Brian McMillen Trooper - District 9 Served: August 6, 2006 to October 28, 2007 |
Rodney T. Miller Sergeant - Zone 5 Served: January 29, 1990 to May 12, 2006 |
Jeffrey Vlcek Master Sergeant - District 15
Served: November 28, 1977 to July 13, 2003 |
Stanley W. Talbot Master Sergeant - District 7 Served: March 11, 1975 to June 23, 2001 |
Erin M. Hehl Sergeant - District Chicago Served: June 15, 1986 to October 30, 1997 |
Anthony Millison Sergeant - District Chicago Served: September 21, 1987 to October 27, 1997 |
Chong S. Lim Trooper - District 15 Served: January 29, 1990 to June 6, 1995 |
Robert L. Kolowski Special Agent - Zone 5 (District 5) Served: July 9, 1973 to February 25, 1993 |
April C. Styburski Trooper - District 2 Served: June 16, 1986 to January 5, 1990 |
Gary Degelman Special Agent - Zone 14 (Zone 4) Served: August 27, 1984 to May 4, 1989 |
Virgil L. Bensyl Sergeant - Zone 10 (Zone 5) Served: July 14, 1969 to January 15, 1988 |
John H. Kugelman Trooper - District 2 Served: October 9, 1983 to November 10, 1986 |
Bernard D. Skeeters Trooper - District 9 Served: March 9, 1970 to May 20, 1982 |
Michael K. McCarter Trooper - District 6A (District 21) Served: March 9, 1970 to April 7, 1979 |
George D. Craggs Corporal - District 9 Served: October 28, 1957 to November 10, 1976 |
Layton T. Davis Trooper - District 12 Served: October 28, 1957 to March 18, 1976 |
Pete E. Lackey Special Agent - District 9 Served: October 5, 1970 to November 27, 1972 |
Frank R. Dunbar Trooper - District 13 Served: October 28, 1957 to May 14, 1972 |
Donald R. Blickensderfer Trooper - District 10 Served: February 24, 1963 to September 26, 1970 |
Richard G. Warner Trooper - District 5 Served: October 28, 1957 to April 21, 1969 |
Floyd J. Farrar Trooper - District 14A (District 20) Served: October 4, 1945 to December 17, 1968 |
Warren L. Allen Trooper - District 6 Served: June 14, 1959 to September 21, 1967 |
Frank A. Doris Trooper - District 12 Served: October 28, 1957 to May 27, 1967 |
Clarence M. Robinson Lieutenant - District 12A (District 19) Served: January 4, 1928 to July 5, 1933 and January 1, 1941 to December 28, 1963 |
Dale A. Van Vooren Trooper - District 7 Served: November 15, 1957 to December 29, 1962 |
Michael T. Angelos Trooper - District 3 (District Chicago) Served: October 16, 1957 to July 13, 1960 |
Clarence U. Swain Trooper - District 9 Served: May 29, 1950 to August 1, 1959 |
Leo S. Burakowski Trooper - District 15 Served: August 4, 1957 to September 24, 1958 |
Harry B. Bradley Trooper - District 12 Served: February 15, 1946 to October 24, 1957 |
Glenn D. Gagnon Trooper - District 6 Served: June 6, 1946 to December 28, 1952 |
Millard R. Courtney Trooper - District 4 Served: May 1, 1949 to April 11, 1951 |
Corwin L. McConkey Sergeant - District 10 Served: September 21, 1941 to March 8, 1951 |
Arthur Paul Goetting Trooper - District 11 Served: February 4, 1950 to February 4, 1951 |
Ben R. Seaton Trooper - District 7 Served: June 2, 1942 to October 24, 1949 |
Roy Kyle Moody Trooper - District 9 Served: January 8, 1941 to February 28, 1949 |
George L. Fredrickson Trooper - District 11 Served: March 24, 1944 to September 1, 1947 |
Forrest F. Spencer Trooper - District 13A (District 22) Served: May 23, 1945 to October 27, 1946 |
Marvin C. Archer Trooper - District 6A (District 21) Served: December 17, 1941 to June 18, 1946 |
Samuel Mangiamele Trooper - District 3 (District Chicago) Served: June 13, 1942 to May 25, 1945 |
Charles J. Deans Trooper - District 13 Served: January 1, 1940 to August 8, 1944 |
Phillip B. Guinto Sergeant - District 2 Served: September 1, 1930 to August 5, 1943 |
Robert R. Thomas Trooper - District 11 Served: June 9, 1941 to May 15, 1942 |
Ralph R. Newman Trooper - District 13 Served: October 20, 1937 to August 20, 1941 |
Rocco Gragido Trooper - District 4 (District Chicago) Served: November 11, 1930 to September 11, 1940 |
Eugene Roberts Trooper - District 2 Served: August 8, 1937 to February 18, 1940 |
Albert Cecil Brokmyer Trooper - District 13 Served: March 17, 1933 to November 19, 1939 |
Frank Tamulis Trooper - District 13 Served: March 6, 1936 to August 9, 1937 |
Ray Embree Trooper - District 9 Served: December 16, 1935 to October 15, 1936 |
Leo J. LaVelle Trooper - District 7 Served: March 8, 1933 to November 24, 1934 |
Joseph Merritt Elliott Trooper - District 8 Served: April 6, 1933 to October 20, 1933 |
John L. McCabe Trooper - District 4 (District Chicago) Served: February 11, 1933 to August 12, 1933 |
Richard Groja Trooper - District 3 (District Chicago) Served: March 16, 1933 to May 28, 1933 |
Grady L. Sutton Trooper - District 12A (District 19) Served: November 1, 1929 to June 30, 1932 |
John Connors, Jr. Trooper - District 9 Served: December 20, 1929 to June 3, 1932 |
Kenneth L. Church Trooper - District 1 Served: March 18, 1924 to December 5, 1931 |
Frank M. Schwartz Trooper - District 2 Served: December 18, 1929 to September 11, 1930 |
Robert J. Card Trooper - District 1 Served: February 28, 1924 to August 12, 1930 |
Robert J. McDonald Trooper - District 11 Served: November 11, 1929 to July 10, 1930 |
Robert L. Fisher Trooper - District 10 Served: April 1, 1924 to April 24, 1929 |
George E. Wheeler Trooper - District 12 Served: October 18, 1927 to November 22, 1927 |
Paul E. Clendening Trooper - District 2 Served: July 12, 1923 to February 16, 1927 |
Lory L. Price Trooper - District 13 Served: November 6, 1923 to January 17, 1927 |
Albert J. Hasson Trooper - District 6 Served: April 29, 1924 to September 7, 1924 |