Railroad Commissioners Past through Present
JOHN H. REAGAN | June 10, 1891 to January 20, 1903 | |
L.L. FOSTER | June 10, 1891 to April 30, 1895 | |
W.P. McLEAN | June 10, 1891 to November 20, 1894 | |
L. J.
STOREY (succeeded W.P. McLean) |
November 21, 1894 to March 28, 1909 | |
N.A.
STEDMAN (succeeded L.L. Foster) |
May 1, 1895 to January 4, 1897 | |
ALLISON
MAYFIELD (succeeded N.A. Stedman) |
January 5, 1897 to January 23, 1923 | |
O.B.
COLQUITT (succeeded John H. Reagan) |
January 21, 1903 to January 17, 1911 | |
WILLIAM
D. WILLIAMS (succeeded L.J. Storey) |
April 28, 1909 to October 1, 1916 | |
JOHN
L. WORTHAM (succeeded O.B. Colquitt) |
January 21, 1911 to January 1, 1913 | |
EARLE
B. MAYFIELD (succeeded John L. Wortham) |
January 2, 1913 to March 1, 1923 | |
CHARLES
H. HURDLESTON (succeeded William D. Williams) |
October 10, 1916 to December 31, 1918 | |
CLARENCE
E. GILMORE (succeeded Charles H. Hurdleston) |
January 1, 1919 to January 1, 1929 | |
N.A.
NABORS (succeeded Allison Mayfield) |
March 1, 1923 to January 18, 1925 | |
WILLIAM
W. SPLAWN (succeeded Earle B. Mayfield) |
March 1, 1923 to August 1, 1924 | |
C.V.
TERRELL (succeeded William W. Splawn) |
August 15, 1924 to January 1, 1939 | |
LON
A. SMITH (succeeded N.A. Nabors) |
January 29, 1925 to January 1, 1941 | |
PAT
M. NEFF (succeeded Clarence Gilmore) |
January 1, 1929 to January 1, 1933 | |
ERNEST
O. THOMPSON (succeeded Pat M. Neff) |
January 1, 1933 to January 8, 1965 | |
JERRY
SADLER (succeeded C.V. Terrell) |
January 1, 1939 to January 1, 1943 | |
OLIN
CULBERSON (succeeded Lon A. Smith) |
January 1, 1941 to June 22, 1961 | |
BEAUFORD
JESTER (succeeded Jerry Sadler) |
January 1, 1943 to January 21, 1947 | |
WILLIAM
J. MURRAY, JR. (succeeded Beauford Jester) |
January 21, 1947 to April 10, 1963 | |
BEN
RAMSEY (succeeded Olin Culberson) |
September 18, 1961 to December 31, 1976 | |
JIM
C. LANGDON (succeeded William J. Murray, Jr.) |
May 28, 1963 to December 31, 1977 | |
BYRON
TUNNELL (succeeded Ernest O. Thompson) |
January 11, 1965 to September 15, 1973 | |
MACK
WALLACE (succeeded Byron Tunnell) |
September 18, 1973 to September 22, 1987 | |
JON
NEWTON (succeeded Ben Ramsey) |
January 10, 1977 to January 3, 1979 | |
JOHN
H. POERNER (succeeded Jim C. Langdon) |
January 2, 1978 to January 1, 1981 | |
JAMES
E. (JIM) NUGENT (succeeded Jon Newton) |
January 4, 1979 to January 2, 1995 | |
BUDDY
TEMPLE (succeeded John H. Poerner) |
January 2, 1981 to March 2, 1986 | |
CLARK
JOBE (succeeded Buddy Temple) |
March 3, 1986 to January 5, 1987 | |
JOHN
SHARP (succeeded Clark Jobe) |
January 6, 1987 to January 22, 1991 | |
KENT
HANCE (succeeded Mack Wallace) |
September 23, 1987 to January 2, 1991 | |
ROBERT
KRUEGER (succeeded Kent Hance) |
January 3, 1991 to February 10, 1993 | |
LENA
GUERRERO (succeeded John Sharp) |
January 23, 1991 to October 1, 1992 | |
JIM
WALLACE (succeeded Lena Guerrero) |
October 2, 1992 to January 4, 1993 | |
BARRY
WILLIAMSON (succeeded Jim Wallace) |
January 5, 1993 to January 3, 1999 | |
MARY
SCOTT NABERS (succeeded Bob Krueger) |
February 10, 1993 to December 9, 1994 | |
CAROLE
KEETON RYLANDER (succeeded Mary Scott Nabers) |
December 10, 1994 to January 3, 1999 | |
CHARLES
R. MATTHEWS (succeeded James E. Nugent) |
January 3, 1995 to January 31, 2005 | |
TONY
GARZA (succeeded Barry Williamson) |
January 4, 1999 to November 18, 2002 | |
MICHAEL
L. WILLIAMS (succeeded Carole Keeton Rylander) |
January 4, 1999 to Present | |
VICTOR G. CARRILLO (succeeded Tony Garza) |
February 19, 2003 to Present | |
ELIZABETH A. JONES (succeeded Charles R. Matthews) |
February 9, 2005 to Present |