|
Information > Biographies > DENNIS J. CASSETTE |
|
DENNIS J. CASSETTE
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Sep. 2, 2006.
Dennis J. Cassette, a member of the Senior Executive Service, is Director of Engineering, Engineering and Technical Management Directorate, Aeronautical Systems Center, Air Force Materiel Command, Wright-Patterson Air Force Base, Ohio. He provides overall technical management for the development and support of major weapons systems across the aeronautical enterprise at ASC with annual expenditures of more than $10 billion. He is responsible for the proper allocation and expenditure of fiscal and personnel resources while providing engineering and technical management tools to the weapon system program offices charged with developing, fielding and supporting technologically advanced weapon systems.
Mr. Cassette has extensive experience in developing Air Force policy and in the technical management of Air Force systems managed by Air Force Materiel Command. His experience covers technical acquisition and development of aeronautical weapons systems on fighter, bomber and cargo aircraft.
Prior to assuming his current position, Mr. Cassette was Director of Engineering, Propulsion Product Group for ASC, where he was responsible for the technical quality of Air Force programs for the research, development, sustainment and disposal of Air Force propulsion systems.
EDUCATION 1970 Bachelor of Science degree in electrical engineering, University of Detroit 1975 Master of Arts degree in industrial management, Central Michigan University 1985 Industrial College of the Armed Forces, by correspondence 1986 Master of Science degree, Alfred P. Sloan Fellow, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Cambridge, Mass. 1991 Advanced Systems Management Course, Defense Systems Management College, Fort Belvoir, Va. 2004 Senior Managers in Government Course, John F. Kennedy School of Government, Harvard University, Cambridge, Mass.
CAREER CHRONOLOGY 1. August 1967 - May 1970, trainee, Electro-Optical Section, Electrical Engineering Directorate, and Director of Flight Test, 4950th Test Wing, Aeronautical Systems Division, Air Force Systems Command, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 2. May 1970 - July 1976, electronic flight test engineer, Electro-Optical Section, 4950th Test Wing, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 3. July 1976 - January 1979, electronics flight test engineer and technical lead for radar and electro-optical equipment, 4950th Test Wing, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 4. June 1979 - December 1980, Chief, Electro-Optical Branch, 4950th Test Wing, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 5. December 1980 - November 1981, Chief, Navigation and Communication Branch, 4950th Test Wing, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 6. November 1981 - April 1984, Deputy Chief, Electronic Combat Division, 4950th Test Wing, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 7. April 1984 - June 1985, Chief, Electronic Combat Division, 4950th Test Wing, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 8. June 1985 - June 1986, Alfred P. Sloan Fellow, Massachusetts Institute of Technology, Cambridge, Mass. 9. June 1986 - March 1987, Chief Systems Engineer, Reconnaissance Systems Program Office - Special Programs, ASD, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 10. March 1987 - September 1992, Chief Avionics Engineer, B-2 SPO, ASC, AFMC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 11. September 1992 - April 1994, Chief, Engineering Division, Program Development SPO, ASC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 12. April1994 - January 1995, Chief, Integration Engineer and Technical Management, Directorate Resources Management Branch, ASC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 13. January 1995 - May 1996, Deputy Director of Engineering and Chief Engineer, F-16 SPO, ASC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 14. May 1996 - October 1998, Director of Engineering, F-16 SPO, ASC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 15. October 1998 - June 1999, Technical Director, F-16 SPO, ASC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 16. June 1999 - July 2001, Technical Director, Engineering and Technical Management, Headquarters AFMC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 17. July 2001 - September 2002, Technical Director, C-17 SPO, ASC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 18. September 2002 - August 2003, Director of Engineering, Propulsion Product Group, ASC, AFMC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio 19. August 2003 - present, Director of Engineering, Engineering and Technical Management Directorate, ASC, AFMC, Wright-Patterson AFB, Ohio
AWARDS AND HONORS 1992 Certificate of Merit, AFSC 1992 Engineering and Manufacturing Significant Achievement Award, ASC 1992 Chief Engineer of the Year, AFMC 1996 Chief Engineer of the Year, ASC 1996 Letter of Commendation from Lt. Gen. Eickmann for Outstanding Chief Engineer 1992 and 2001 Meritorious Civilian Service Award Achievment Award for Sustained Superior Performance (cash awards every year)
OTHER ACHIEVEMENTS 1979 President of the Society of Flight Test Engineers 1990 - 1992 President of St. Christopher's Financial and Education Committee 1994 - 1995 Vice President, Vandalia-Butler School Board of Education 1996 President, Vandalia-Butler School Board of Education Civilian Flying Status: Test flight missions in F-100, F-4, T-39, C-135, C-141, C-130, C-21 and C-131
PROFESSIONAL CERTIFICATIONS Systems Planning Research, Development and Engineering, Level III, Acquisition Professional Development Program Program Management, Level III, APDP
(Current as of August 2004)
|
|
|
|
|