Inspections, Compliance, Enforcement, and Criminal Investigations
FDA Debarment List
The following is a public list of firms or persons debarred pursuant to sections 306(a) and (b) of the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act (21 U.S.C. 335(a) and (b)) as published in the FEDERAL REGISTER (FR): |
Firms
NAME OF FIRM | EFFECTIVE DATE | END/TERM OF DEBARMENT |
FR DATE.txt (MM/DD/YY) |
VOLUME PAGE.pdf |
---|---|---|---|---|
None as of this date |
|
Persons
NAME OF PERSON | EFFECTIVE DATE | END/TERM OF DEBARMENT |
FR DATE.txt (MM/DD/YY) |
VOLUME PAGE.pdf |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chang, Charles Y. | 03/08/1993 | Permanent^ | 03/08/1993 | 58FR12967 |
FR Correction | 04/26/1993 | 58FR21983 | ||
Mannan, Muhammad Z. | 04/06/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/06/1993 | 58FR17896 |
Rivers, Jacob H. | 04/12/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/12/1993 | 58FR19128 |
Vegesna, Raju | 04/12/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/12/1993 | 58FR19129 |
Finelli, Gena R. | 04/21/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/21/1993 | 58FR21469 |
Kalidindi, Sanyasi Raju | 04/21/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/21/1993 | 58FR21470 |
Azeem, Mohammed | 04/26/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/26/1993 | 58FR21982 |
FR Correction | 05/05/1993 | 58FR26814 | ||
Schetlick, Gloria H. | 04/26/1993 | Permanent^ | 04/26/1993 | 58FR21983 |
Colton, Steven F. | 06/17/1993 | Permanent^* | 06/17/1993 | 58FR33446 |
Sturm, Jan T. | 06/22/1993 | Permanent^ | 06/22/1993 | 58FR33941 |
FR Correction | 07/06/1993 | 58FR36252 | ||
Prasad, Kumar | 06/30/1993 | Permanent^ | 06/30/1993 | 58FR35006 |
Fogari, Robert A. | 07/08/1993 | Permanent^* | 07/08/1993 | 58FR36691 |
Rodriguez, Juan Manuel | 07/26/1993 | Permanent^ | 07/26/1993 | 58FR39819 |
Shulman, Robert NMI | 08/27/1993 | Permanent^ | 08/27/1993 | 58FR45340 |
Shah, Dilip | 08/31/1993 | Permanent^* | 08/31/1993 | 58FR45899 |
Desai, Kanubhai C. | 10/06/1993 | Permanent^ | 10/06/1993 | 58FR52111 |
Matkari, Rajaram K. | 10/20/1993 | Permanent^* | 10/20/1993 | 58FR54156 |
06/13/2000 | Withdrawn++ | 06/13/2000 | 65FR37154 | |
Dicola, Charles G. | 11/05/1993 | Permanent^* | 11/05/1993 | 58FR59044 |
Hossain, Liaquat | 11/05/1993 | Permanent^* | 11/05/1993 | 58FR59046 |
Pai, Daphne (aka Lau, Daphne) | 11/05/1993 | Permanent^* | 11/05/1993 | 58FR59048 |
Bansal, Padam C. | 11/29/1993 | Permanent^* | 11/29/1993 | 58FR62674 |
03/11/1997 | Sp.Trmnation+ | 03/11/1997 | 62FR11212 | |
**Donnelly, Mary | 11/29/1993 | Permanent^ | 11/29/1993 | 58FR62675 |
Perkal, Mark B. | 11/29/1993 | Permanent^ | 11/29/1993 | 58FR62676 |
09/11/1998 | Sp.Trmnation+ | 09/11/1998 | 63FR48733 | |
Long, Susan M. | 12/23/1993 | Permanent^* | 12/23/1993 | 58FR68147 |
Bae, Kun Chae | 12/30/1993 | Permanent^* | 12/30/1993 | 58FR69368 |
Brancato, David J. | 01/06/1994 | Permanent^* | 01/06/1994 | 59FR00751 |
Shah, Satish R. | 08/01/1994 | Permanent^* | 08/01/1994 | 59FR38983 |
Patel, Ashok | 11/08/1994 | Permanent^* | 11/08/1994 | 59FR55670 |
Kletch, Walter S. | 11/29/1994 | Permanent^* | 11/29/1994 | 59FR60989 |
Ryan, Patrick T. | 11/29/1994 | Permanent^ | 11/29/1994 | 59FR60992 |
FR Correction | 01/17/1995 | 60FR03451 | ||
Shah, Atul | 12/05/1994 | Permanent^* | 12/05/1994 | 59FR62399 |
03/11/1997 | Sp.Trmnation+ | 03/11/1997 | 62FR11212 | |
Mendell, Arnold S. | 12/21/1994 | Permanent^* | 12/21/1994 | 59FR65773 |
Quamruzzaman, Abu | 11/18/1993 | Permanent^# | 12/30/1994 | 59FR67709 |
Morris, Andrew | 05/16/1994 | Permanent^# | 01/11/1995 | 60FR02767 |
Shainfeld, Frederick Jay | 03/10/1995 | Permanent^# | 02/28/1996 | 61FR07521 |
Copanos, John D. | 03/11/1996 | Permanent^* | 03/11/1996 | 61FR09711 |
FR Correction | 04/18/1996 | 61FR16975 | ||
Bushlow, John W. | 03/22/1996 | Permanent^* | 03/22/1996 | 61FR11846 |
Chatterji, Dulal C. | 11/01/1995 | Permanent^# | 01/22/1997 | 62FR03297 |
06/11/1998 | Sp.Trmnation+ | 06/11/1998 | 63FR32013 | |
Mays, Gary D. | 01/24/1997 | 5 years% | 01/24/1997 | 62FR03703 |
Garfinkel, Barry D. | 04/02/1997 | Permanent^* | 04/02/1997 | 162FR1573 |
Elbert, Robert | 04/03/1997 | Permanent^* | 04/03/1997 | 62FR15902 |
Sacher, Robert E. | 08/11/1997 | Permanent^ | 08/11/1997 | 62FR42998 |
Islam, Amirul | 08/27/1997 | Permanent^# | 08/27/1997 | 62FR45423 |
10/09/2003 | Sp. Trmnation+ | 10/09/2003 | 68FR58352 | |
Banks, Norma D. | 08/28/1997 | Permanent^ | 08/28/1997 | 62FR45667 |
Herman, Hedviga | 10/17/1997 | Permanent^ | 10/17/1997 | 62FR54117 |
Rana, Nandlal | 10/20/1997 | Permanent^ | 10/20/1997 | 62FR54462 |
Anthony, James Michael | 11/07/1997 | Permanent^ | 11/07/1997 | 62FR60249 |
Feuer, Scott | 06/02/1998 | 5 years% | 06/10/1998 | 63FR31789 |
Kostas, Constantine I. | 06/25/1998 | Permanent^* | 06/10/1998 | 63FR34652 |
Girdhari, Premchand | 01/21/2000 | Permanent^* | 01/21/2000 | 65FR03454 |
Elsharaiha, Rami | 09/29/2000 | Permanent^ | 09/29/2000 | 65FR58555 |
Marcus, Jay | 09/29/2000 | 5 years% | 09/29/2000 | 65FR58556 |
Uddin, Mohammad NMI | 09/29/2000 | Permanent^ | 09/29/2000 | 65FR58557 |
Petrik, Craig H. | 04/30/2002 | Permanent^ | 04/30/2002 | 67FR21255 |
Fiddes, Robert A. | 11/06/2002 | 20 years% | 11/06/2002 | 67FR67628 |
01/21/2003 | FR Correction | 01/21/2003 | 58FR2784 | |
One person removed from list |
11/06/2002 | Rescission!!! | 01/16/2003 | 68FR2339 |
Lai, Elaine Yee-Ling | 11/13/2002 | 5 years% | 11/13/2002 | 67FR68877 |
FR Correction | 11/23/2003 | 68FR03264 | ||
Charpentier, Laverne M. | 12/02/2002 | 5 years%* | 12/02/2002 | 67FR71574 |
Peugeot, Renee | 01/13/2003 | Permanent^ | 01/13/2003 | 68FR1619 |
Snyder, Jr., Harry W. | 01/13/2003 | Permanent^ | 01/13/2003 | 68FR1619 |
Kokes, Edwin | 04/30/2003 | Permanent^ | 04/30/2003 | 68FR23138 |
Theodore, Thomas Ronald | 08/05/2003 | Permanent^ | 08/05/2003 | 68FR46197 |
Borison, Richard L. | 09/30/2003 | 10 years% | 09/30/2003 | 68FR56298 |
Sardesai, Suhas V. | 09/30/2003 | Permanent^ | 09/30/2003 | 68FR56299 |
Striefsky, Edmund J. | 09/30/2003 | Permanent^ | 09/30/2003 | 68FR56300 |
Courtney, Robert Ray | 10/20/2003 | Permanent^ | 10/20/2003 | 68FR59942 |
Bhutani, Baldev Raj | 12/02/2004 | Permanent^ | 12/02/2004 | 69FR70148 |
Caro Acevedo, Eduardo | 03/24/2005 | 5 years% | 03/24/2005 | 70FR15107 |
Rodgers, Jr., Thomas M. | 07/28/2005 | 5 years% | 07/28/2005 | 71FR43699 |
Butkovitz, Anne L. | 10/17/2006 | Permanent^ | 10/17/2006 | 71FR61061 |
Kimball, James T. | 01/30/2007 | Permanent ^ | 01/30/2007 | 72FR4269 |
Campbell, Maria Anne Kirkman | 09/02/2008 | Permanent ^ | 09/02/2008 | 73FR51305 |
Kindness, George J. | 11/24/2008 | Permanent ^ | 11/24/2008 | 73FR71007 |
Page, Roy C. | 11/24/2008 | Permanent ^ | 11/24/2008 | 73FR71008 |
Norman, Allyn M. | 06/12/2009 | 5 years% | 06/12/2009 | 74FR28050 |
Sawaya, Mary E. a.k.a. Marty Sawaya | 06/12/2009 | Permanent^ | 06/12/2009 | 74FR28049 |
Hendrick, Kim C. | 08/04/2009 | Permanent^ | 08/04/2009 | 74FR38656 |
Kornak, Paul H. | 08/04/2009 | Permanent^ | 08/04/2009 | 74FR38657 |
NOTATIONS:
^ | Mandatory Debarment (Sec. 306(a)) |
% | Permissive Debarment (Sec. 306(b)) |
* | Hearing requested and denied. |
# | Acquiesced to Debarment. |
+ | Special Termination of Debarment (Sec. 306(d)(4)(C) and (d)(4)(D)) |
++ | Order to Withdraw Order of Debarment (debarment terminated) (Sec. 306(d)(3)(B)(i)) |
!!! | Rescission of Debarment Order |
aka | Also known as |
NMI | No Middle Initial known to be used |
** | Ms Mary L. Donnelly, of Green Bay City, Michigan, USA (FDA Docket No. 93N-0264), is not to be confused with Dr. Mary Sandra Donnelly, currently affiliated with St. Michael's Hospital of Toronto, Ontario, Canada. |
This public list is compiled in accordance with 21 U.S.C. 335a(e) from notices published in the FEDERAL REGISTER. Firm or individual names appearing for the first time in a FR notice of debarment are added to the end of the list. Subsequent FR debarment notices concerning the same firm or person are posted after the first listing of the firm or individual. This list is prepared by the Office of Enforcement, Division of Compliance Policy (HFC-230), 5600 Fishers Lane, Rockville, Maryland 20857; telephone 240.632.6860; FAX 240.632.6861. Additional references: The Disqualified/Restricted/Assurance List for Clinical Investigators The Public Health Service Administrative Actions Listing FEDERAL REGISTER (publications from 1994 to date) Debarment certification statements: Draft guidance for industry (PDF) Background information on Debarment: ["FDA Consumer" magazine March 1997 "Inside FDA:Barring People from the Drug Industry"] Hyperlinks to FEDERAL REGISTER statements are provided where available. Debarments prior to 1994 are not available online. |