Anne Northup
Serving as Commissioner from Aug. 18, 2009, through Oct. 26, 2012.
Thomas H. Moore
Began serving as Commissioner May 1, 1995. Served as Acting Chairman from Nov. 2, 2001, through Aug. 1, 2002, and from June 1, 2009, through June 29, 2009. Term ended October 2010. Served until Oct. 26, 2011.
Harold Stratton
Served as Chairman from Aug. 2, 2002, through July 15, 2006.
Ann Brown
Served as Chairman from March 10, 1994, through Nov. 1, 2001.
Mary Sheila Gall
Served as Commissioner from Dec. 9, 1991, through Oct. 1, 2004.
Jacqueline Jones-Smith
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 27, 1989, until October 8, 1989. Served as Chairman from Nov. 27, 1989, through Mar. 9, 1994.
Anne Graham
Served as Commissioner from Dec. 27, 1985, through Dec. 9, 1991. Served as Acting Chairman from June 1, 1986, through July 16, 1986, and from Jan. 4, 1989, through Nov. 26, 1989.
Carol G. Dawson
Served as Commissioner from July 6, 1984, through Oct. 27, 1993. Served as Acting Chairman from Dec. 21, 1985, through May 31, 1986.
Saundra Brown Armstrong
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 22, 1983, through Aug. 8, 1986.
Terrence Scanlon
Served as Commissioner from March 30, 1983, through Jan. 3, 1989. Served as Chairman from Dec. 31, 1984, through Dec. 20, 1985 (recess appointment) and from July 17, 1986, through Jan. 3, 1989.
Nancy Harvey Steorts
Served as Chairman from Aug. 4, 1981, through Dec. 30, 1984.
Stuart M. Statler
Served as Commissioner from Aug. 13, 1979, through June 1, 1986. Served as Acting Chairman from Feb. 1, 1981, through May 31, 1981.
Samuel D. Zagoria
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 10, 1978, through Jan. 22, 1984.
Edith Barksdale Sloan
Served as Commissioner from March 20, 1978, through Nov. 18, 1983.
Susan B. King
Served as Chairman from March 6, 1978, through Jan. 31, 1981.
Thaddeus Garrett Jr.
Served as Commissioner from Nov. 18, 1976, through Oct. 14, 1977.
S. John Byington
Served as Chairman from June 2, 1976, through June 30, 1978.
R. David Pittle
Served as Commissioner from Oct. 10, 1973, through Oct. 1, 1982. Served as Acting Chairman from June 1, 1981, through Aug. 26, 1976.
Barbara Hackman Franklin
Served as Commissioner from May 14, 1973, through Feb. 18, 1979.
Constance B. Newman
Served as Commissioner from May 14, 1973, through Feb. 26, 1976.
Lawrence M. Kushner
Served as Commissioner from May 14, 1973, through Oct. 21, 1977.
Richard O. Simpson
Served as Chairman from May 14, 1973, through June 1, 1976.