|
Information > Biographies > GENERAL RONALD R. FOGLEMAN |
|
GENERAL RONALD R. FOGLEMAN
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Sep. 1, 1997.
General Ronald R. Fogleman is chief of staff of the U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. As chief, he serves as the senior uniformed Air Force officer responsible for the organization, training and equipage of 750,000 active duty, Guard, Reserve and civilian forces serving in the United States and overseas. As a member of the Joint Chiefs of Staff, he and the other service chiefs function as military advisers to the secretary of defense, National Security Council and the president.
A 1963 graduate from the U.S. Air Force Academy, he holds a master's degree in military history and political science, Duke University. A command pilot and a parachutist, he has amassed more than 6,800 flying hours in fighter, transport, tanker and rotary wing aircraft. He flew 315 combat missions and logged 806 hours of combat flying in fighter aircraft.
In early assignments he instructed student pilots, performed combat duty as a fighter pilot and high-speed forward air controller in Vietnam and Thailand, taught history at the Air Force Academy and conducted flight operations in Europe -- including duty as an F-15 aircraft demonstration pilot for international airshows. He commanded an Air Force wing, an air division, a numbered air force, a major command and a unified command.
EDUCATION 1963 Bachelor of science degree, U.S. Air Force Academy, Colorado Springs, Colo. 1971 Master's degree in military history and political science, Duke University, N.C. 1976 Army War College, Carlisle Barracks, Pa.
ASSIGNMENTS 1. June 1963 - September 1964, pilot training, 3576th Student Squadron, Vance Air Force Base, Okla. 2. September 1964 - May 1967, T-37 flight training instructor, 3575th Pilot Training Squadron, Vance Air Force Base, Okla. 3. May 1967 - December 1967, flight examiner, 3575th Pilot Training Wing, Vance Air Force Base, Okla. 4. December 1967 - June 1968, F-100 combat crew training, Luke Air Force Base, Ariz. 5. June 1968 - December 1968, F-100 fighter pilot, 510th Tactical Fighter Squadron, Bien Hoa Air Base, South Vietnam 6. December 1968 - April 1969, Operation Commando Sabre F-100 forward air controller, 37th Tactical Fighter Wing, South Vietnam 7. April 1969 - September 1969, F-100 fighter pilot, 510th Tactical Fighter Squadron, Bien Hoa Air Base, South Vietnam 8. September 1969 - December 1970, student, history; preparation for U.S. Air Force Academy instructor, Duke University, Air Force Institute of Technology, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio 9. December 1970 - April 1973, history instructor, U.S. Air Force Academy, Colorado Springs, Colo. 10. April 1973 - August 1974, F-4D/E flight commander, 421st Tactical Fighter Squadron, Udorn Royal Thai Air Force Base, Thailand 11. August 1974 - July 1975, chief, rated officer career planning section, Headquarters Air Reserve Personnel Center, Lowry Air Force Base, Colo. 12. July 1975 - August 1976, student officer, U.S. Army War College, Carlisle Barracks, Pa. 13. August 1976 - February 1978, assistant deputy commander for operations, later, chief of the standardization and evaluation division, 36th Tactical Fighter Wing, Bitburg Air Base, West Germany 14. March 1978 - June 1979, deputy commander for operations, 32nd Tactical Fighter Squadron, Camp New Amsterdam, Netherlands 15. June 1979 - August 1981, chief, tactical forces division, directorate of programs, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 16. August 1981 - June 1982, vice commander, 388th Tactical Fighter Wing, Hill Air Force Base, Utah 17. June 1982 - March 1983, director of fighter operations, deputy chief of staff, operations, Headquarters Tactical Air Command, Langley Air Force Base, Va. 18. March 1983 - August 1984, commander, 56th Tactical Training Wing, MacDill Air Force Base, Fla. 19. August 1984 - March 1986, commander, 836th Air Division, Davis-Monthan Air Force Base, Ariz. 20. March 1986 - January 1988, deputy director, programs and evaluation, Office of the Deputy Chief of Staff, programs and resources; chairman, Programs Review Committee, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 21. January 1988 - June 1990, director, programs and evaluation, and chairman, Air Staff Board, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 22. July 1990 - August 1992, commander, 7th Air Force, deputy commander in chief, United Nations Command; deputy commander, U.S. Forces Korea; and commander, Republic of Korea/U.S. Air Component Command, Combined Forces Command, Osan Air Base, Korea 23. August 1992 - October 1994, CINCUSTRANSCOM; commander, AMC, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 24. October 1994 - August 1997, chief of staff, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C.
FLIGHT INFORMATION Rating: Command pilot, parachutist Flight hours: More than 6,800, including 806 combat hours Aircraft flown: T-37, T-33, F-100, F-4, F-15, F-16, A-10, C-21 and C-141 Pilot wings from: Republic of Korea, Romania and Thailand
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Defense Distinguished Service Medal with two oak leaf clusters Air Force Distinguished Service Medal with oak leaf cluster Army Distinguished Service Medal Navy Distinguished Service Medal Silver Star Legion of Merit with oak leaf cluster Distinguished Flying Cross with oak leaf cluster Purple Heart Meritorious Service Medal Air Medal with 17 oak leaf clusters Aerial Achievement Medal Air Force Commendation Medal with two oak leaf clusters Vietnam Service Medal with three service stars Order of National Security Merit, Kooksun, Republic of Korea Republic of Vietnam Gallantry Cross with Palm Venezuelan Air Force Cross, First Class Knight Grand Cross, First Class, of the Most Noble Order of the Crown of Thailand Grand Cordon, First Class, of the Rising Sun, Japan Royal Order, First Class, of the Polar Star, Sweden Legion of Merit, System of Cooperation among American Air Forces Legion of Honor, with the rank of Commander, France
OTHER ACHIEVEMENTS Fellow, Inter University Seminar on Armed Forces and Society Member, Council on Foreign Relations, New York City Lance P. Sijan USAF Leadership Award H.H. Arnold Trophy
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant Jun 5, 1963 First Lieutenant Dec 5, 1964 Captain Mar 10, 1967 Major Mar 1, 1971 Lieutenant Colonel May 1, 1975 Colonel Jan 1, 1980 Brigadier General Oct 1, 1985 Major General Feb 1, 1988 Lieutenant General Jul 1, 1990 General Sep 1, 1992
(Current as of August 1997)
|
|
|
|
|