MARSHALS
|
DATE |
VICE
|
|
Territory of Minnesota |
TAYLOR, Joshua L. |
March 19, 1849 (S) |
Original Appointment |
MITCHELL, Alexander M. |
April 25, 1850 (S) |
|
TILDEN, Henry L. |
March 10, 1851 (S) |
|
FURBUR, Joseph W. |
October 10, 1851 (R) February 9, 1852 (S) |
Tilden (Removed) |
IRWIN, M.W. |
June 11, 1853 (R) March 14, 1854 (S) |
Furbur (Resigned) |
GERE, William B. |
June 10, 1857 (R) |
Irwin (Resigned) |
|
District of Minnesota |
GERE, William B. |
May 20, 1858 (S) |
Himself as Marshal of Territory of Minnesota |
BUCK, Cornelius F. |
March 21, 1861 (S) |
Gere (Removed) |
EATON, Charles |
March 20, 1862 (S) April 26, 1866 (S) |
Buck (Resigned) |
ARMSTRONG, Augustus |
April 16, 1869 (S) |
Eaton (Removed) |
McLAREN, Robert N. |
December 8, 1873 (S) November 30, 1877 (S) |
Armstrong (Term Expired) |
DENNY, Henry R. |
February 20, 1882 (S) |
McLaren (Term Expired) |
CAMPBELL, William M. |
May 5, 1886 (S) |
Denny (Term Expired) |
DONAHOWER, Jeremiah C. |
May 2, 1890 (S) |
Campbell (Term Expired) |
BEDE, J. Adam |
February 26, 1894 (S) |
Donahower (Resigned) |
O'CONNOR, Richard T. |
February 22, 1895 (S) |
Bede (Resigned), Campbell (Rejected) |
GRIMSHAW, William H. |
March 11, 1899 (R) December 19, 1899 (S)December 18, 1903 (C)December 16, 1907 (C) December 19, 1911 (C) |
|
WESSEL, Joseph A. |
March 20, 1916 (C) |
Grimshaw (Term Expired) |
RUSTAD, Edward |
June 1, 1921 (C) |
Wessel (Term Expired) |
ANDERSON, Bernard |
February 23, 1931 (C) |
Rustad (Term Expired) |
FARRELL, John J. |
March 5, 1935 (C) May 23, 1939 (C)October 2, 1943 (C) |
Anderson (Term Expired) |
SOMMER, Frank W. |
October 14, 1946 (R) |
Farrell (Deceased) |
McGOWAN, John Joseph |
December 31, 1947 (R) |
Sommer (Recess Appointment) |
Erickson, C. Enard |
March 24, 1953 (C) July 8, 1957 (C) |
McGowan (Term Expired) |
SIEBEN, Harry A. |
April 14, 1961 (C) |
Erickson (Resigned) |
THOMPSON, William J. |
July 23, 1962 |
Sieben (Resigned) |
HEMENWAY, Ray H. |
November 7, 1962 (R) March 27, 1963 (C) |
Thompson (C.A.) |
REDPATH, James H. |
September 1, 1966 (C.A.) |
Hemenway (Resigned) |
MALCHOW, William F. |
March 4, 1967 (C) |
Redpath (C.A.) |
BERGLAND, Harry D. |
August 8, 1969 (C) May 6, 1974 (C) |
Malchow (Resigned) |
LANE, Wesley David |
August 2, 1977 (C) |
Bergland (Resigned) |
PAVLAK, Robert L. |
December 9, 1981 (C) February 6, 1986 (C) |
Lane (Term Expired) |
BENNETT, Tony |
August 7, 1990 (C) |
Pavlak (Term Expired) |
ZACHARIAS, Charles L. |
March 11, 1994 (C) |
Bennett (Resigned) |
GARBER, Allen |
April 10, 2003 |
Zacharias |
|