Minister Resident (Turkey) Appointed: August 23, 1853 Presentation of Credentials: February 9, 1854 Termination of Mission: Presented recall December 12, 1857
Commissioned during a recess of the Senate; recommissioned after confirmation on
Feb 9, 1854. Nominated Feb 25, 1856 to be Envoy Extraordinary and Minister
Plenipotentiary; nomination withdrawn before the Senate acted upon it.