Superintendent of Documents
- Details
- Last Updated: August 28 2018
- Published: October 19 2012
The Superintendent of Documents (SupDocs) leads the U.S. Government Publishing Office (GPO) in providing public access to Government information published by the U.S. Congress, Federal agencies, and the Federal courts. The SupDocs:
- Focuses efforts on the Federal Depository Library Program (FDLP) in cooperation with Congress and GPO’s library partners.
- Oversees the policy and strategy for GPO’s Library Services and Content Management and Publication and Information Sales business units.
The SupDocs is appointed by the Director, U.S. Government Publishing Office (44 U.S.C. § 1702).
Current Superintendent of Documents
As Superintendent of Documents, Laurie Hall leads the agency in providing public access to Government information published by the U.S. Congress, Federal agencies and the Federal courts. Hall focuses her efforts on the Federal Depository Library Program (FDLP) in cooperation with Congress and GPO’s library partners.
As Managing Director of Library Services and Content Management, Hall oversees the administration of four major Congressionally-mandated programs: the FDLP, the Cataloging & Indexing Program, the International Exchange Service, and the By-Law Program. Hall provides management support for the implementation of strategic programs and operations in partnership with depository libraries and in collaboration with other GPO business units and Federal agencies.
Hall has been with GPO since 1985, most recently serving as LSCM’s Director of Library Technical Services where she oversees three divisions and supervises more than 60 staff members. Other LSCM positions Laurie Hall has held include: Supervisory Program Analyst, Serials Cataloger, Cataloging Section Chief, Cataloging Branch Chief, and Director of Bibliographic Services. Since 1992, she has worked on key agency initiatives, including the acquisition of GPO’s first Integrated Library System. Additionally, Hall has worked on projects to deliver cataloging records created by GPO staff to FDLP libraries through GPO’s Cataloging Record Distribution Project. She also manages the National Bibliographic Records Inventory Program, an initiative to identify and catalog both historic and new content for GPO’s Catalog of U.S. Government Publications (CGP). The Bibliographic Inventory includes many projects, such as the conversion of GPO’s Historic Shelflist of U.S. Government Publications (1880-1992) and the development and implementation of cooperative cataloging partnerships with libraries in the FDLP to identify fugitive publications and link to recently digitized U.S. Government publications. A new project sponsored by Hall beginning in 2013 is the Web harvesting of agency content. The roles held by Hall since joining GPO have greatly supported the digital transformation of key agency initiatives.
Ms. Hall earned her Bachelor’s degree in Art History and American Studies at the University of Virginia and her Master’s degree in Library Science at Catholic University in Washington, D.C.
List of All Superintendent of Documents
The following lists all the individuals that have held the office of Superintendent of Documents.
Name | Start Date | End Date |
---|---|---|
Laurie Beyer Hall | October 16, 2017 | Present |
Laurie Beyer Hall, Acting | May 2, 2016 | October 15, 2017 |
Mary Alice Baish | January 20, 2011 | April 29, 2016 |
Richard G. Davis, Acting | March 1, 2007 | January 19, 2011 |
Judith Russell | January 6, 2003 | February 28, 2007 |
Francis J. Buckley, Jr. | December 1, 1997 | December, 2002 |
Francis J. Buckley, Jr., Acting | September, 1997 | November 30, 1997 |
Wayne P. Kelley | April, 1991 | September, 1997 |
Donald E. Fossedal | April 1, 1985 | April, 1991 |
Donald E. Fossedal, Acting | January 3, 1985 | March 31, 1985 |
Michael F. DiMario | March 7, 1983 | January 2, 1985 |
Raymond Mason Taylor | May 10, 1982 | March 7, 1983 |
Raymond Mason Taylor, Acting | April 1, 1982 | May 9, 1982 |
William J. Barrett | January 30, 1982 | March 31, 1982 |
Carl A. LaBarre | July 20, 1975 | January 29, 1982 |
Wellington H. Lewis | July 1, 1973 | July 17, 1975 |
Robert E. Kling, Jr. | December 22, 1970 | June 30, 1973 |
Robert E. Kling, Jr., Acting | June 13, 1970 | December 21, 1970 |
Carper W. Buckley | July 5, 1953 | June 12, 1970 |
Roy B. Eastin | August 1, 1949 | July 4, 1953 |
Fred W. Cromwell | June 16, 1945 | July 29, 1949 |
Alton P. Tisdel | June 1, 1921 | June 1, 1945 |
John L. Alverson | November 16, 1920 | May 15, 1921 |
John L. Alverson, Acting | May 24, 1920 | November 15, 1920 |
Josiah H. Brinker | May 1, 1914 | May 23, 1920 |
Josiah H. Brinker, Acting | December 2, 1913 | April 30, 1914 |
Frank C. Wallace | February 26, 1913 | December 1, 1913 |
August Donath | July 16, 1909 | February 22, 1913 |
William Leander Post | August 8, 1906 | July 15, 1909 |
William Leander Post, Acting | February 8, 1906 | August 7, 1906 |
Louis C. Ferrell | November 19, 1897 | February 7, 1906 |
Francis A. Crandall | March 26, 1895 | November 17, 1897 |