(Click on the individual's name for a more complete
biography, photograph and contact information.)
Appointed Regents:
Richard C. Blum
Appointed March 12, 2002 to a term expiring March 1,
2014 (by Davis); B.A., University of California, Berkeley;
M.B.A, University of California, Berkeley; Chairman
of Blum Capital Partners, L.P.; Co-Chairman of Newbridge
Capital, LLC. Mr. Blum is Chairman of The Regents.
William De La Peña,
M.D.
Appointed August 18, 2006 to a term expiring March 1,
2018 (by Schwarzenegger); Ophthalmologist and medical
director of the De La Pena Eye Clinic; B.S., American
School Foundation; M.D., Autonomous University of Guadalajara.
Russell Gould
Appointed September 13, 2005 to a term expiring March
1, 2017 (by Schwarzenegger); B.A., University of California,
Berkeley; Senior Vice President for Wachovia Bank. Mr.
Gould is Vice Chairman of The Regents.
Judith L. Hopkinson
Appointed March 11, 1999 to a term expiring March 1,
2009 (by Davis); former Chief Operating Officer of Ameriquest
Capital Corporation; B.A., Architecture, University
of California, Berkeley.
John Hotchkis
Appointed March 10, 2008 to a term expiring March 1,
2009 (by Schwarzenegger);Chair and Chief Executive Officer
of Ramajal; B.A., University of California, Berkeley;
MBA, University of California, Los Angeles.
Eddie Island
Appointed June 6, 2005 to a term expiring March 1, 2017
(by Schwarzenegger); retired attorney and executive;
J.D., Harvard Law School.
Odessa Johnson
Appointed May 4, 1999 to a term expiring March 1, 2000
(by Davis); reappointed March 1, 2000 to a term expiring
2012; Dean Emerita of Community Education, Modesto Junior
College; B.A., Tennessee State University; M.A., Columbia
University.
Joanne Kozberg
Appointed July 13, 1998 to term expiring March 1, 2010
(by Wilson); B.A., University of California, Berkeley;
M.A. Occidental College; Served as Secretary of the
California State and Consumer Services Agency under
former Governor Pete Wilson; partner in California Strategies,
a public affairs consulting firm.
Sherry L. Lansing
Appointed March 11, 1999 to a term expiring March 1,
2010 (by Davis); Founder of the Sherry Lansing Foundation
and former Chair and CEO of Paramount Pictures' Motion
Picture Group; B.S., Northwestern University.
Monica Lozano
Appointed September 21, 2001 to term expiring March
1, 2013 (by Davis); Publisher and Chief Executive Officer
of La Opinión Newspaper
Hadi Makarechian
Appointed October 24, 2008 to term expiring March
1, 2020 (by Schwarzenegger)
George M. Marcus
Appointed December 21, 2000 to term expiring March
1, 2012 (by Davis);B.A. (Economics), San Francisco State
University; founder and Chairman of Marcus & Millichap;
Chairman, Essex Property Trust.
Norman J. Pattiz
Appointed September 21, 2001 to a term expiring
March 1, 2004 (by Davis); appointed September 4, 2003
to a term expiring March 1, 2014 (by Davis); Founder
and Chairman of the Board of Westwood One.
Bonnie Reiss
Appointed March 27, 2008 to a term expiring March 1,
2020 (by Schwarzenegger); Operating Advisor to Pegasus
Capital Advisors; BBA, University of Miami; J.D., Antioch
Law School.
Frederick Ruiz
Appointed July 2, 2004 to a term expiring March 1, 2016
(by Schwarzenegger); Co-founder and Chairman, Ruiz Foods.
Leslie Tang Schilling
Appointed September 13, 2005 to a term expiring March
1, 2013 (by Schwarzenegger); B.A., University of California,
Berkeley; M.A, American Graduate School of International
Management; Director of Union Square Investments, Inc.
D'Artagnan Scorza
Student Regent, July 2008 - June 30, 2009; B.A., University
of California, Los Angeles.
Bruce D. Varner
Appointed August 18, 2006 to a term expiring March 1,
2018 (by Schwarzenegger); Partner in the law firm Varner
& Brandt; B.A., University of California, Santa Barbara;
J.D., Hastings Law School.
Paul Wachter
Appointed July 2, 2004 (by Schwarzenegger) to a term
expiring March 1, 2016; Wharton School, University of
Pennsylvania; J.D., Columbia School of Law;Founder,
President and CEO, Main Street Advisors.
Ex Officio Regents
Arnold Schwarzenegger
Governor of California and ex-officio Regent, November
17, 2003-present.
John Garamendi
Lieutenant Governor of California and ex officio Regent,
2007-present; Served as Insurance Commissioner.
Karen
Bass
Speaker of the Assembly and ex officio Regent, effective
May 13, 2008 - present; Assemblymember from the 47th
district since 2005; B.A. degree in health sciences
from California State University, Dominguez Hills.
Jack O'Connell
State Superintendent of Public Instruction and ex officio
Regent, 2003 - present; served in the State Assembly
from 1982 to 1994 representing the35th district; elected
to the State Senate in 1994, representing the State's
18th Senate district; bachelor's degree, California
State University, Fullerton; Secondary Teaching Credential,
CSU Long Beach.
Mark
G. Yudof
President of the University and ex officio Regent, effective
June 16, 2008; B.A., University of Pennsylvania; LL.B,
Law School, University of Pennsylvania.
David Shewmake
Regent, July 1, 2008 - June 30, 2009 and President,
Alumni Associations of the University of California;
B.S., University of Michigan; Ph.D., University of California,
San Francisco.
Debbie Cole
Regent, July 1, 2008 - June 30, 2009 and Vice President,
Alumni Associations of the University of Calfornia;
B.A., University of California, Berkeley; M.A., University
of Connecticut.
Regents-Designate
Jesse Bernal
Student Regent-designate, July 16, 2008 - June 30, 2009;
B.A., Westmont College, Santa Barbara; graduate student,
Gevirtz School of Education, University of California,
Santa Barbara.
Ronald W. Stovitz
Regent-designate, July 1, 2008 - June 30, 2009, and
Secretary, Alumni Associations of the University of
California; B.A., University of California, Riverside;
J.D., University of Southern California, School of Law.
Yolanda Nunn Gorman
Regent-designate, July 1, 2008 - June 30, 2009 and Treasurer,
Alumni Associations of the University of Calfornia;
B.A., University of California, Los Angeles; M.B.A,
University of California, Los Angeles; Ph.D., University
of California, Los Angeles.
Faculty Representatives to The Regents
Mary Croughan
Faculty Representative to The Regents, September 1,
2007 - August 31, 2009, and Chair of the Universitywide
Academic Senate of the University of California.
Harry Powell
Faculty Representative to The Regents, September 1,
2008 - August 31, 2010, and Vice Chair of the Universitywide
Academic Senate of the University of California.
Staff Advisors to The Regents
Bill
Johansen
Staff Advisor to The Regents, July 1, 2007 - June 30,
2009.
Ed
Abeyta
Staff Advisor-Designate to The Regents, July 1, 2008
- June 30, 2010.
The Regents of the University of California