Organization HQ SACT History Former Commanders
List of Supreme Allied Commanders Atlantic
30 Jan 1952 - 12 Apr 1954 | 12 Apr 1954 - 29 Feb 1960 | 29 Feb 1960 - 30 Apr 1963 | 30 Apr 1963 - 30 Apr 1965 | 30 Apr 1965 - 17 Jun 1967 |
Adm Lynde D. McCormick | Adm Jerauld Wright | Adm Robert L. Dennison | Adm Harold Page Smith | Adm Thomas H. Moorer |
US Navy | US Navy | US Navy | US Navy | US Navy |
17 Jun 1967 - 30 Sep 1970 | 30 Sep 1970 - 31 Oct 1972 | 31 Oct 1972 - 30 May 1975 | 30 May 1975 - 30 Sep 1978 | 30 Sep 1978 - 30 Sep 1982 |
Adm Ephraim P. Holmes | Adm Charles K. Duncan | Adm Ralph W. Cousins | Adm Isaac C. Kidd Jr. | Adm Harry D. Train II |
US Navy | US Navy | US Navy | US Navy | US Navy |
30 Sep 1982 - 27 Nov 1985 | 27 Nov 1985 - 22 Nov 1988 | 22 Nov 1988 - 18 May 1990 | 18 May 1990 - 13 Jul 1992 | 13 Jul 1992 - 31 Oct 1994 |
Adm Wesley L. McDonald | Adm Lee Baggett Jr. | Adm Frank B. Kelso II | Adm Leon A. Edney | Adm Paul D. Miller |
US Navy | US Navy | US Navy | US Navy | US Navy |
31 Oct 1994 - 24 Sep 1997 | 24 Sep 1997 - 05 Sep 2000 | 05 Sep 2000 - 02 Oct 2002 | Oct 2002 - Jun 2003 | 02 Oct 2002 - 19 Jun 2003 |
Gen John J. Sheehan | Adm Harold W. Gehman, Jr. | Gen William F. Kernan | Adm Ian Forbes (Acting) | Adm Edmund P. Giambastiani Jr. |
US Marines Corp | US Navy | US Army | Royal Navy | US Navy |
The Prague Summit in the Czech Republic in 2002 led to ACLANT being decommissioned effective 19 June 2003, and a new Allied Command Transformation (ACT) being established as its successor. | ||||
19 Jun 2003 - 01 Aug 2005 | 10 Nov 2005 - 09 Nov 2007 | 09 Nov 2007 - 09 Sep 2009 | 09 Sep 2009 - 28 Sep 2012 | |
Adm Edmund P. Giambastiani Jr. | Gen. Lance L. Smith | Gen. James N. Mattis | Gen. Stéphane Abrial | |
US Navy | US Air Force | US Marine Corps | French Air Force |