|
Information > Biographies > BRIGADIER GENERAL ANTHONY W. "BUD" BELL JR. |
|
BRIGADIER GENERAL ANTHONY W. "BUD" BELL JR.
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Oct. 1, 2001.
Brig. Gen. Anthony W. "Bud" Bell Jr. is director for command, control, communications and computer systems, U.S. Joint Forces Command, Norfolk Naval Base, Va. He is responsible for developing information technology policy, plans, resource allocation and programs to enable the command to carry out its mission of joint force integrator, trainer and provider. The director's staff consists of more than 200 military, government civilians and contractor personnel who provide information technology expertise and support to headquarters and subordinate commands.
The general was commissioned as a distinguished graduate of the Air Force ROTC program in 1971. He has held various assignments in communications, as well as command positions at detachment, squadron and group levels.
EDUCATION 1970 Bachelor of arts degree in philosophy, Duquesne University, Pittsburgh, Pa. 1973 Squadron Officer School, by correspondence 1975 Air Command and Staff College, by correspondence 1977 Master of science degree in international relations, European Extension Program, Troy State University 1979 Squadron Officer School, Maxwell Air Force Base, Ala. 1984 Armed Forces Staff College, Va. 1988 Air War College, by correspondence 1991 Industrial College of the Armed Forces, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C.
ASSIGNMENTS 1. March 1971 - November 1971, student, basic communications maintenance officer course, Keesler Air Force Base, Miss. 2. November 1971 - March 1974, communications maintenance officer, 1943rd Communications Squadron, Pope Air Force Base, N.C. 3. April 1974 - April 1975, commander, Detachment 4, 1931st Communications Group, Galena Airport, Alaska 4. April 1975 - August 1976, communications staff officer, Headquarters U.S. Air Forces in Europe, Wiesbaden Air Base, West Germany 5. August 1976 - August 1977, communications manager, Headquarters U.S. Air Forces in Europe, Ramstein Air Base, West Germany 6. August 1977 - August 1979, commander and community commander, 2181st Communications Squadron, Mt. Vergine, Italy 7. August 1979 - December 1979, student, Squadron Officer School, Maxwell Air Force Base, Ala. 8. December 1979 - May 1981, executive officer to the commander, Northern Communications Area, Griffiss Air Force Base, N.Y. 9. May 1981 - July 1983, commander, 2015th Communications Squadron, Randolph Air Force Base, Texas 10. August 1983 - January 1984, student, Armed Forces Staff College, Norfolk, Va. 11. January 1984 - June 1988, action officer; program element monitor; later, joint reader; and later, executive officer to the assistant chief of staff for systems for command, control, communications and computers, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 12. July 1988 - July 1990, commander, 1972nd Communications Group, Eglin Air Force Base, Fla. 13. July 1990 - June 1991, student, Industrial College of the Armed Forces, Washington, D.C. 14. June 1991 - May 1994, chief of plans, command, control, communications and computer systems, U.S. Transportation Command, Scott Air Force Base, Ill. 15. June 1994 - July 1996, director of communications-computer systems, Headquarters Air Education and Training Command, Randolph Air Force Base, Texas 16. August 1996 - April 1997, director of communications and information, Headquarters Air Education and Training Command, Randolph Air Force Base, Texas 17. April 1997 - July 1998, director of systems, Air Force Communications and Information Center, the Pentagon, Washington, D.C. 18. July 1998 - August 2000, vice commander, Air Force Communications and Information Center, Washington, D.C. 19. August 2000 - present, director for command, control, communications and computer systems, U.S. Joint Forces Command, Norfolk Naval Base, Va.
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Defense Superior Service Medal Legion of Merit Meritorious Service Medal with six oak leaf clusters Air Force Commendation Medal Air Force Achievement Medal Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal
OTHER ACHIEVEMENTS 1977 U.S. Air Force Communication Electronics Professional Achievement Award
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant Mar 6, 1971 First Lieutenant Mar 6, 1973 Captain Mar 6, 1975 Major Nov 1, 1982 Lieutenant Colonel Mar 1, 1986 Colonel Dec 1, 1991 Brig Gen Sep 1, 1998
(Current as of September 2000)
PUBLISHED ARTICLES "Corporate Information Management in Defense Transportation," Defense Transportation Journal, September - October 1993
|
|
|
|
|