Dr. Jonathan Woodson | January 10, 2011 - Present |
Dr. George Peach Taylor, Jr.
(Performing the Duties of the ASD/HA) | September 7, 2010 - January 9, 2011 |
Dr. Charles L. Rice
(Performing the Duties of the ASD/HA) | March 1, 2010 - September 6, 2010 |
Allen W. Middleton
(Performing the Duties of the ASD/HA) | February 1, 2010 - February 28, 2010 |
Ellen P. Embrey
(Performing the Duties of the ASD/HA) | April 29, 2009 - January 31, 2010 |
Dr. S. Ward Casscells | April 12, 2007 - April 28, 2009 |
Dr. William Winkenwerder | October 29, 2001 - April 12, 2007 |
Dr. J. Jarrett Clinton | August 14, 2000 - October 29, 2001 |
Dr. Sue Bailey | May 26, 1998 - August 14, 2000 |
Gary Christopherson (Acting) | March 1, 1998 - May 25, 1998 |
Dr. Edward D. Martin (Acting) | April 1, 1997 - February 28, 1998 |
Dr. Stephen C. Joseph | March 23, 1994 - March 31, 1997 |
Dr. Edward D. Martin (Acting) | January 20, 1993 - March 23, 1994 |
Dr. Enrique Mendez | March 5, 1990 - January 20, 1993 |
Dr. William Mayer | November 18, 1983 - April 21, 1989 |
Vernon McKenzie (Acting) | September 25, 1983 - November 17, 1983 |
Dr. John Beary (Acting) | August 10, 1981 - September 24, 1983 |
Dr. John Moxley III | September 14, 1979 - August 9, 1981 |
Vernon McKenzie (Acting) | January 8, 1978 - August 14, 1979 |
Dr. Robert N. Smith | August 30, 1976 - January 7, 1978 |