*Party division totals are based on election day results.
Republicans retained their congressional majorities after the 1996 election, and President Bill Clinton won re-election. The 105th Congress (1997–1999) began with a bipartisan budget agreement and tax cut. But after an Independent Counsel’s report revealed inconsistencies in statements President Clinton made under oath, the House adopted two articles of impeachment against him in a rare lame-duck session following the 1998 elections.
Learn more about the People of the People's House
To view complete lists of individuals who have served in these leadership and official positions since the 1st Congress, visit the People section
Number | Date | Petition to Discharge |
---|---|---|
No. 0001 | September 11, 1997 |
the Committee on Rules from the
consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 141) |
No. 0002 | October 9, 1997 |
the Committee on Commerce from
the consideration of the bill (H.Res. 1984) |
No. 0003 | October 24, 1997 |
the Committee on Rules from the
consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 259) |
No. 0004 | June 11, 1998 |
the Committee on Commerce,
and in addition, the Committees on Ways and Means and Education
and the Workforce from the consideration of the bill (H.R. 306) |
No. 0005 | June 23, 1998 |
the Committee on Rules
from the consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 467) |
No. 0006 | June 25, 1998 |
the Committee on Rules
from the consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 473) |
No. 0007 | July 20, 1998 |
the Committee on Rules
from the consideration of the resolution (H. Res. 486) |
No. 0008 | September 17, 1998 |
the Committee on Veterans' Affairs
from the consideration of the bill (H.R. 836) |
1Resigned on December 21, 1998. See, Roll Call, "House Clerk's Office Shake-Up Continues," (January 7, 1999): 1, 21.
2Appointed by the Speaker effective January 1, 1999. See, "Appointment by the Speaker After Sine Die Adjournment," Congressional Record, 106th Cong., 1st sess., (January 6, 1999): H228.
3Appointed January 9, 1997, "to act as and to exercise temporarily" the CAO duties. See the Congressional Record, 105th Cong., 1st sess. (January 9, 1997): 76. Resigned July 1997.
4Elected by H. Res. 207, on July 31, 1997. See, Congressional Record, 105th Cong., 1st sess., (July 31, 1997): 6669.