Dr. J.W. Edgar — March 1950 – June 30, 1974
Dr. M.L. Brockette — July 1, 1974 – August 31, 1979
Alton O. Bowen — September 1, 1979 – May 31, 1981
Raymon L. Bynum — June 1, 1981 – October 31, 1984
Dr. William N. Kirby — November 1, 1984 – April 12, 1985 ( Interim )
April 13, 1985 – January 31, 1991
Dr. Tom Anderson — February 1, 1991 – June 30, 1991 (Interim)
Dr. Lionel “Skip” Meno — July 1, 1991 – March 1, 1995
Dr. Michael Moses — March 9, 1995 – September 3, 1999
James Nelson — September 9, 1999 – March 31, 2002
Dr. Felipe T. Alanis — April 1, 2002 – July 31, 2003
Robert Scott — August 1, 2003 – January 12, 2004 (Interim)
Dr. Shirley J. Neeley — January 13, 2004 – July 1, 2007
Robert Scott — July 2, 2007 - October 15, 2007 (Interim)
October 16, 2007 - Present
Note: Prior to 1950, the position of Commissioner of Education was titled State Superintendent of Public Instruction and was a statewide elected position.