Appointed Senators
|
Senator Sam Ervin (Senate Historical Office)
The 17th Amendment to the Constitution (1913) established direct election of senators, as well as a means of filling vacant Senate seats. If a vacancy occurs due to a senator's death, resignation, or expulsion, the 17th Amendment allows state legislatures to empower the governor to appoint a replacement to complete the term or to hold office until a special election can take place. There are a few exceptions to this rule. Some states require a special election to fill a vacancy. A few states require the governor to appoint a replacement of the same political party as the previous incumbent. Typically, a replacement holds office until the next scheduled statewide election. For more information on how vacancies are filled, see this Report from the Congressional Research Service (pdf).
--------------------------------------------------------------------
Appointed Senators since 1913
Rienzi M. Johnston (D-TX)
Date Appointed: January 14, 1913
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
John N. Heiskell (D-AR)
Date Appointed: January 6, 1913
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
William S. West (D-GA)
Date Appointed: March 2, 1914
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Johnson N. Camden, Jr. (D-KY)
Date Appointed: June 16, 1914
Elected: Yes, on November 3, 1914.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas Taggart (D-IN)
Date Appointed: March 20, 1916
Elected: No, was defeated on November 7, 1916.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles L. McNary (R-OR)
Date Appointed: May 29, 1917
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles B. Henderson (D-NV)
Date Appointed: January 12, 1918
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1918.
-------------------------------------------------
John F. Nugent (D-ID)
Date Appointed: January 22, 1918
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1918.
-------------------------------------------------
David Baird (R-NJ)
Date Appointed: February 23, 1918
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1918.
-------------------------------------------------
Walter Guion (D-LA)
Date Appointed: April 22, 1918
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Xenophon P. Wilfley (D-MO)
Date Appointed: April 30, 1918
Elected: No, did not win nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Christie Benet (D-SC)
Date Appointed: July 6, 1918
Elected: No, defeated on November 5, 1918.
-------------------------------------------------
Irving W. Drew (R-NH)
Date Appointed: September 2, 1918
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
George B. Martin (D-KY)
Date Appointed: September 7, 1918
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles L. McNary (R-OR)
Date Appointed: December 18, 1918
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1918.
-------------------------------------------------
Carter Glass (D-VA)
Date Appointed: November 18, 1919
Elected: Yes, on November 3, 1920.
-------------------------------------------------
Braxton B. Comer (D-AL)
Date Appointed: March 5, 1920
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Holm O. Bursum (R-NM)
Date Appointed: March 11, 1921
Elected: Yes, on September 20, 1921.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas Coleman du Pont (R-DE)
Date Appointed: July 7, 1921
Elected: No, defeated on November 7, 1922.
-------------------------------------------------
William E. Crow (R-PA)
Date Appointed: October 17, 1921
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
George W. Pepper (R-PA)
Date Appointed: January 9, 1922
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 1922.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles A. Rawson (R-IA)
Date Appointed: February 24, 1922
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
David A. Reed (R-PA)
Date Appointed: August 8, 1922
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 1922.
-------------------------------------------------
Rebecca L. Felton (D-GA)
Date Appointed: October 3, 1922
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
James Couzens (R-MI)
Date Appointed: November 29, 1922
Elected: Yes, on November 4, 1924
-------------------------------------------------
Alva B. Adams (D-CO)
Date Appointed: May 17, 1923
Elected: No, defeated on November 4, 1924 (not a candidate in special election of same date)
-------------------------------------------------
William M. Butler (R-MA)
Date Appointed: November 13, 1924
Elected: No, defeated on November 2, 1926.
-------------------------------------------------
George H. Williams (R-MO)
Date Appointed: May 25, 1925
Elected: No, defeated on November 2, 1926.
-------------------------------------------------
Arthur R. Robinson (R-IN)
Date Appointed: October 20, 1925
Elected: Yes, on November 2, 1926
-------------------------------------------------
Gerald P. Nye (R-ND)
Date Appointed: November 14, 1925
Elected: Yes, on June 30, 1926
-------------------------------------------------
David W. Stewart (R-IA)
Date Appointed: August 7, 1926
Elected: Yes, on November 2, 1926.
-------------------------------------------------
Bronson Cutting (R-NM)
Date Appointed: December 29, 1927
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Arthur H. Vandenberg (R-MI)
Date Appointed: March 31, 1928
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1928.
-------------------------------------------------
Cyrus Locher (D-OH)
Date Appointed: April 4, 1928
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
John Thomas (R-ID)
Date Appointed: June 30, 1928
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1928.
-------------------------------------------------
Daniel O. Hastings (R-DE)
Date Appointed: December 10, 1928
Elected: Yes, on November 4, 1930.
-------------------------------------------------
Henry J. Allen (R-KS)
Date Appointed: April 1, 1929
Elected: No, defeated on November 4, 1930.
-------------------------------------------------
William E. Brock (D-TN)
Date Appointed: September 2, 1929
Elected: Yes, on November 4, 1930.
-------------------------------------------------
Roscoe C. McCulloch (R-OH)
Date Appointed: November 5, 1929
Elected: No, defeated on November 4, 1930.
-------------------------------------------------
David Baird, Jr. (R-NJ)
Date Appointed: November 30, 1929
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Patrick J. Sullivan (R-WY)
Date Appointed: December 5, 1929
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Joseph R. Grundy (R-PA)
Date Appointed: December 11, 1929
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
John M. Robsion (R-KY)
Date Appointed: January 9, 1930
Elected: No, defeated in election for the vacancy and for full term on November 4, 1930.
-------------------------------------------------
Cameron Morrison (D-NC)
Date Appointed: December 13, 1930
Elected: No, failed to win nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Frank C. Partridge (R-VT)
Date Appointed: December 23, 1930
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Hattie W. Caraway (D-AR)
Date Appointed: November 13, 1931
Elected: Yes, on January 12, 1932.
-------------------------------------------------
W. Warren Barbour (R-NJ)
Date Appointed: December 1, 1931
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1932.
-------------------------------------------------
John S. Cohen (D-GA)
Date Appointed: April 25, 1932
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Walter Walker (D-CO)
Date Appointed: September 26, 1932
Elected: No, defeated on November 8, 1932.
-------------------------------------------------
Elijah S. Grammer (R-WA)
Date Appointed: November 22, 1932
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Nathan L. Bachman (D-TN)
Date Appointed: February 28, 1933
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1934.
-------------------------------------------------
Harry F. Byrd (D-VA)
Date Appointed: March 4, 1933
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 1933.
-------------------------------------------------
John E. Erickson (D-MT)
Date Appointed: March 13, 1933
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
William H. Thompson (D-NE)
Date Appointed: May 24, 1933
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Carl Atwood Hatch (D-NM)
Date Appointed: October 10, 1933
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1934.
-------------------------------------------------
Ernest W. Gibson (R-VT)
Date Appointed: November, 1933
Elected: Yes, on January 16, 1934
-------------------------------------------------
Joseph C. O'Mahoney (D-WY)
Date Appointed: December 18, 1933
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1934.
-------------------------------------------------
Dennis Chavez (D-NM)
Date Appointed: May 11, 1935
Elected: Yes, on November 3, 1936.
-------------------------------------------------
Elmer A. Benson (FL-MN)
Date Appointed: December 27, 1935
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Rose McConnell Long (D-LA)
Date Appointed: January 31, 1936
Elected: Yes, on April 21, 1936.
-------------------------------------------------
Scott M. Loftin (D-FL)
Date Appointed: May 26, 1936
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
William L. Hill (D-FL)
Date Appointed: July 1, 1936
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Herbert E. Hitchcock (D-SD)
Date Appointed: December 29, 1936
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
George L. Berry (D-TN)
Date Appointed: May 6, 1937
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Dixie Bibb Graves (D-AL)
Date Appointed: August 20, 1937
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
J. Lister Hill (D-AL)
Date Appointed: January 10, 1938
Elected: Yes, on April 26, 1938.
-------------------------------------------------
John G. Milton (D-NJ)
Date Appointed: January 18, 1938
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Alfred E. Reames (D-OR)
Date Appointed: February 1, 1938
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas M. Storke (D-CA)
Date Appointed: November 9, 1938
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
James M. Slattery (D-IL)
Date Appointed: April 14, 1939
Elected: No, defeated on November 6, 1940.
-------------------------------------------------
Albert B. Chandler (D-KY)
Date Appointed: October 10, 1939
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1940.
-------------------------------------------------
John Thomas (R-ID)
Date Appointed: January 27, 1940
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1940.
-------------------------------------------------
Ernest W. Gibson, Jr. (R-VT)
Date Appointed: June 24, 1940
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Joseph H. Ball (R-MN)
Date Appointed: October 14, 1940
Elected: Yes, on November 3, 1942.
-------------------------------------------------
Berkeley L. Bunker (D-NV)
Date Appointed: November 27, 1940
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Joseph Rosier (D-WV)
Date Appointed: January 13, 1941
Elected: No, defeated on November 17, 1942.
-------------------------------------------------
G. Lloyd Spencer (D-AR)
Date Appointed: April 1, 1941
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Andrew J. Houston (D-TX)
Date Appointed: April 21, 1941
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
James O. Eastland (D-MS)
Date Appointed: June 30, 1941
Elected: Did not seek election at this time, but was elected to the Senate in 1942.
-------------------------------------------------
Alva Moore Lumpkin (D-SC)
Date Appointed: July 17, 1941
Elected: No, died in office on August 1, 1941.
-------------------------------------------------
Roger C. Peace (D-SC)
Date Appointed: August 5, 1941
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Eugene D. Millikin (R-CO)
Date Appointed: December 20, 1941
Elected: Yes, on November 3, 1942.
-------------------------------------------------
Arthur Walsh (D-NJ)
Date Appointed: November 26, 1943
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Samuel D. Jackson (D-IN)
Date Appointed: January 28, 1944
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Sinclair Weeks (R-MA)
Date Appointed: February 8, 1944
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Guy Cordon (R-OR)
Date Appointed: March 4, 1944
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1944.
-------------------------------------------------
Wilton E. Hall (D-SC)
Date Appointed: November 20, 1944
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Frank P. Briggs (D-MO)
Date Appointed: January 18, 1945
Elected: No, defeated on November 5, 1946.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas C. Hart (R-CT)
Date Appointed: February 15, 1945
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Milton R. Young (R-ND)
Date Appointed: March 12, 1945
Elected: Yes, on June 25, 1946.
-------------------------------------------------
Edward P. Carville (D-NV)
Date Appointed: July 25, 1945
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
William F. Knowland (R-CA)
Date Appointed: August 14, 1945
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1946
-------------------------------------------------
James W. Huffman (D-OH)
Date Appointed: October 8, 1945
Elected: No, defeated on November 5, 1946.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles C. Gossett (D-ID)
Date Appointed: November 17, 1945
Elected: No, defeated on November 5, 1946.
-------------------------------------------------
William A. Stanfill (R-KY)
Date Appointed: November 19, 1945
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas G. Burch (D-VA)
Date Appointed: May 31, 1946
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
George R. Swift (D-AL)
Date Appointed: June 15, 1946
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Spessard L. Holland (D-FL)
Date Appointed: September 25, 1946
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1946.
-------------------------------------------------
Ralph E. Flanders (R-VT)
Date Appointed: November 1, 1946
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1946.
-------------------------------------------------
William B. Umstead (D-NC)
Date Appointed: December 18, 1946
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
William C. Feazel (D-LA)
Date Appointed: May 18, 1948
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Vera C. Bushfield (R-SD)
Date Appointed: October 6, 1948
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Garrett L. Withers (D-KY)
Date Appointed: January 20, 1949
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Frank P. Graham (D-NC)
Date Appointed: March 29, 1949
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
John Foster Dulles (R-NY)
Date Appointed: July 7, 1949
Elected: No, defeated on November 8, 1949.
-------------------------------------------------
Edward L. Leahy (D-RI)
Date Appointed: August 24, 1949
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Henry C. Dworshak (R-ID)
Date Appointed: October 14, 1949
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 1950.
-------------------------------------------------
Harry Darby (R-KS)
Date Appointed: December 2, 1949
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
William Benton (D-CT)
Date Appointed: December 17, 1949
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 1950.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas R. Underwood (D-KY)
Date Appointed: March 19, 1951
Elected: No, defeated on November 4, 1952.
-------------------------------------------------
Blair Moody (D-MI)
Date Appointed: April 22, 1951
Elected: No, defeated on November 4, 1952.
-------------------------------------------------
Frederick A. Seaton (R-NE)
Date Appointed: December 10, 1951
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
William A. Purtell (R-CT)
Date Appointed: August 29, 1952
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas H. Kuchel (R-CA)
Date Appointed: January 2, 1953
Elected: Yes, on November 2, 1954.
-------------------------------------------------
Alton A. Lennon (D-NC)
Date Appointed: July 10, 1953
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Robert W. Upton (R-NH)
Date Appointed: August 14, 1953
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas A. Burke (D-OH)
Date Appointed: October 12, 1953
Elected: No, defeated on November 2, 1954.
-------------------------------------------------
Eva Bowring (R-NE)
Date Appointed: April 16, 1954
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Sam J. Ervin, Jr. (D-NC)
Date Appointed: June 5, 1954
Elected: Yes, on November 2, 1954.
-------------------------------------------------
Edward D. Crippa (R-WY)
Date Appointed: June 24, 1954
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Sam W. Reynolds (R-NE)
Date Appointed: July 3, 1954
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles E. Daniel (D-SC)
Date Appointed: September 6, 1954
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Ernest S. Brown (R-NV)
Date Appointed: October 1, 1954
Elected: No, defeated on November 2, 1954.
-------------------------------------------------
William R. Laird, III (D-WV)
Date Appointed: March 13, 1956
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Thomas A. Wofford (D-SC)
Date Appointed: April 5, 1956
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Robert Humphreys (D-KY)
Date Appointed: June 21, 1956
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
William A. Blakley (D-TX)
Date Appointed: January 15, 1957
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
John D. Hoblitzell, Jr. (R-WV)
Date Appointed: January 25, 1958
Elected: No, defeated on November 4, 1958.
-------------------------------------------------
B. Everett Jordan (D-NC)
Date Appointed: April 19, 1958
Elected: Yes, on November 4, 1958.
-------------------------------------------------
C. Norman Brunsdale (R-ND)
Date Appointed: November 19, 1959
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Hall Lusk (D-OR)
Date Appointed: March 16, 1960
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Edward V. Long (D-MO)
Date Appointed: September 23, 1960
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1960.
-------------------------------------------------
Benjamin Smith (D-MA)
Date Appointed: December 27, 1960
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
William Blakley (D-TX)
Date Appointed: January 3, 1961
Elected: No, defeated on May 27, 1961.
-------------------------------------------------
J. Joseph Hickey (D-WY)
Date Appointed: January 3, 1961
Elected: No, defeated on November 6, 1962.
-------------------------------------------------
Maurice J. Murphy, Jr. (R-NH)
Date Appointed: December 7, 1961
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
James B. Pearson (R-KS)
Date Appointed: January 31, 1962
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1962
-------------------------------------------------
Joseph H. Bottum (R-SD)
Date Appointed: July 9, 1962
Elected: No, defeated on November 6, 1962.
-------------------------------------------------
Len Jordan (R-ID)
Date Appointed: August 6, 1962
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1962.
-------------------------------------------------
Edwin Mechem (R-NM)
Date Appointed: November 30, 1962
Elected: No, defeated on November 3, 1964.
-------------------------------------------------
J. Howard Edmondson (D-OK)
Date Appointed: January 7, 1963
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Herbert S. Walters (D-TN)
Date Appointed: August 20, 1963
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Pierre Salinger (D-CA)
Date Appointed: August 4, 1964
Elected: No, defeated on November 3, 1964.
-------------------------------------------------
Walter F. Mondale (D-MN)
Date Appointed: December 30, 1964
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1966.
-------------------------------------------------
Donald S. Russell (D-SC)
Date Appointed: April 22, 1965
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Harry F. Byrd, Jr. (D/I-VA)
Date Appointed: November 12, 1965
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1966.
-------------------------------------------------
Robert P. Griffin (R-MI)
Date Appointed: May 11, 1966
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1966.
-------------------------------------------------
Charles E. Goodell (R-NY)
Date Appointed: September 10, 1968
Elected: No, defeated on November 3, 1970.
-------------------------------------------------
Theodore (Ted) Stevens (R-AK)
Date Appointed: December 24, 1968
Elected: Yes, on November 3, 1970.
-------------------------------------------------
Ralph Tyler Smith (R-IL)
Date Appointed: September 17, 1969
Elected: No, defeated on November 3, 1970.
-------------------------------------------------
David H. Gambrell (D-GA)
Date Appointed: February 1, 1971
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Robert T. Stafford (R-VT)
Date Appointed: September 16, 1971
Elected: Yes, on January 7, 1972.
-------------------------------------------------
Elaine S. Edwards (D-LA)
Date Appointed: August 1, 1972
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Howard M. Metzenbaum (D-OH)
Date Appointed: January 4, 1974
Elected: No, defeated for nomination, but was successfully elected to the Senate in 1976.
-------------------------------------------------
Wendell R. Anderson (D-MN)
Date Appointed: December 30, 1976
Elected: No, defeated on November 7, 1978.
-------------------------------------------------
Kaneaster Hodges, Jr. (D-AR)
Date Appointed: December 10, 1977
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Paul G. Hatfield (D-MT)
Date Appointed: January 22, 1978
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Muriel B. Humphrey (D-MN)
Date Appointed: January 25, 1978
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Maryon P. Allen (D-AL)
Date Appointed: June 6, 1978
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
George J. Mitchell (D-ME)
Date Appointed: May 17, 1980
Elected: Yes, on November 2, 1982.
-------------------------------------------------
Nicholas F. Brady (R-NJ)
Date Appointed: April 12, 1982
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Daniel J. Evans (R-WA)
Date Appointed: September 8, 1983
Elected: Yes, on November 8, 1983
-------------------------------------------------
James T. Broyhill (R-NC)
Date Appointed: July 3, 1986
Elected: No, defeated on November 5, 1986.
-------------------------------------------------
David K. Karnes (R-NE)
Date Appointed: March 11, 1987
Elected: No, defeated on November 8, 1988.
-------------------------------------------------
Dan Coats (R-IN)
Date Appointed: January 3, 1989
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1990
-------------------------------------------------
Daniel K. Akaka (D-HI)
Date Appointed: May 16, 1990
Elected: Yes, on November 6, 1990
-------------------------------------------------
John Seymour (R-CA)
Date Appointed: January 3, 1991
Elected: No, defeated on November 3, 1992.
-------------------------------------------------
Harris Wofford (D-PA)
Date Appointed: May 9, 1991
Elected: Yes, on November 5, 1991.
-------------------------------------------------
Jocelyn Burdick (D-ND)
Date Appointed: September 16, 1992
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Harlan Mathews (D-TN)
Date Appointed: January 2, 1993
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Robert C. Krueger (D-TX)
Date Appointed: January 21, 1993
Elected: No, defeated on June 5, 1993.
-------------------------------------------------
Sheila Frahm (R-KS)
Date Appointed: June 11, 1996
Elected: No, defeated for nomination.
-------------------------------------------------
Lincoln Chafee (R-RI)
Date Appointed: November 2, 1999
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 2000.
-------------------------------------------------
Zell Miller (D-GA)
Date Appointed: July 24, 2000
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 2000.
-------------------------------------------------
Jean Carnahan (D-MO)
Date Appointed: Effective January 3, 2001
Elected: No, defeated on November 5, 2002
-------------------------------------------------
Dean Barkley (I-MN)
Date Appointed: November 4, 2002
Elected: Did not seek election.
-------------------------------------------------
Lisa Murkowski (R-AK)
Date Appointed: December 20, 2002
Elected: Yes, on November 2, 2004
-------------------------------------------------
Robert Menendez (D-NJ)
Date Appointed: January 17, 2006
Elected: Yes, on November 7, 2006
--------------------------------------------------
John A. Barrasso (R-WY)
Date Appointed: June 22, 2007
Elected: Yes, on November 4, 2008
--------------------------------------------------
Roger F. Wicker (R-MS)
Date Appointed: December 31, 2007
Elected: Yes, on November 4, 2008
--------------------------------------------------
Roland W. Burris (D-IL)
Date Appointed: December 31, 2008
Note: Appointed December 31, 2008, but credentials were not in order until January 12, 2009. Took oath of office on January 15, 2009.
-------------------------------------------------
Edward E. Kaufman (D-DE)
Date Appointed: January 15, 2009
-------------------------------------------------
Michael F. Bennet (D-CO)
Date Appointed: January 21, 2009
-------------------------------------------------
Kirsten E. Gillibrand (D-NY)
Date Appointed: January 26, 2009
Note: Appointed January 23, 2009, and appointment took effect upon her resignation from the House of Representatives on January 26, 2009. Took the oath of office on January 27, 2009.
-------------------------------------------------
|