|
Information > Biographies > MAJOR GENERAL DANIEL M. DICK |
|
MAJOR GENERAL DANIEL M. DICK
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired July 1, 2003.
Maj. Gen. Daniel M. Dick is Director for Requirements and Integration, U.S. Joint Forces Command, Norfolk, Va. The Requirements and Integration Directorate participates in the Department of Defense resource allocation process as an advocate for joint requirements; advances and enforces the interoperability of legacy command, control, communications, computers and intelligence systems, and future joint warfighting systems; oversees the department's requirements for theater air and missile defense, combat identification and close air support mission areas in order to achieve the coherent joint forces envisioned in Joint Vision 2020.
General Dick received his Air Force commission through the ROTC program at Virginia Tech in 1970. A distinguished graduate of undergraduate pilot training, he has served as an F-4 and F-16 instructor pilot, and as an aide and special assistant to commanders at Tactical Air Command and Air Combat Command respectively. General Dick has commanded an operational F-16 fighter squadron, an F-16 fighter wing, the Air Forces largest composite wing, and a numbered Air Force. He is a command pilot with more than 3,600 flying hours, including 155 combat hours and 51 missions over Iraq.
EDUCATION 1970 Bachelor of science degree in industrial engineering, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University, Blacksburg 1976 Squadron Officer School, by correspondence 1979 Master of science degree in management, Troy State University 1981 Air Command and Staff College, by seminar 1986 Air War College, by seminar 1989 National War College, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C.
ASSIGNMENTS 1. September 1970 - September 1971, student, undergraduate pilot training, Reese Air Force Base, Texas 2. October 1971 - June 1972, student, F-4 Replacement Training Unit, Luke AFB, Ariz. 3. June 1972 - July 1976, F-4 pilot, 50th Tactical Fighter Wing, Hahn Air Base, West Germany 4. July 1976 - March 1979, F-4 instructor pilot, 81st Tactical Fighter Wing, Royal Air Force Bentwaters, England 5. March 1979 - June 1982, F-4G Wild Weasel instructor pilot, George AFB, Calif. 6. June 1982 - September 1984, aide to the commander, Tactical Air Command, Langley AFB, Va. 7. October 1984 - February 1985, student, F-16 Replacement Training Unit, MacDill AFB, Fla. 8. February 1985 - July 1986, Chief of Operations, Training Division, 363rd Tactical Fighter Wing, Shaw AFB, S.C. 9. July 1986 - December 1986, operations officer, 17th Tactical Fighter Squadron, Shaw AFB, S.C. 10. December 1986 - August 1988, Commander, 33rd Tactical Fighter Squadron, Shaw AFB, S.C. 11. August 1988 - June 1989, student, National War College, Fort Lesley J. McNair, Washington, D.C. 12. July 1989 - June 1991, Assistant Chief of Staff, Exercise Division, Headquarters Fourth Allied Tactical Air Force, Heidelberg, Germany 13. August 1991 - August 1992, Special Assistant to the Commander, Headquarters ACC, Langley AFB, Va. 14. August 1992 - May 1994, Vice Commander, 347th Fighter Wing, Moody AFB, Ga. 15. May 1994 - April 1995, Commander, 388th Fighter Wing, Hill AFB, Utah 16. May 1995 - June 1996, Inspector General, Headquarters ACC, Langley AFB, Va. 17. June 1996 - June 1997, Commander, 4404th Wing (Provisional), Prince Sultan AB, Saudi Arabia 18. July 1997 - July 1998, Director of Plans and Programs, Headquarters ACC, Langley AFB, Va. 19. July 1998 - May 1999, Vice Commander, 12th Air Force, Davis-Monthan AFB, Ariz. 20. May 1999 - November 2000, Commander, 13th Air Force, Andersen AFB, Guam 21. November 2000 - present, Director for Requirements and Integration, U.S. Joint Forces Command, Norfolk, Va.
FLIGHT INFORMATION Rating: Command pilot Flight hours: More than 3,600 Aircraft flown: F-4, F-16 and C-21
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Distinguished Service Medal Defense Superior Service Medal with oak leaf cluster Legion of Merit Defense Meritorious Service Medal Meritorious Service Medal with four oak leaf clusters Air Medal with oak leaf cluster Aerial Achievement Medal Air Force Commendation Medal
OTHER ACHIEVEMENTS 1996 Moller Trophy for outstanding wing commander, ACC
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant Jun 6, 1970 First Lieutenant Mar 24, 1972 Captain Jun 24, 1974 Major Nov 1, 1981 Lieutenant Colonel Mar 1, 1985 Colonel Jan 1, 1991 Brigadier General Oct 1, 1995 Major General Aug 1, 1998
(Current as of July 2003)
|
|
|
|
|