Home > News & Policies > Nominations by Name |
For Immediate Release
Office of the Press Secretary
June 11, 2008
Nominations Sent to the Senate
John O. Agwunobi, of Florida, to be a Member of the Board of Directors of the African Development Foundation for a term expiring February 9, 2014, vice Ephraim Batambuze, term expired.
Frederick S. Celec, of Virginia, to be Assistant to the Secretary of Defense for Nuclear and Chemical and Biological Defense Programs, vice Dale Klein, resigned.
Julius E. Coles, of Georgia, to be a Member of the Board of Directors of the African Development Foundation for a term expiring September 22, 2011, vice Willie Grace Campbell, term expired.
Morgan W. Davis, of California, to be a Member of the Board of Directors of the African Development Foundation for a term expiring November 13, 2013, vice Edward Brehm, term expired.
Marylyn Andrea Howe, of Massachusetts, to be a Member of the National Council on Disability for a term expiring September 17, 2011. (Reappointment)
John Melvin Jones, of Virginia, a Career Member of the Senior Foreign Service, Class of Counselor, to be Ambassador Extraordinary and Plenipotentiary of the United States of America to the Co-operative Republic of Guyana.
John W. Leslie, Jr., of Connecticut, to be a Member of the Board of Directors of the African Development Foundation for a term expiring September 22, 2013. (Reappointment)
Heather McCallum, of Georgia, to be a Member of the National Council on Disability for a term expiring September 17, 2011, vice Cynthia Allen Wainscott, term expiring.
Lonnie C. Moore, of Kansas, to be a Member of the National Council on Disability for a term expiring September 17, 2011. (Reappointment)
Christina Alvarado Shanahan, of North Carolina, to be a Member of the National Council on Disability for a term expiring September 17, 2011, vice Patricia Pound, term expired.
# # #