GOVERNORS OF WYOMING
Dave Freudenthal, 01-06-2003, Present
Name Term of Office
TERRITORIAL
John A. Campbell (R) 04-15-1869, 03-01-1875
John M. Thayer (R) 03-01-1875, 05-29-1878
John W. Hoyt (R) 05-29-1878, 08-22-1882
William Hale (R) 08-22-1882, 01-13-1885
E.S.N. Morgan (Acting)(R) 01-13-1885, 02-28-1885
Francis E. Warren (R) 02-28-1885, 11-11-1886
George W. Baxter (D) 11-11-1886, 12-20-1886
E.S.N. Morgan (Acting)(R) 12-20-1886, 01-24-1887
Thomas Moonlight (D) 01-24-1887, 04-09-1889
Francis E. Warren (R) 04-09-1889, 10-11-1890
STATE
Francis E. Warren (R) 10-11-1890, 11-24-1890
Amos W. Barber (Acting) (R) 11-24-1890, 01-02-1893
John E. Osborne (D) 01-02-1893, 01-07-1895
William A. Richards (R) 01-07-1895, 01-02-1899
DeForest Richards 01-02-1899, 04-28-1903
Fenimore Chatterton (Acting)(R) 04-28-1903, 01-02-1905
Bryant B. Brooks (R) 01-02-1905, 01-02-1911
Joseph M. Carey (D) 01-02-1911, 01-04-1915
John B. Kendrick (D) 01-04-1915, 02-26-1917
Frank Houx (Acting)(D) 02-26-1917, 01-06-1919
Robert D. Carey (R) 01-06-1919, 01-01-1923
William B. Ross (D) 01-01-1923, 10-02-1924
Frank Lucas (Acting)(R) 10-02-1924, 01-05-1925
Nellie Tayloe Ross (D) 01-05-1925, 01-03-1927
Frank C. Emerson (R) 01-03-1927, 02-18-1931
Alonzo M. Clark (Acting)(R) 02-18-1931, 01-02-1933
Leslie A. Miller (D) 01-02-1933, 01-02-1939
Nels H. Smith (R) 01-02-1939, 01-04-1943
Lester C. Hunt (D) 01-04-1943, 01-03-1949
Arthur G. Crane (Acting)(R) 01-03-1949, 01-01-1951
Frank A. Barrett (R) 01-01-1951, 01-03-1953
C.J. "Doc" Rogers (Acting)(R) 01-03-1953, 01-03-1955
Milward L. Simpson (R) 01-03-1955, 01-05-1959
J.J. "Joe" Hickey (D) 01-05-1959, 01-02-1961
Jack R. Gage (Acting)(D) 01-02-1961, 01-07-1963
Clifford P. Hansen (R) 01-07-1963, 01-02-1967
Stanley K. Hathaway (R) 01-02-1967, 01-06-1975
Ed Herschler (D) 01-06-1975, 01-05-1987
Mike Sullivan (D) 01-05-1987, 01-02-1995
Jim Geringer(R) 01-02-1995, 01-06-2003