Leaders
Glenn A. Fine, Acting Inspector General
U. S. Department of Defense
On Sept. 28, 2016, the White House nominated Glenn A. Fine to serve as the Department of Defense Inspector General. He has been the acting Inspector General since Jan. 10, 2016.
DoD OIG Senior Leadership
- Steven A. Stebbins, Chief of Staff
- Dr. Brett M.Baker, Deputy Inspector General Auditing
- Dermot F. O’Reilly, Deputy Inspector General for Investigations
- Michael S. Child Sr., Deputy Inspector General Overseas Contingency Operations
- Marguerite C. Garrison, Deputy Inspector General Administrative Investigations
- Anthony C. Thomas, Deputy Inspector General Intelligence and Special Program Assessments
- Kenneth P. Moorefield, Deputy Inspector General Special Plans & Operations
- Randolph R. Stone, Deputy Inspector General Policy and Oversight
Whistleblower Protection Ombudsman
- Patrick W.Gookin, Hotline Director
History of the DoD Inspectors General
Inspectors General | Senate Confirmation | Sworn In | Departure |
---|---|---|---|
Jon T. Rymer | September 17, 2013 | September 25, 2013 | January 9, 2016 |
Gordon S. Heddell | July 10, 2009 | July 14, 2009 | December 24, 2011 |
Claude M. Kicklighter | April 12, 2007 | April 30, 2007 | July 13, 2008 |
Joseph E. Schmitz | March 21, 2002 | April 2, 2002 | September 9, 2005 |
Eleanor Hill | February 23, 1995 | March 1, 1995 | April 30, 1999 |
Susan Crawford | November 22, 1989 | November 28, 1989 | November 19, 1991 |
June Gibbs Brown | November 13, 1987 | November 13, 1987 | October 20, 1989 |
Joseph H. Sherick | April 28, 1983 | May 20, 1983 | June 3, 1986 |
Acting Inspectors General | Start | End |
---|---|---|
Glenn A. Fine | January 10, 2016 | Present |
Lynne M. Halbrooks | December 25, 2011 | September 24, 2013 |
Gordon S. Heddell1 | July 14, 2008 | July 13, 2009 |
Thomas F. Gimble | September 11, 2005 | April 29, 2007 |
Robert Lieberman | January 4, 2001 | April 1, 2002 |
Donald Mancuso | May 3, 1999 | January 3, 2001 |
Derek J. Vander Schaaf 2 | November 19, 1991 | February 28, 1995 |
Derek J. Vander Schaaf 2 | October 20, 1989 | November 27, 1989 |
Derek J. Vander Schaaf 2 | June 3, 1986 | November 13, 1987 |
1) Mr. Heddell served as the DoD Acting Inspector General while still serving as the Department of Labor Inspector General.
2) Mr. Vander Schaaf served before the Federal Vacancies Reform Act of 1998 and retained the title of deputy while serving as the interim head of agency.