|
Information > Biographies > BRIGADIER GENERAL JOHN G. JERNIGAN |
|
BRIGADIER GENERAL JOHN G. JERNIGAN
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Sep. 1, 1999.
Brig. Gen. (Dr.) John G. Jernigan is commander of the 311th Human Systems Wing, Brooks Air Force Base, Texas. The organization is the Air Force home of science and technology related to the integration of human factors in Air Force systems. Recognizing that people are the key to all Air Force endeavors, the wing focuses on human-centered research, development, acquisition and aeromedical operational support.
The general earned a bachelor's degree from the U.S. Air Force Academy where he was named a distinguished graduate in 1970. After receiving a doctor of medicine degree from the University of Oklahoma in 1974 and completing a residency in aerospace medicine, he began his career as chief of aeromedical services, then served as chief of clinic services at Randolph Air Force Base.
The general has served as chief of aerospace medicine at Mather Air Force Base and as chief of aerospace medicine and hospital commander at Royal Air Force Upper Heyford. He has served as deputy commander and wing surgeon for aeromedical evacuation at Scott Air Force Base, then as commander of the USAF Hospital at the academy. The general became director of professional services and deputy surgeon, Office of the Command Surgeon, Military Airlift Command, then commander of the USAF Medical Center at Scott Air Force Base, before being assigned as command surgeon at Headquarters Pacific Air Forces, Hickam Air Force Base. He then served as command surgeon of U.S. Transportation Command and Air Mobility Command, Scott Air Force Base.
EDUCATION 1970 Bachelor of science degree, U.S. Air Force Academy, Colorado Springs, Colo. 1974 Doctor of medicine degree, University of Oklahoma 1976 Master's degree in public health, University of Oklahoma 1986 Industrial College of the Armed Forces, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C.
ASSIGNMENTS 1. July 1977 - August 1980, chief, aeromedical services, USAF Clinic, Randolph Air Force Base, Texas 2. August 1980 - July 1983, chief, aeromedical services, USAF Hospital, Mather Air Force Base, Calif. 3. July 1983 - August 1985, chief, aeromedical services, later, acting hospital commander, later, chief, aerospace medicine, USAF Hospital, Royal Air Force Upper Heyford, England 4. August 1985 - June 1986, student, Industrial College of the Armed Forces, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C. 5. June 1986 - September 1988, deputy commander, aeromedical evacuation, 375th Aeromedical Airlift Wing, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 6. September 1988 - August 1991, command surgeon and hospital commander, USAF Hospital, U.S. Air Force Academy, Colorado Springs, Colo. 7. August 1991 - July 1992, deputy command surgeon and director of professional services, Headquarters Military Airlift Command, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 8. July 1992 - June 1993, commander, USAF Medical Center, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 9. June 1993 - April 1995, command surgeon, Headquarters Pacific Air Forces, Hickam Air Force Base, Hawaii 10. April 1995 - July 1997, command surgeon, U.S. Transportation Command and Air Mobility Command, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 11. August 1997 - September 1998, commander, Human Systems Center, Brooks Air Force Base, Texas 12. October 1998 - present, commander, 311th Human Systems Wing, Brooks Air Force Base, Texas
FLIGHT INFORMATION Rating: Chief flight surgeon Flight hours: More than 1,050 Aircraft flown: C-9, C-21A, C-141A, F-111A, KC-135A, T-37, T-38 , T-43A, F-4, F-16 and B-52
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Defense Superior Service Medal Legion of Merit with oak leaf cluster Meritorious Service Medal with three oak leaf clusters Air Force Achievement Medal
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant Jun 3, 1970 First Lieutenant Dec 3, 1971 Captain Jun 3, 1973 Major Jun 3, 1977 Lieutenant Colonel Nov 6, 1981 Colonel Sep 29, 1985 Brigadier General Sep 1, 1996
(Current as of November 1998)
|
|
|
|
|