- Info
The Presidents' Directors of Central Intelligence, 1946-96
President |
Director of Central Intelligence |
Harry S. Truman |
RAdm. Sidney W. Souers, USNR
23 January-10 June 1946
Lt. Gen. Hoyt S. Vandenberg, USA (Army Air Forces)
10 June 1946_1 May 1947
RAdm. Roscoe H. Hillenkoetter, USN
1 May 1947-7 October 1950
Gen. Walter Bedell Smith, USA
7 October 1950-9 February 1953 |
Dwight D. Eisenhower |
Gen. Walter Bedell Smith, USA
7 October 1950-9 February 1953
Allen W. Dulles
26 February 1953-29 November 1961 |
John F. Kennedy |
John A. McCone
29 November 1961-28 April 1965 |
Lyndon B. Johnson |
John A. McCone
29 November 1961-28 April 1965
VAdm. William F. Raborn, Jr., USN (Ret.)
28 April 1965-30 June 1966
Richard M. Helms
30 June 1966-2 February 1973 |
Richard M. Nixon |
Richard M. Helms
30 June 1966-2 February 1973
James R. Schlesinger
2 February 1973-2 July 1973
William E. Colby
4 September 1973-30 January 1976 |
Gerald R. Ford |
William E. Colby
4 September 1973-30 January 1976
George Bush
30 January 1976-20 January 1977 |
Jimmy Carter |
Adm. Stansfield Turner
9 March 1977-20 January 1981 |
Ronald Reagan |
William J. Casey
28 January 1981-29 January 1987
Judge William H. Webster
26 May 1987-31 August 1991 |
George Bush |
Judge William H. Webster
26 May 1987-31 August 1991
Robert M. Gates
6 November 1991-20 January 1993 |
William J. Clinton |
R. James Woolsey
5 February 1993-9 January 1995
John M. Deutch
Since 10 May 1995 |
Historical Document
Posted: Mar 19, 2007 01:33 PM
Last Updated: Jul 07, 2008 02:02 PM
Last Reviewed: Mar 19, 2007 01:33 PM