Volume 10 |
||
Matter
of
|
Date
|
Interim
Dec. #
|
P- | Sept 11, 1957 |
938
|
Preciado-Castillo | (July 6, 1962) | |
Medina-Lopez | (July 20, 1962) | |
Jong Ding Liu | (July 13, 1962) | |
Chang | (July 24, 1962) | |
Villarba-Reyes | (July 27, 1962) | |
Flores-Maldonado | (July 30, 1962) | |
Szegedi | (August 10, 1962) | |
Pitzoff | (August 13, 1962) | |
Cadle | (August 20, 1962) | |
Peralta | (July 19, 1962) | |
Bukowska |
(August 24, 1962) | |
Han | (August 10, 1962) | |
Niesel | (August 10, 1962) | |
Bustillos-Ruiz | (August 7, 1962) | |
Lyons | (September 5, 1962) | |
Dr Filippo | (September 7, 1962) | |
Mazar | (August 17, 1962) | |
Box | (September 5, 1962) | |
Archer | (September 12, 1962) | |
Cavlov | (September 27, 1962) | |
Espinosa | (August 16, 1962) | |
Tzimas | (September 10, 1962) | |
Szajlai | (October 5, 1962) | |
Sarkissian | (September 27, 1962) | |
Vara-Rodriguez | (November 15, 1962) | |
Frisone | (November 19, 1962) | |
Bustillos-Ruiz | (October 26, 1962) | |
Slade | (November 30, 1962) | |
Cassisi | (January 15, 1963) | |
Picone | (April 27, 1962-July 12, 1962; AG January 21, 1963) | |
Rosenblatt | (January 18, 1963) | |
Kowalski | (January 17, 1963) | |
M/V "Clydefield" | (January 31, 1963) | |
Francois | (January 17, 1963) | |
Barrios | (January 22, 1963) | |
Sauer | (January 22, 1963) | |
Tarabocchia | (February 11, 1963) | |
Palmieri | (February 19, 1963) | |
Pires Da Silva | (February 21, 1963) | |
"Flight SR-4" | (February 27, 1963) | |
Diaz |
(March 20, 1963) | |
Cruz | (February 21, 1963) | |
Fong | (March 1, 1963) | |
Marinho | (October 22, 1962 - February 11, 1963) | |
Louie | (March 26, 1963) | |
McCarthy | (March 29, 1963) | |
Villagomez-Gasca | (April 5, 1963) | |
Casole | (April 10, 1963) | |
SS. Ryndam | (April 16, 1963) | |
Liadakis | (April 18, 1963) | |
Maturana |
(April 12, 1963) | |
Gardos | (May 7, 1963) | |
Koehne | (May 8, 1963) | |
Paul | (May 14, 1963) | |
Leong | (May 16, 1963) | |
Goncalves | (June 4, 1963) | |
Stojkovic | (June 4, 1963) | |
Wong | (May 8, 1963) | |
Rios-Carrillo | (June 12, 1963) | |
Hernandez | (June 18, 1963) | |
Peralta |
(June 19, 1963) | |
Bauer | (June 11, 1963) | |
Perez-Jimenez | (July 19, 1963) | |
St. Demetrios Greek Orthodox Church | (March 21, 1963) | |
O'Sullivan | (January 15, 1963; February 14, 1963; August 2, 1963) | |
Cardenas-Pinedo | (August 12, 1963) | |
Ghazal | (August 1, 1963) | |
Woo | (August 13, 1963) 1297Ghazal (August 1, 1963) | |
Banjeglav | (August 28, 1963) | |
Amico | (September 3, 1963) | |
M/S Panaghia Theoskepasti |
(August 23, 1963) | |
Simicevic | (September 3, 1963) | |
Yanez-Carrillo | (August 27, 1963) | |
Napello | (September 27, 1963) | |
Irie | (October 23, 1963) | |
Yoo | (October 30, 1963) | |
Rios-Carrillo | (November 6, 1963) | |
Chien | (October 29, 1963) | |
HMS "Bounty" | (December 10, 1963) | |
Monastra | (December 12, 1963) | |
Louie |
(December 12, 1963) | |
Pikkarainen | (December 10, 1963) | |
Martinez-Lopez | (BIA August 7, 1962; December 20, 1962; AG January 6, 1964) | |
Kobayashi and Doi | (DD-July 3, 1963; RC August 26, 1963; DAC December 19, 1963) | |
Ng | (December 11, 1963) | |
Paul | (December 27, 1963) | |
Torres-Tejeda | (January 3, 1964) | |
Davis | (January 30, 1964) | |
Agoudemos | (February 3, 1964) | |
Hwang | (February 4, 1964) | |
Eusaph |
(January 23, 1964) | |
Okamoto |
(February 11, 1964) | |
Iqal | (February 12, 1964) | |
Tinsley | (February 13, 1964) | |
Chow | (February 24, 1964) | |
Gonzalez-Hernandez | (February 18, 1964) | |
Karl | (March 9, 1964) | |
Cunney | (March 23, 1964) | |
Rodriguez | (February 17, 1964) | |
Paraskos | (March 6, 1964) | |
Diaz-Villamil | (April 3, 1964) | |
Fong | (April 6, 1964) | |
Ohnhauser | (April 10, 1964) | |
Edwards |
(November 12, 1963-March 9, 1964) | |
Wong | (April 22, 1964) | |
Garcia-Castillo | (April 30, 1964) | |
Garvey | (May 13, 1964) | |
Scherbank | (May 14, 1964) | |
Kelly | (May 15, 1964) | |
Guimaraes | (May 15, 1964) | |
Graham |
(May 7, 1964) | |
Barreiros |
(May 21, 1964) | |
Cortez-Vasquez | (May 19, 1964) | |
Kinney | (May 20, 1964) | |
Abi-Rached | (May 13, 1964) | |
Schaad | (May 25, 1964) | |
Faruque | (May 12, 1964) | |
Vardjan | (June 3, 1964) | |
Awadalla | (May 28, 1964) | |
Adamo | (June 4, 1964) | |
Lau | (June 5, 1964) | |
Perez | (June 18, 1964) | |
M/S/ "Berlin" | (June 23, 1964) | |
Megalogenis | (June 26, 1964) | |
Alvarez-Mujica | (July 10, 1964) | |
Fong | (July 16, 1964) | |
Encarnado | (May 15, 1963) | |
Boireau | (June 1, 1964) | |
Suh | (November 6, 1962) | |
Ko |
(March 10, 1964) | |
Zavala |
(August 1, 1963) | |
Sanchez-Monreal | (March 3, 1964) | |
Michigan State University | (June 4, 1964) | |
Michigan State University | (June 14, 1963) | |
Miyazaki Travel Agency Inc. | (March 30, 1964) | |
Kyriakarakos | (September 24, 1963) | |
Saunders | (October 4, 1963) | |
Paparo | (May 1, 1964) | |
Wolfe |
(June 23, 1964) | |
Lim | (January 23, 1963) | |
Contopoulos | (February 11, 1964) | |
Franklin Pierce College | (January 30, 1964) | |
Esposito |
(April 15, 1964) | |
Peterson | (December 19, 1963) | |
Lewis | (March 23, 1964) | |
Guia | (July 1, 1964) | |
Schonfeld | (May 26, 1964) | |
Chen | (April 10, 1964) | |
Acosta | (August 12, 1964) | |
Bailie | (August 5, 1964) | |
Bagai |
(August 12, 1964) | |
Pisciotta | (August 19, 1964) | |
Sweed | (August 19, 1964) | |
T-E-C- | (January 15, 1964) | |
J-F-D- | (September 25, 1963) | |
R-R- | (October 23, 1963) | |
Yaron, et al. | (November 4, 1963) | |
Lee | (January 30, 1964) | |
Buckland | (April 28, 1964) | |
Moorman | (July 28, 1964) | |
Grecian Palace |
(March 12, 1962) | |
Bisulca | (July 23, 1963) | |
University of California Medical Center | (January 17, 1964) | |
Tamura | (July 15, 1964) | |
Gaglioti | (September 11, 1964) | |
Hirabayashi | (September 14, 1964) | |
Ngan | (September 17, 1964) | |
Beato | (SIO July 16, 1964-October 7, 1964) | |
M/V Hellenic Leader |
(October 5, 1964) | |
Prieto-Perez | (October 16, 1964) | |
The | (October 22, 1964) | |
Jensen | (October 30, 1964) | |
Gupta | (August 21, 1964) | |
Poindexter Gallery | (July 15, 1964) | |
Barnes | (ACINC July 6, 1964-RC July 23, 1964) | |
Sinha | (August 11, 1964) | |
Del Conte | (July 16, 1964) | |
Alberga | (October 16, 1964) | |
Duran-Montoya | (September 16, 1963) | |
Rocha | (September 24, 1964) | |
Azmitia | (October 15, 1964) | |
Martinez-Torres | (October 16, 1964) | |
Loza-Bedoya | (November 19, 1964) |
1412
|
Jacobson | (December 4, 1964) | |
Haddad | (November 9, 1964) | |
Ikemiya | (November 23, 1964) | |
Garcia-Castillo | (October 2, 1964) | |
Dun-Rite Kitchen Cabinet, Corp. |
(November 16, 1964) |