|
Information > Biographies > MAJOR GENERAL TIMOTHY P. MALISHENKO |
|
MAJOR GENERAL TIMOTHY P. MALISHENKO
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired April 1, 2001.
Maj. Gen. Timothy P. Malishenko is director, Defense Contract Management Agency, Fort Belvoir, Va. The agency is responsible for providing the Army, Navy, Air Force, Marine Corps and other defense agencies with contract management services in peacetime and war. This mission is performed by approximately 13,000 civilian and military people around the world.
The general was commissioned a second lieutenant after completing the Air Force ROTC program at Ohio State University in 1968 as a distinguished graduate. He has served in a range of acquisition-related positions, to include the contract management, space aeronautical, international and electronic systems fields.
EDUCATION 1968 Bachelor of science degree in business administration, Ohio State University, Columbus 1969 Master of science degree in business administration, Michigan State University, East Lansing 1972 Master of science degree in systems management, University of Southern California 1973 Squadron Officer School, Maxwell Air Force Base, Ala. 1979 Distinguished graduate, Armed Forces Staff College, Norfolk, Va. 1987 National War College, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C.
ASSIGNMENTS 1. September 1969 - December 1969, student, procurement officer course, Lowry Air Force Base, Colo. 2. December 1969 - May 1973, contract specialist, later, administrative contracting officer, Air Force Plant Representatives Office, Hughes Aircraft Co., Culver City, Calif. 3. May 1973 - June 1974, procurement staff management officer, Air Staff Training Program, Deputy Chief of Staff for Logistics, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 4. June 1974 - November 1976, deputy plant representative, later, plant representative, Secretary of the Air Force Special Projects Office, Sunnyvale Air Force Station, Calif. 5. December 1976 - December 1978, deputy division chief for procurement, Secretary of the Air Force Special Projects Office, Los Angeles Air Force Station, Calif. 6. January 1979 - June 1979, student, Armed Forces Staff College, Norfolk, Va. 7. July 1979 - June 1982, chief, contracts and acquisition, NATO E-3A, North Atlantic Treaty Organization Airborne Early Warning and Control Programme Management Agency, Brunssum, the Netherlands 8. June 1982 - May 1984, deputy director of research and development contracting, Aeronautical Systems Division, Air Force Systems Command, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio 9. June 1984 - July 1986, director of contracting, Office of the Deputy for Aeronautical Equipment, Aeronautical Systems Division, Air Force Systems Command, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio 10. August 1986 - June 1987, student, National War College, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C. 11. June 1987 - September 1987, member, Air Force General Officer Review Group, the Pentagon, Washington, D.C. 12. October 1987 - April 1988, chief, Contract Support Division, Directorate of Contracting and Manufacturing Policy, Office of the Assistant Secretary of the Air Force for Acquisition, Washington, D.C. 13. May 1988 - August 1989, chief, Systems and Logistics Contracting Division, Directorate of Contracting and Manufacturing Policy, Office of the Assistant Secretary of the Air Force for Acquisition, Washington, D.C. 14. September 1989 - September 1990, assistant deputy assistant secretary of the Air Force for contracting, Directorate of Contracting Policy, Office of the Assistant Secretary of the Air Force for Acquisition, Washington, D.C. 15. September 1990 - July 1993, director of contracting, Electronic Systems Center, Air Force Materiel Command, Hanscom Air Force Base, Mass. 16. August 1993 - March 1994, deputy director of contracting, Headquarters Air Force Materiel Command, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio 17. April 1994 - July 1995, director of contracting, Headquarters Air Force Materiel Command, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio 18. July 1995 - September 1997, deputy assistant secretary for contracting, Office of the Assistant Secretary of the Air Force for Acquisition, and Air Force competition advocate general, the Pentagon, Washington, D.C. 19. September 1997 - March 2000, commander, Defense Contract Management Command, Fort Belvoir, Va. 20. March 2000 - present, director, Defense Contract Management Agency, Fort Belvoir, Va.
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Distinguished Service Medal Legion of Merit with oak leaf cluster Defense Meritorious Service Medal Meritorious Service Medal with two oak leaf clusters
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant Jun 7, 1968 First Lieutenant Sep 26, 1970 Captain Mar 26, 1972 Major Sep 1, 1978 Lieutenant Colonel Dec 1, 1982 Colonel Dec 1, 1985 Brigadier General Jul 15, 1994 Major General Mar 20, 1998
PUBLISHED ARTICLES 1987 "Congressional Dynamics of the Military Reform Caucus", National Contract Management Journal
(Current as of April 2000)
|
|
|
|
|