|
|
|
Board Members |
|
Matthew C. Triplett, Chair
Area: Portland
Term: September 17, 2004 - September 16, 2010
Martin L. Gascoyne
Area: Eugene/Springfield
Term: December 20, 2005 - December 19, 2008
Steven D. Carper, Public Member
Area: Beaverton
Term: October 8, 2007 - October 7, 2010
Richard Hollenbeck, Public Member
Area: Estacada
Term: February 10, 2004 - December 31, 2008
Joseph G. Lymp
Area: Bend
Term: April 1, 2007 - March 31, 2010
Lawrence D. Thomas
Area: Astoria
Term: February 20, 2008 - February 19, 2011
Lisa M. Walter-Sedlacek
Area: Florence
Term: September 20,2007 - September 19, 2010
|
|
|
|