|
Information > Biographies > MAJOR GENERAL GARY A. WINTERBERGER |
|
MAJOR GENERAL GARY A. WINTERBERGER
|
|
|
Bio Tools |
|
|
|
Retired Jan. 1, 2006.
Maj. Gen. Gary A. Winterberger is Commander, NATO Airborne Early Warning and Control Force Command, Casteau, Belgium, co-located with Supreme Headquarters Allied Powers Europe. The general leads and is responsible for an international military and civilian staff representing 14 nations of NATO as they fulfill the mission tasking of the Supreme Allied Commander Europe. The NAEW&C Force Command is NATO's only operational command.
General Winterberger completed high school in Boulder, Colo., in 1967. Since graduating from the U.S. Air Force Academy in 1972, he has held a variety of jobs including positions in acquisition, force programming and plans; served as an executive officer; and has commanded a B-52 squadron, a technical training group and undergraduate flying training wing. In his last assignment, General Winterberger served as Commander of the NATO Airborne Early Warning and Control Force E-3A Component at NATO Air Base Geilenkirchen, Germany.
EDUCATION 1972 Bachelor of Science degree in political science, U.S. Air Force Academy, Colorado Springs, Colo. 1976 Master of Science degree in general studies, Arkansas State University 1976 Squadron Officer School, Maxwell Air Force Base, Ala. 1984 Armed Forces Staff College, Norfolk, Va. 1990 Air War College, Maxwell AFB, Ala. 1991 Seminar XXI, Foreign Political and International Relations, Massachusetts Institute of Technology 1992 Program for Senior Officials in National Security, Harvard University 2000 Joint Flag Officer Warfighting Course, Maxwell AFB, Ala. 2000 Ukrainian National Security Program, Harvard University 2001 NATO Defense College, Mediterranean Dialogue, Rome, Italy
ASSIGNMENTS 1. September 1972 - September 1973, student, pilot training, Sheppard AFB, Texas 2. March 1974 - January 1979, B-52G co-pilot, later, B-52G aircraft commander and flight commander, 340th Bombardment Squadron, Blytheville AFB, Ark. 3. April 1979 - June 1980, B-52G instructor pilot and standardization and evaluation instructor pilot, 340th Bombardment Squadron, Blytheville AFB, Ark. 4. June 1980 - June 1982, Bomber System Acquisition Manager, Headquarters Strategic Air Command, Offutt AFB, Neb. 5. June 1982 - January 1984, special assistant to the Chief of Staff, later, executive officer to the Chief of Staff, Headquarters Strategic Air Command, Offutt AFB, Neb. 6. January 1984 - July 1984, student, Armed Forces Staff College, Norfolk, Va. 7. July 1984 - July 1986, Strategic Forces Programmer, Directorate of Programs and Evaluations, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 8. July 1986 - April 1987, Chief of Bomber Programming, Directorate of Programs and Evaluations, Headquarters U.S. Air Force, Washington, D.C. 9. April 1987 -August 1989, Commander, 20th Bombardment Squadron, Carswell AFB, Texas 10. August 1989 - July 1990, student, Air War College, Maxwell AFB, Ala. 11. July 1990 - September 1992, Director of Strategic Programs, Acquisition, Strategic, Theater and Nuclear Force Directorate, Office of the Secretary of Defense, Washington, D.C. 12. September 1992 - July 1994, Commander, 37th Training Group, Lackland AFB, Texas 13. August 1994 - January 1996, Chief, Operations Division, 2nd Air Force, Keesler AFB, Miss. 14. January 1996 - January 1998, Wing Commander, 47th Flying Training Wing, Laughlin AFB, Texas 15. February 1998 - May 1998, special assistant to the Commander, Air Education and Training Command, Randolph AFB, Texas 16. May 1998 - September 2000, Director of Plans and Programs, Air Education and Training Command, Randolph AFB, Texas 17. September 2000 - September 2003, Commander, NATO Airborne Early Warning and Control Force E-3A Component, NATO Air Base Geilenkirchen, Germany 18. September 2003 - present, Commander, NATO Airborne Early Warning and Control Force Command, Casteau, Belgium
FLIGHT INFORMATION Rating: Command pilot Flight hours: More than 5,300 Aircraft flown: B-52, T-38, E-3, C-12, T-1, T-37, C-18, B707-300C and T-39
MAJOR AWARDS AND DECORATIONS Defense Superior Service Medal Legion of Merit with oak leaf cluster Defense Meritorious Service Medal Meritorious Service Medal with three oak leaf clusters Joint Service Commendation Medal Air Force Commendation Medal Kosovo Campaign Medal with bronze star
EFFECTIVE DATES OF PROMOTION Second Lieutenant June 7, 1972 First Lieutenant June 7, 1974 Captain June 7, 1976 Major Nov. 1, 1982 Lieutenant Colonel March 1, 1986 Colonel Dec. 1, 1991 Brigadier General Oct. 1, 1998 Major General Feb. 1, 2002
(Current as of October 2005)
|
|
|
|
|