Eugene O. Sykes Chairman |
Democrat |
Mississippi |
Jul 11, 1934 Jul 11, 1934 |
Apr 5, 1939 Mar 8, 1935 |
Thad H. Brown |
Republican |
Ohio |
Jul 11, 1934 |
Jun 30, 1940 |
Paul A. Walker Acting Chairman Chairman |
Democrat |
Oklahoma |
Jul 11, 1934 Nov 3, 1947 Feb 28, 1952 |
Jun30, 1953 Dec 28, 1947 Apr 17, 1953 |
Norman Case |
Republican |
Rhode Island |
Jul 11, 1934 |
Jun 30, 1945 |
Irvin Stewart
|
Democrat |
Texas |
Jul 11, 1934 |
Jun 30, 1937 |
George Henry Payne |
Republican |
New York |
Jul 11, 1934 |
Jun 30, 1943 |
Hampson Gary |
Democrat |
Texas |
Jul 11, 1934 |
Jan 1, 1935 |
Anning S. Prall Chairman |
Democrat |
New York |
Jan 17, 1935 Mar 9, 1935 |
Jul 23, 1937 Jul 23, 1937 |
T. A. M. Craven |
Democrat |
DC Virginia |
Aug 25, 1937 Jul 2, 1956 |
Jun 30, 1944 Mar 25, 1963 |
Frank McNinch Chairman |
Democrat |
North Carolina |
Oct 1, 1937 Oct 1, 1937 |
Aug 31, 1939 Aug 31, 1939 |
Frederic I. Thompson |
Democrat |
Alabama |
Apr 13, 1939 |
Jun 30, 1941 |
James Lawrence Fly Chairman |
Democrat |
Texas |
Sept 1, 1939 Sept 1, 1939 |
Nov 13, 1944 Nov 13, 1944 |
Ray C. Wakefield |
Republican |
California |
Mar 22, 1941 |
Jun 30, 1947 |
Clifford J. Durr |
Democrat |
Alabama |
Nov 1, 1941 |
Jun 30, 1948 |
Ewell K. Jett Interim Chairman |
Independent |
Maryland |
Feb 15, 1944 Nov 16, 1944 |
Dec 31, 1947 Dec 20, 1944 |
Paul A. Porter Chairman |
Democrat |
Kentucky |
Dec 21, 1944 Dec 21, 1944 |
Feb 25, 1946 Feb 25, 1946 |
Charles R. Denny Acting Chairman Chairman |
Democrat |
DC |
Mar 30, 1945 Feb 26, 1946 Dec 4, 1946 |
Oct 31, 1947 Dec 3, 1946 Oct 31, 1947 |
William H. Willis |
Republican |
Vermont |
Jul 23, 1945 |
Mar 6, 1946 |
Rosel H. Hyde Chairman Acting Chairman Acting Chairman Chairman |
Republican |
Idaho |
Apr 17, 1946 Apr 18, 1953 Apr 19, 1954 May 1, 1966 Jun 27, 1966 |
Oct 31, 1969 Apr 18, 1954 Oct 3, 1954 Jun 26, 1966 Oct 31, 1969 |
Edward M. Webster |
Independent |
DC |
Apr 10, 1947 |
Jun 30, 1956 |
Robert F. Jones |
Republican |
Ohio |
Sept 5, 1947 |
Sept 19, 1952 |
Wayne Coy Chairman |
Democrat |
Indiana |
Dec 29, 1947 Dec 29, 1947 |
Feb 21, 1952 Feb 21, 1952 |
George E. Sterling |
Republican |
Maine |
Jan 2, 1948 |
Sept 30, 1954 |
Frieda B. Hennock |
Democrat |
New York |
Jul 6, 1948 |
Jun 30, 1955 |
Robert T. Bartley |
Democrat |
Texas |
Mar 6, 1952 |
Jun 30, 1972 |
Eugene H. Merrill |
Democrat |
Utah |
Oct 6, 1952 |
Apr 15, 1953 |
John C. Doerfer Chairman |
Republican |
Wisconsin |
Apr 15, 1953 Jul 1, 1957 |
Mar 10, 1960 Mar 10, 1960 |
Robert E. Lee Interim Chairman Chairman |
Republican |
Illinois |
Oct 6, 1953 Feb 5, 1981 Apr 13, 1981 |
Jun 30, 1981 Apr 12, 1981 May 18,1981 |
George McConnaughey Chairman |
Republican |
Ohio |
Oct 4, 1954 |
Jun 30, 1957 |
Frederick W. Ford Chairman |
Republican |
West Virginia |
Aug 29, 1957 Mar 15, 1960 |
Dec 31, 1964 Mar 1, 1961 |
John S. Cross |
Democrat |
Arkansas |
May 23, 1958 |
Sept 30, 1962 |
Charles H. King |
Republican |
Michigan |
Jul 19, 1960 |
Mar 2, 1961 |
Newton N. Minow Chairman |
Democrat |
Illinois |
Mar 2, 1961 Mar 2, 1961 |
Jun 1, 1963 Jun 1, 1963 |
E. William Henry Chairman |
Democrat |
Tennessee |
Oct 2, 1962 Jun 2, 1963 |
May 1, 1966 May 1, 1966 |
Kenneth A. Cox |
Democrat |
Washington |
Mar 26, 1963 |
Aug 31, 1970 |
Lee Loevinger |
Democrat |
Minnesota |
Jun 11, 1963 |
Jun 30, 1968 |
James J. Wadsworth |
Republican |
New York |
May 5, 1965 |
Oct. 31, 1969 |
Nicholas Johnson |
Democrat |
Iowa |
Jul 1 1966 |
Dec 5, 1973 |
H. Rex Lee |
Democrat |
DC |
Oct 28, 1968 |
Dec 31, 1973 |
Dean Burch Chairman |
Republican |
Arizona |
Oct 31, 1969 Oct 31, 1969 |
Mar 8, 1974 Mar 8, 1974 |
Robert Wells |
Republican |
Kansas |
Nov 6, 1969 |
Nov 1, 1971 |
Thomas J. Houser |
Republican |
Illinois |
Jan 6, 1971 |
Oct 5, 1971 |
Charlotte T. Reid |
Republican |
Illinois |
Oct 8, 1971 |
Jul 1, 1976 |
Richard E. Wiley Chairman |
Republican |
Illinois |
Jan 5, 1972 Mar 8, 1974 |
Oct 13, 1977 Oct 13, 1977 |
Benjamin L. Hooks |
Democrat |
Tennessee |
Jul 5, 1972 |
Jul 25, 1977 |
James H. Quello Chairman |
Democrat |
Michigan |
Apr 30, 1974 Feb 5, 1993 |
Nov 1, 1997 Nov 28, 1993 |
Glen O. Robinson |
Democrat |
Minnesota |
Jul 10, 1974 |
Aug 30, 1976 |
Abbott M. Washburn |
Republican |
Minnesota |
Jul 10, 1974 |
Oct 1, 1982 |
Joseph R. Fogarty |
Democrat |
Rhode Island |
Sept 17, 1976 |
Jun 30, 1983 |
Margita E. White |
Republican |
Sweden |
Sept 23, 1976 |
Feb 28, 1979 |
Charles D. Ferris Chairman |
Democrat |
Massachusetts |
Oct 17, 1977 Oct 17, 1977 |
Apr 10, 1981 Feb 4, 1981 |
Tyrone Brown |
Democrat |
Virginia |
Nov 15, 1977 |
Jan 31, 1981 |
Anne P. Jones |
Republican |
Massachusetts |
Apr 7, 1979 |
May 31, 1983 |
Mark S. Fowler Chairman |
Republican |
Canada |
May 18, 1981 May 18, 1981 |
Apr 17, 1987 Apr 17, 1987 |
Mimi Weyforth Dawson |
Republican |
Missouri |
Jul 6, 1981 |
Dec 3, 1987 |
Henry M. Rivera |
Democrat |
New Mexico |
Aug 10, 1981 |
Sept 15, 1985 |
Stephen A. Sharp |
Republican |
Ohio |
Oct 4, 1982 |
Jun 30, 1983 |
Dennis R. Patrick Chairman |
Republican |
California |
Dec 2, 1983 Apr 18, 1987 |
Apr 17, 1987 Aug 7, 1989 |
Patricia Diaz Dennis |
Democrat |
New Mexico |
Jun 25, 1986 |
Sept 29, 1989 |
Alfred C. Sikes Chairman |
Republican |
Missouri |
Aug 8, 1989 Aug 8, 1989 |
Jan 19, 1993 Jan 19, 1993 |
Sherrie P. Marshall |
Republican |
Florida |
Aug 21, 1989 |
Apr 30, 1993 |
Andrew C. Barrett |
Republican |
Illinois |
Sept 8, 1989 |
Mar 30, 1996 |
Ervin S. Duggan |
Democrat |
Georgia |
Feb 28, 1990 |
Jan 30, 1994 |
Reed E. Hundt Chairman |
Democrat |
Maryland |
Nov 29, 1993 Nov 29, 1993 |
Nov 3, 1997 Nov 3, 1997 |
Susan Ness |
Democrat |
New Jersey |
May 19, 1994 |
May 30, 2001 |
Rachelle B. Chong |
Republican |
California |
May 23, 1994 |
Nov 3, 1997 |
William E. Kennard Chairman |
Democrat |
California |
Nov 3, 1997 Nov 3, 1997 |
Jan 19, 2001 Jan 19, 2001 |
Harold W. Furchtgott-Roth |
Republican |
Tennessee |
Nov 3, 1997 |
May 30, 2001 |
Michael K. Powell Chairman |
Republican |
Virginia |
Nov 3, 1997 Jan 22, 2001 |
Mar 17, 2005 Mar 17, 2005 |
Gloria Tristani |
Democrat |
New Mexico |
Nov 3, 1997 |
Sept 7, 2001 |
Kathleen Q. Abernathy |
Republican |
Kentucky |
May 31, 2001 |
Dec 9, 2005 |
Michael J. Copps |
Democrat |
Wisconsin |
May 31, 2001 |
|
Kevin J. Martin Chairman |
Republican |
North Carolina |
Jul 3, 2001 Mar 18, 2005 |
Jan 19, 2009 Jan 19, 2009 |
Jonathan S. Adelstein |
Democrat |
South Dakota |
Dec 3, 2002 |
|
Deborah Taylor Tate |
Republican |
Tennessee |
Jan 3, 2006 |
Jan 3, 2009 |
Robert M. McDowell |
Republican |
Virginia |
Jun 1, 2006 |
|
|