Presidents & VPs / Sessions of Congress
No. |
President |
Vice
President |
Years
of Service |
Congresses |
1. |
George Washington |
John Adams |
Apr. 30, 1789-Mar.
3, 1797 |
1,2,3,4 |
2. |
John Adams |
Thomas Jefferson |
Mar. 4, 1797-Mar. 3, 1801 |
5, 6 |
3. |
Thomas Jefferson |
Aaron Burr |
Mar. 4, 1801-Mar.
3, 1805 |
7, 8 |
|
Thomas Jefferson |
George Clinton |
Mar. 4, 1805-Mar.
3, 1809 |
9, 10 |
4. |
James Madison |
George Clinton1 |
Mar. 4, 1809-Mar. 3, 1813 |
11, 12 |
|
James Madison |
Elbridge Gerry2 |
Mar. 4, 1813-Mar. 3, 1817 |
13, 14 |
5. |
James Monroe |
Daniel D.
Thompkins |
Mar. 4, 1817-Mar.
3, 1825 |
15, 16, 17,
18 |
6. |
John Quincy Adams |
John C. Calhoun |
Mar. 4, 1825-Mar.
3, 1829 |
19, 20 |
7. |
Andrew Jackson |
John C. Calhoun3 |
Mar. 4, 1829-Mar.
3, 1833 |
21, 22 |
|
Andrew Jackson |
Martin Van
Buren |
Mar. 4, 1833-Mar.
3, 1837 |
23, 24 |
8. |
Martin Van Buren |
Richard M. Johnson |
Mar. 4, 1837-Mar. 3, 1841 |
25, 26 |
9. |
William Henry
Harrison4 |
John Tyler |
Mar. 4, 1841-Apr.
4, 1841 |
27 |
10. |
John Tyler |
............ |
Apr. 6, 1841-Mar. 3, 1845 |
27, 28 |
11. |
James K. Polk |
George M.
Dallas |
Mar. 4, 1845-Mar.
3, 1849 |
29, 30 |
12. |
Zachary Taylor4 |
Millard Fillmore |
Mar. 5, 1849-July 9, 1850 |
31 |
13. |
Millard Fillmore |
............ |
July 10, 1850-Mar.
3, 1853 |
31, 32 |
14. |
Franklin Pierce |
William R. King5 |
Mar. 4, 1853-Mar. 3, 1857 |
33, 34 |
15. |
James Buchanan |
John C. Breckenridge |
Mar. 4, 1857-Mar.
3, 1861 |
35, 36 |
16. |
Abraham Lincoln |
Hannibal Hamlin |
Mar. 4, 1861-Mar. 3,
1864 |
37, 38 |
|
Abraham Lincoln 5 |
Andrew Johnson |
Mar. 4, 1864--Apr. 15, 1865 |
39 |
17. |
Andrew Johnson |
............ |
Apr. 15, 1865-Mar.
3, 1869 |
39, 40 |
18. |
Ulysses S. Grant |
Schuyler Colfax |
Mar.
4, 1869-Mar. 3, 1873 |
41, 42 |
|
Ulysses S. Grant |
Henry Wilson6 |
Mar.
4, 1873-Mar. 3, 1877 |
43, 44 |
19. |
Rutherford B.
Hayes |
William A.
Wheeler |
Mar. 4, 1877-Mar.
3, 1881 |
45, 46 |
20. |
James A. Garfield4 |
Chester A. Arthur |
Mar. 4, 1881-Sept. 19, 1881 |
47 |
21. |
Chester A. Arthur |
............ |
Sept. 20, 1881-Mar.
3, 1885 |
47, 48 |
22. |
Grover Cleveland |
Thomas A. Hendricks7 |
Mar. 4, 1885-Mar. 3, 1889 |
49, 50 |
23. |
Benjamin Harrison |
Levi P. Morton |
Mar. 4, 1889-Mar.
3, 1898 |
51, 52 |
24. |
Grover Cleveland |
Adlai E. Stevenson |
Mar. 4, 1893-Mar. 3, 1897 |
53, 54 |
25. |
William
McKinley |
Garret
A. Hobart8 |
Mar.
4, 1897-Mar. 3, 1901 |
55,
56 |
|
William
McKinley4 |
Theodore Roosevelt |
Mar. 4, 1901-Sept.
14, 1901 |
57 |
26. |
Theodore Roosevelt |
............ |
Sept. 14, 1901-Mar.
3, 1905 |
57, 58 |
|
Theodore Roosevelt |
Charles W. Fairbanks |
Mar. 4, 1905-Mar. 3, 1909 |
59,60 |
27. |
William H. Taft |
James S. Sherman9 |
Mar. 4, 1909-Mar. 3, 1913 |
61,62 |
28. |
Woodrow Wilson |
Thomas R. Marshall |
Mar. 4, 1913-Mar. 3, 1921 |
63, 64, 65, 66 |
29. |
Warren G. Harding4 |
Calvin Coolidge |
Mar. 4, 1921-Aug. 2, 1923 |
67 |
30. |
Calvin Coolidge |
............ |
Aug. 3, 1923-Mar. 3,
1925 |
68 |
|
Calvin Coolidge |
Charles G. Dawes |
Mar. 4, 1925-Mar. 3, 1929 |
69, 70 |
31. |
Herbert C. Hoover |
Charles Curtis |
Mar. 4, 1929-Mar. 3, 1933 |
71, 72 |
32. |
Franklin D. Roosevelt |
John N. Garner |
Mar. 4, 1933-Jan. 20,
1941 |
73, 74, 75, 76, 77 |
|
Franklin D. Roosevelt |
Henry A. Wallace |
Jan. 20, 1941-Jan. 20, 1945 |
77, 78, 79 |
|
Franklin D. Roosevelt 4 |
Harry S. Truman |
Jan. 20, 1945-Apr. 12, 1945 |
79 |
33. |
Harry S. Truman |
............ |
Apr. 12, 1945-Jan. 20,
1949 |
79, 80, 81 |
|
Harry S. Truman |
Alben W. Barkley |
Jan. 20, 1949-Jan. 20, 1953 |
81, 82, 83 |
34. |
Dwight D. Eisenhower |
Richard M. Nixon |
Jan. 20, 1953-Jan. 20, 1961 |
83, 84, 85, 86, 87 |
35. |
John F. Kennedy4 |
Lyndon B. Johnson |
Jan. 20, 1961-Nov. 22, 1963 |
87, 88, 89 |
36. |
Lyndon B. Johnson |
............ |
Nov. 22, 1963-Jan. 20,
1965 |
88, 89 |
|
Lyndon B. Johnson |
Hubert H. Humphrey |
Jan. 20, 1965-Jan. 20, 1969 |
89, 90, 91 |
37. |
Richard M. Nixon |
Spiro T. Agnew10 |
Jan. 20, 1969-Dec. 6, 1973 |
91, 92, 93 |
|
Richard M. Nixon 12 |
Gerald R. Ford11 |
Dec. 6, 1973-Aug. 9, 1974 |
93 |
38. |
Gerald R. Ford |
............ |
Aug. 9, 1974-Dec. 19,
1974 |
93 |
|
Gerald R. Ford |
Nelson A. Rockefeller 13 |
Dec. 19, 1974-Jan. 20, 1977 |
93, 94, 95 |
39. |
James Earl Carter |
Walter F. Mondale |
Jan. 20, 1977-Jan. 20, 1981 |
95, 96, 97 |
40. |
Ronald Reagan |
George Bush |
Jan. 20, 1981-Jan. 20, 1989 |
97, 98, 99, 100, 101 |
41. |
George Bush |
Dan Quayle |
Jan. 20, 1989-Jan. 20, 1993 |
101, 102, 103, |
42. |
William J. Clinton |
Albert Gore |
Jan. 20, 1993-Jan. 20, 2001 |
103, 104, 105, 106, 107 |
43. |
George W. Bush |
Dick Cheney |
Jan. 20, 2001-Jan. 20, 2009 |
107, 108, 109, 110, 111 |
44. |
Barack H. Obama |
Joseph R. Biden, Jr. |
Jan. 20, 2009-present |
111 |
|