Ann Marie Buerkle
Began serving as Commissioner in July 2013. Term ended in October 2019.
Nancy Nord
Began serving as Commissioner May 12, 2005. Served as Acting Chairman from July 16, 2006, through May 31, 2009. Served until October 26, 2013.
Anne Northup
Serving as Commissioner from Aug. 18, 2009, through Oct. 26, 2012.
Thomas H. Moore
Began serving as Commissioner May 1, 1995. Served as Acting Chairman from Nov. 2, 2001, through Aug. 1, 2002, and from June 1, 2009, through June 29, 2009. Term ended October 2010. Served until Oct. 26, 2011.
Harold Stratton
Served as Chairman from Aug. 2, 2002, through July 15, 2006.
Mary Sheila Gall
Served as Commissioner from Dec. 9, 1991, through Oct. 1, 2004.
Ann Brown
Served as Chairman from March 10, 1994, through Nov. 1, 2001.
Jacqueline Jones-Smith
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 27, 1989, until October 8, 1994. Served as Chairman from Nov. 27, 1989, through Mar. 9, 1994.
Anne Graham
Served as Commissioner from Dec. 27, 1985, through Dec. 9, 1991. Served as Acting Chairman from June 1, 1986, through July 16, 1986, and from Jan. 4, 1989, through Nov. 26, 1989.
Terrence Scanlon
Served as Commissioner from March 30, 1983, through Jan. 3, 1989. Served as Chairman from Dec. 31, 1984, through Dec. 20, 1985 (recess appointment) and from July 17, 1986, through Jan. 3, 1989.
Saundra Brown Armstrong
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 22, 1983, through Aug. 8, 1986.
Carol G. Dawson
Served as Commissioner from July 6, 1984, through Oct. 27, 1993. Served as Acting Chairman from Dec. 21, 1985, through May 31, 1986.
Nancy Harvey Steorts
Served as Chairman from Aug. 4, 1981, through Dec. 30, 1984.
Samuel D. Zagoria
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 10, 1978, through Jan. 22, 1984.
Edith Barksdale Sloan
Served as Commissioner from March 20, 1978, through Nov. 18, 1983.
R. David Pittle
Served as Commissioner from Oct. 10, 1973, through Oct. 1, 1982. Served as Acting Chairman from June 1, 1981, through Aug. 3, 1981.
Stuart M. Statler
Served as Commissioner from Aug. 13, 1979, through June 1, 1986. Served as Acting Chairman from Feb. 1, 1981, through May 31, 1981.
Susan B. King
Served as Chairman from March 6, 1978, through Jan. 31, 1981.
Barbara Hackman Franklin
Served as Commissioner from May 14, 1973, through Feb. 18, 1979.
S. John Byington
Served as Chairman from June 2, 1976, through June 30, 1978.
Lawrence M. Kushner
Served as Commissioner from May 14, 1973, through Oct. 21, 1977.
Thaddeus Garrett Jr.
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 18, 1976, through Oct. 14, 1977.
Richard O. Simpson
Served as Chairman from May 14, 1973, through June 1, 1976.
Constance B. Newman
Served as Commissioner from May 14, 1973, through Feb. 26, 1976.