|
Information > Biographies > BRIGADIER GENERAL (DR.) DAN L. LOCKER |
|
BRIGADIER GENERAL (DR.) DAN L. LOCKER
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Aug. 1, 2002.
Brig. Gen. (Dr.) Dan L. Locker is Commander, 81st Medical Group, Keesler Air Force Base, Miss. He is also lead agent for the Department of Defense Health Services Region IV. As commander, he is responsible for the direct delivery of health care to more than 50,000 patients in the Keesler Air Force Base area, and for providing referral and consultative services to an additional 605,000 beneficiaries in a five-state region. General Locker ensures the availability of major war and peacetime medical readiness response forces, and directs all managed health care activities in Department of Defense Region IV. Additional responsibilities include direction of five graduate medical education programs, the only DOD clinical genetics laboratory and an extensive clinical research program by one of three Air Force clinical research laboratories. He leads more than 2,000 health care professionals and manages a local budget of $179 million, and a regional managed care contract of $3.8 billion.
General Locker was commissioned in the Air Force Reserve in May 1970, and entered active-duty in June 1972. He is a chief physician, certified by the American Board of Surgery, and an active chief flight surgeon with more than 920 hours flying time, including 21 combat missions. He remains clinically active as a surgeon. General Locker has served as military consultant to the Air Force Surgeon General for general surgery, and as Director of Medical Service Officer Management. He has commanded two other Air Force hospitals and was the command surgeon for U.S. Air Forces in Europe.
EDUCATION 1967 Bachelor of science degree in biology, Southwest Texas State College, San Marcos 1973 Doctor of medicine, University of Texas Medical School, San Antonio 1973 Aerospace Medicine Primary Course, Brooks Air Force Base, Texas 1987 Executive Management Course for Chiefs of Hospital Services, Sheppard Air Force Base, Texas 1989 Executive Management Course for Hospital Commanders, Sheppard Air Force Base, Texas 1994 Interagency Course for Health Care Executives, George Washington University, Washington, D.C. 1998 Capstone, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C. 2000 Medical Capstone, Walter Reed Medical Center, Washington, D.C.
ASSIGNMENTS 1. June 1972 - June 1973, student, Senior Medical Student Program, University of Texas 2. June 1973 - June 1975, residency in family practice, U.S. Air Force Medical Center, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 3. July 1975 - June 1979, residency in general surgery, U.S. Air Force Medical Center, Keesler Air Force Base, Miss. 4. July 1979 - June 1983, Chief, Surgical Services, 366th Tactical Fighter Wing, Mountain Home Air Force Base, Idaho 5. June 1983 - August 1986, Chief of General Surgery, Director, U.S. Air Forces in Europe Flying Ambulance Surgical Trauma teams, and Military Consultant to the Surgeon General, U.S. Air Force Regional Medical Center, Wiesbaden, West Germany 6. August 1986 - July 1989, Deputy Commander for Hospital Services, 48th Tactical Fighter Wing, Royal Air Force Lakenheath, England 7. July 1989 - September 1991, Commander, 96th Strategic Hospital, Dyess Air Force Base, Texas 8. October 1991 - August 1994, Commander, 82nd Medical Group, Sheppard Air Force Base, Texas 9. August 1994 - August 1995, Director, Medical Service Officer Management, Air Force Military Personnel Center, Randolph Air Force Base Texas 10. August 1995 - July 1997, Command Surgeon, Headquarters U.S. Air Forces in Europe, Ramstein Air Base, Germany 11. July 1997- present, Commander, 81st Medical Group, Keesler Air Force Base, Miss.
FLIGHT INFORMATION Rating: Chief flight surgeon Flight hours: More than 920 Aircraft flown: B-1, C-5, C-9, C-12, C-20, C-130, AC-130U, C-141, KC-135, F-4, F-15, F-16, F-111, T-1, T-6, T-33, T-38, UH-1N, HH-60 and MH-53J
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Defense Superior Service Medal Legion of Merit with oak leaf cluster Defense Meritorious Service Medal Meritorious Service Medal with three oak leaf clusters Air Force Commendation Medal
OTHER ACHIEVEMENTS 1979 Surgeon General's Award for General Surgery 1981, 1991 Chief physician certification, American Board of Surgery 1986 Consultant to the Surgeon General For General Surgery 2001 Southwestern Texas State University Distinguished Alumnus 2002 Society of Air Force Clinical Surgeons Excalibur Award for outstanding service
PROFESSIONAL MEMBERSHIPS AND ASSOCIATIONS Diplomat of the American Board of Surgery Fellow of the American College of Surgeons Society of Air Force Clinical Surgeons
PUBLICATIONS "A Prospective Randomized Study of Drained and Undrained Cholestectomics," American Surgeon, October 1983 "A Technique of Long-Term Continent Gastrostomy Surgery," Gynecology and Obstetrics, January 1985
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant May 8, 1970 First Lieutenant May 8, 1973 Captain May 26, 1973 Major May 26, 1976 Lieutenant Colonel May 26, 1981 Colonel May 26, 1987 Brigadier General Jul 1, 1997
(Current as of August 2002)
|
|
|
|
|