Nominations by the U.S. President
The president is responsible for nominating individuals to certain federal government positions. Nominations are submitted to the Senate for its consideration and possible confirmation.
Find a Nomination by Number (1981-Present)
Nominations Information
Nominations Since 1981
1-25
of 32,238
-
NOMINATION
PN326 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — John Michael Vazquez — The Judiciary
Description: John Michael Vazquez, of New Jersey, to be United States District Judge for the District of New Jersey, vice Joal A. Pisano, retired. Date Received from President: 03/26/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - By unanimous consent agreement, debate and vote at a time to be determined. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN331 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Gabriel Camarillo — Department of Defense
Description: Gabriel Camarillo, of Texas, to be an Assistant Secretary of the Air Force, vice Daniel Ginsberg. Date Received from President: 04/13/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar. Calendar No. 433. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN366 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Thomas Edgar Rothman — National Foundation on the Arts and the Humanities
Description: Thomas Edgar Rothman, of Maryland, to be a Member of the National Council on the Arts for a term expiring September 3, 2016. (New Position) Date Received from President: 04/15/2015 Committee: Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar pursuant to S.Res. 116, 112th Congress. Calendar No. 437. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN367 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Wilhelmina Marie Wright — The Judiciary
Description: Wilhelmina Marie Wright, of Minnesota, to be United States District Judge for the District of Minnesota, vice Michael J. Davis, retiring. Date Received from President: 04/15/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - By unanimous consent agreement, debate and vote at a time to be determined. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN651 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Anthony Rosario Coscia — Amtrak Board of Directors
Description: Anthony Rosario Coscia, of New Jersey, to be a Director of the Amtrak Board of Directors for a term of five years. (Reappointment) Date Received from President: 07/13/2015 Committee: Commerce, Science, and Transportation Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN675 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Leonard Terry Strand — The Judiciary
Description: Leonard Terry Strand, of South Dakota, to be United States District Judge for the Northern District of Iowa, vice Mark W. Bennett, retired. Date Received from President: 07/21/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - By unanimous consent agreement, debate and vote at a time to be determined. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN741 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — John E. Sparks — The Judiciary
Description: John E. Sparks, of Virginia, to be a Judge of the United States Court of Appeals for the Armed Forces for the term of fifteen years to expire on the date prescribed by law, vice James Edgar Baker, term expiring. Date Received from President: 07/30/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar. Calendar No. 434. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN742 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Derek Tai-Ching Kan — Amtrak Board of Directors
Description: Derek Tai-Ching Kan, of California, to be a Director of the Amtrak Board of Directors for a term of five years, vice Nancy A. Naples, term expired. Date Received from President: 07/30/2015 Committee: Commerce, Science, and Transportation Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN759 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Marcel John Lettre II — Department of Defense
Description: Marcel John Lettre, II, of Maryland, to be Under Secretary of Defense for Intelligence, vice Michael Vickers, resigned. Date Received from President: 08/05/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar. Calendar No. 435. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN760 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Patrick Joseph Murphy — Department of Defense
Description: Patrick Joseph Murphy, of Pennsylvania, to be Under Secretary of the Army, vice Brad R. Carson. Date Received from President: 08/05/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Committee on Armed Services. Hearings held. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN831 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger — The Judiciary
Description: Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger, of Iowa, to be United States District Judge for the Southern District of Iowa, vice James E. Gritzner, retired. Date Received from President: 09/15/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - By unanimous consent agreement, debate and vote at a time to be determined. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN870 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Ricardo A. Aguilera — Department of Defense
Description: Ricardo A. Aguilera, of Virginia, to be an Assistant Secretary of the Air Force, vice Lisa S. Disbrow. Date Received from President: 09/21/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Committee requested information was received. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN873 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Janine Anne Davidson — Department of Defense
Description: Janine Anne Davidson, of Virginia, to be Under Secretary of the Navy, vice Robert O. Work, resigned. Date Received from President: 09/21/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Committee on Armed Services. Hearings held. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN874 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Lisa S. Disbrow — Department of Defense
Description: Lisa S. Disbrow, of Virginia, to be Under Secretary of the Air Force, vice Eric K. Fanning, resigned. Date Received from President: 09/21/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Committee on Armed Services. Hearings held. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN899 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Dana J. Boente — Department of Justice
Description: Dana J. Boente, of Virginia, to be United States Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia for the term of four years, vice Neil H. MacBride, resigned. Date Received from President: 10/08/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN900 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Robert Lloyd Capers — Department of Justice
Description: Robert Lloyd Capers, of New York, to be United States Attorney for the Eastern District of New York for the term of four years, vice Loretta E. Lynch, resigned. Date Received from President: 10/08/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN901 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — John P. Fishwick Jr. — Department of Justice
Description: John P. Fishwick, Jr., of Virginia, to be United States Attorney for the Western District of Virginia for the term of four years, vice Timothy J. Heaphy, resigned. Date Received from President: 10/08/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN903 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Emily Gray Rice — Department of Justice
Description: Emily Gray Rice, of New Hampshire, to be United States Attorney for the District of New Hampshire for the term of four years, vice John P. Kacavas, resigned. Date Received from President: 10/08/2015 Committee: Judiciary Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN922 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Vice Adm. Kurt W. Tidd — Navy
Description: The following named officer for appointment in the United States Navy to the grade indicated while assigned to a position of importance and responsibility under title 10, U.S.C., section 601: Date Received from President: 10/28/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/15/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar. Calendar No. 436. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN64 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Alissa M. Starzak — Department of Defense
Description: Alissa M. Starzak, of New York, to be General Counsel of the Department of the Army, vice Brad Carson, resigned. Date Received from President: 01/13/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/14/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 45 - 34. Record Vote Number: 335. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN235 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — John Conger — Department of Defense
Description: John Conger, of Maryland, to be a Principal Deputy Under Secretary of Defense, vice Michael J. McCord, resigned. Date Received from President: 03/04/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/14/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN298 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Stephen P. Welby — Department of Defense
Description: Stephen P. Welby, of Maryland, to be an Assistant Secretary of Defense, vice Zachary J. Lemnios, resigned. Date Received from President: 03/19/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/14/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN321 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Franklin R. Parker — Department of Defense
Description: Franklin R. Parker, of Illinois, to be an Assistant Secretary of the Navy, vice Juan M. Garcia III. Date Received from President: 03/26/2015 Committee: Armed Services Latest Action: 12/14/2015 - Confirmed by the Senate by Voice Vote. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN626 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Anthony G. Collins — Saint Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation
Description: Anthony G. Collins, of New York, to be a Member of the Advisory Board of the Saint Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation, vice William L. Wilson. Date Received from President: 07/08/2015 Committee: Commerce, Science, and Transportation Latest Action: 12/14/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar pursuant to S.Res. 116, 112th Congress. Calendar No. 431. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions) -
NOMINATION
PN871 — 114th Congress (2015-2016) — Shoshana Miriam Lew — Department of Transportation
Description: Shoshana Miriam Lew, of the District of Columbia, to be Chief Financial Officer, Department of Transportation, vice Sylvia I. Garcia, resigned. Date Received from President: 09/21/2015 Committee: Commerce, Science, and Transportation Latest Action: 12/14/2015 - Placed on Senate Executive Calendar pursuant to S.Res. 116, 112th Congress. Calendar No. 432. Subject to nominee's commitment to respond to requests to appear and testify before any duly constituted committee of the Senate. (All Actions)