|
Information > Biographies > BRIGADIER GENERAL JOHN FRENCH |
|
BRIGADIER GENERAL JOHN FRENCH
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Feb. 1, 1970.
Died Feb. 17, 1991.
YEAR OF BIRTH: 1918
PLACE OF BIRTH: Dorchester, Mass.
EDUCATION: Graduate, Flying School, 1941 Air Command & Staff School, Maxwell Air Force Base, Ala., 1950 Advanced Management Course, University of Pittsburgh, Pa., 1953 University of Maryland, bachelor of arts 1961
AERONAUTICAL RATING: Command pilot
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Legion of Merit with oak leaf cluster Army Commendation Medal with two oak leaf clusters American Defense Service Medal American Campaign Medal European-African-Middle Eastern Campaign Medal World War II Victory Medal Army of Occupation Medal (Germany) National Defense Service Medal with service star Air Force Longevity Service Award Ribbon with six oak leaf clusters
EFFECTIVE DATE OF PROMOTION TO BRIGADIER GENERAL: March 28, 1968
(Current as of July 23, 1969)
MAJOR ASSIGNMENTS 1941-1943 Supply officer; later operations officer, 63d Troop Carrier Group, Brookley Field., Ala.
1943-1944 Assistant to deputy chief of staff/supply, Air Support Dept., Army Air Forces School of Applied Tactics, Fla.
1944-1945 Assistant to deputy chief of staff/supply, Headquarters I Troop Carrier Command, Stout Field, Ind. (with temporary duty in Europe July-Nov. 1945)
1945-1946 Manpower officer, IX Troop Carrier Command, Stout Field., Ind.
1946-1949 Chief, Organization & Plans; later assistant plans officer, U.S. Air Forces in Europe
1949-1950 Administration officer, Headquarters 311th Air Division, Forbes Air Force Base, Kan.; later Headquarters 2d Air Force, Barksdale Air Force Base, La.
1950 Student, Air Command & Staff School, Maxwell Air Force Base, Ala.
1950-1952 Operations & training officer, 507th Tactical Control Group, later director of plans, Headquarters 9th Air Force, Pope Air Force Base, N.C.
1952-1953 Student, University of Pittsburgh, Pa. (Advanced Management Course)
1953-1956 Deputy chief of staff, comptroller, Headquarters 9th Air Force, Pope Air Force Base, N.C.
l956-1958 Comptroller, Military Assistance Advisory Group, Taiwan
1958-1960 Chief, International Relations Area, Office of the Comptroller of the Air Force
1960-196l Chief, Fiscal Affairs Division, special assistant for programs & budget, Office of the Joint Chiefs of Staff
1961-1964 Assistant chief of staff; later deputy chief of staff, U.S. Strike Command, MacDill Air Force Base, Fla.
l964-1965 Deputy chief of staff; later deputy director of operations, J-3, U.S. Strike Command, MacDill Air Force Base, Fla.
1965-1966 Deputy director of budget, Office of the Comptroller of the Air Force
1966-1968 Executive to the vice chief of staff, U.S. Air Force, Headquarters U.S. Air Force
1968-Present Deputy chief of staff, comptroller, Headquarters Air Force Logistics Command, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio
|
|
|
|
|