The new NASA HQ Historical Reference Collection on-line public database is here!
The Administrator and Deputy Administrator speech series from the NASA Headquarters Historical Reference Collection have been digitized as fully searchable PDFs
and made available in this new on-line database for use by researchers.
Researchers may use either the Basic Search or Advanced Search to access these.
Biographies of NASA
Administrators
- Dr.
T. Keith Glennan, August 19, 1958-January 20, 1961
- Dr.
Hugh L. Dryden, January 21, 1961-February 14, 1961 (Acting)
- James
E. Webb, February 14, 1961-October 7, 1968
- Dr.
Thomas O. Paine, October 8, 1968-March 21, 1969 (Acting)
- Dr.
Thomas O. Paine, March 21, 1969-September 15, 1970
- Dr.
George M. Low, September 16, 1970-April 26, 1971 (Acting)
- Dr.
James C. Fletcher, April 27, 1971-May 1, 1977
- Dr.
Alan M. Lovelace, May 2, 1977-June 20, 1977 (Acting)
- Dr.
Robert A. Frosch, June 21, 1977-January 20, 1981
- Dr.
Alan M. Lovelace, January 21, 1981-July 10, 1981 (Acting)
- James
M. Beggs, July 10, 1981-December 4, 1985
- Dr.
William R. Graham, December 4, 1985-May 11, 1986
(Acting)
- Dr.
James C. Fletcher, May 12, 1986-April 8, 1989
- Dale
D. Myers, April 8, 1989-May 13, 1989 (Acting)
- Richard
H. Truly, May 14, 1989-June 30, 1989 (Acting)
- Richard
H. Truly, July 1, 1989-March 31, 1992
- Daniel
S. Goldin, April 1, 1992-November 17, 2001
- Dr.
Daniel R. Mulville, November 19, 2001 - December 21,
2001 (Acting)
- Sean
O'Keefe, December 21, 2001- February 11, 2005
- Frederick
D. Gregory, February 11, 2005 - April 14, 2005 (Acting)
- Dr.
Michael Griffin, April 14, 2005 - January 20, 2009
- For a full-text PDF of Dr. Griffin's book, "Leadership in Space" with a selection of his speeches,
- click here
- Christopher
Scolese, January 21 - July 16, 2009 (Acting)
- Charles F. Bolden, Jr., July 17, 2009 - Present
Biographies of NASA Deputy
Administrators
- Dr.
Hugh L. Dryden, August 19, 1958-December 2, 1965
- Dr.
Robert C. Seamans, Jr., December 21, 1965-January 5,
1968
- Dr.
Thomas O. Paine, March 25, 1968-March 20, 1969
- Dr.
George M. Low, December 3, 1969-June 5, 1976
- Dr.
Alan M. Lovelace, July 2, 1976-July 10, 1981
- Dr.
Hans Mark, July 10, 1981-September 1, 1984
- Dr.
William R. Graham, November 25, 1985-December 4, 1985;
May 11, 1986-October 1, 1986
- Dale
D. Myers, October 6, 1986-May 13, 1989
- James
R. Thompson, Jr., July 6, 1989-November 8, 1991
- Aaron
Cohen, February 19-November 1, 1992 (Acting)
- John
R. Dailey, November 3, 1992-December 31, 1999 (Acting)
- *Dr.
Daniel R. Mulville, January 1, 2000-November 19, 2001;
December 21, 2001-February 3, 2003 (*Dr. Mulville
was never the official Deputy Administrator. Rather, during these time periods he served as the Associate Deputy Administrator).
- Frederick
D. Gregory, August 12, 2002 - February 20, 2005; April
14, 2005 - November 4, 2005
- Shana
Dale, November 4, 2005 - January 17, 2009
- Lori Garver, July 17, 2009 - Present
Biographies of Other Key NASA
Personnel
Biographies of Aerospace
Officials and Policymakers
The NASA Workforce
- The NASA
Workforce: Past, Present, Future: Every year since the
Apollo Era, NASA Headquarters has published a "NASA Civil
Service Workforce Report." It has contained information on
the size, demographics, and dynamics of the Agency
workforce--including hires, losses, awards, grades,
salaries, and other such data. The report breaks most this
information down by Center. Traditionally, the report has
been available in printed form to headquarters, centers, and
persons outside the Agency. Beginning in 1995 NASA has made
the workforce report available only via the World Wide Web.
See also: Workforce Information Cubes.
Another good source is provided by OPM where one can get information about the entire federal workforce (including NASA or any other Agency). It is at this URL: http://www.fedscope.opm.gov/
Steve Garber, NASA History Web Curator Site design by NASA HQ
Printing & Design For further information email histinfo@hq.nasa.gov
|