stanley J. Feminella
and David W. Granston |
LR-14785 |
Jan. 18,
1996 |
Robert D. Gersh,
Boston Municipal Securities, Devonshire Escrow and Transfer Corp.,
Ma'Ayan Book Company, Charles River Landing, Ltd., CRL Group, Inc.,
Culinary Classics of Chestnut Hill, Inc., Culinary Classics of
Burlington, Inc., The Kitchen Shelf, Inc. and the Compu-Bill Co., Inc. |
LR-14784 |
Jan. 17, 1996 |
Technology
International, Ltd. Neil F. Garfield, B.J.Thomas, Kyle Weston, Albert
Weston and David Rockwell |
LR-14783 |
Jan. 16,
1996 |
Robert Zimmerman |
LR-14782 |
Jan. 16, 1996 |
Douglas r. Damon,
Robert M. Davis and Kenneth C. Kolovitz |
LR-14781 |
Jan. 16, 1996 |
Wayne T. Drinkwine |
LR-14780 |
Jan. 11,
1996 |
William J. Dillon |
LR-14779 |
Jan. 11, 1996 |
Lawrence Friedman
and James Galante |
LR-14778 |
Jan. 11, 1996 |
Michael Tropiano
d/b/a Ardmore Financial Services |
LR-14777 |
Jan. 11, 1996 |
Jonathan Mayhew |
LR-14776 |
Jan. 4, 1996 |
Ronald A. Romito |
LR-14775 |
Jan. 4,
1996 |
Linda Lou Taylor,
Newton Kavanaugh and John Kavanaugh |
LR-14774 |
Jan. 4,
1996 |
Robert D. Carl, III |
LR-14773 |
Jan. 3,
1996 |
Edmund J. Lopinski,
Jr. |
LR-14772 |
Jan. 3, 1996 |
Robert Vecchioni |
LR-14771 |
Jan. 3,
1996 |
William J. Young |
LR-14770 |
Jan. 3,
1996 |
Giancarlo Parretti |
http://www.sec.gov/litigation/litreleases/litrelarchive/litarchive1996.shtml
|