|
|
(last update Dec., 2008) |
PICES
OFFICERS |
|
|
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Tokio Wada (Japan) |
Oct. 23, 2006 - present |
Vera Alexander (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 27, 2002 - Oct. 22, 2006 |
Hyung Tack Huh (R. Korea) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 26, 2002 |
William G. Doubleday (Canada) |
Oct. 21, 1996 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
Warren S. Wooster1(U.S.A.) |
Oct. 17, 1992 - Oct. 20, 1996 |
|
1 acting Chairman Mar. 24, 1992 -
Oct. 16, 1992 |
|
Vice-Chairman |
|
|
|
Lev Bocharov (Russia) |
Oct. 23, 2006 - present |
Tokio Wada (Japan) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - Oct. 22, 2006 |
Tokimasa Kobayashi (Japan) |
Oct. 27, 2002 - Oct. 24, 2004 |
Vera Alexander (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 26, 2002 |
Hyung Tack Huh (R. Korea) |
Oct. 23, 1995 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
Cong-Meng Liu (P.R. China)
|
Oct. 30, 1993 - Oct. 22, 1995 |
|
|
|
Finance
and Administration Committee (F&A) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Patricia Livingston (U.S.A.) |
Nov. 2, 2008 - present |
Laura Richards (Canada) |
Oct. 24, 2004 - Nov. 2, 2008 |
Richard J. Marasco (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 23, 2004 |
Warren S. Wooster2 (U.S.A.) |
Nov. 4, 1997 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
John L. McGruder (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 21, 1996 - Nov. 4, 1997 |
John C. Davis (Canada) |
Oct. 17, 1992 - Oct. 20, 1996 |
|
2 acting Chairman |
|
|
|
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
John E. Stein (U.S.A.) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
Kuh Kim (R. Korea) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
R. Ian Perry (Canada) |
Oct. 14, 2001 - Oct. 24, 2004 |
Patricia Livingston (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 13, 2001 |
Makoto Kashiwai (Japan) |
Dec. 1, 1995 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
Daniel M. Ware (Canada) |
Oct. 17, 1992 - Nov. 30, 1995 |
|
|
Vice-Chairman |
|
|
|
Sinjae Yoo (R. Korea) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
John E. Stein (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
Vladimir I. Radchenko (Russia) |
Apr. 10, 2003 - Oct. 24, 2004 |
|
|
|
Biological
Oceanography Committee (BIO) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Michael J. Dagg (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - present |
Vladimir I. Radchenko (Russia) |
Oct. 14, 2001 - Oct. 24, 2004 |
Tsutomu Ikeda (Japan) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 13, 2001 |
Patricia A. Wheeler (U.S.A.) |
Dec. 1, 1995 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
Michael M. Mullin (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 17, 1992 - Nov. 30, 1995 |
|
|
|
Fishery
Science Committee (FIS) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Mikhail Stepanenko (Russia) |
Nov. 2, 2008 - present |
Gordon H. Kruse (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 10, 2005 - Nov. 2, 2008 |
Yukimasa Ishida (Japan) |
Oct. 27, 2002 - Oct. 9, 2005 |
Douglas E. Hay (Canada) |
Oct. 18, 1999 - Oct. 26, 2002 |
Chang Ik Zhang (R. Korea) |
Oct. 21, 1996 - Oct. 17, 1999 |
Qi-Sheng Tang4 (P.R. China) |
Oct. 31, 1993 - Oct. 20, 1996 |
Daniel M. Ware3 |
Oct. 17, 1992 |
|
3 elected as a formality before accepting
Chairmanship for the Science Board |
4 acting Chairman Oct. 17, 1992 -
Oct. 30, 1993 |
|
|
Marine
Environmental Quality Committee (MEQ) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Glen Jamieson (Canada) |
Oct. 18, 2006 - present |
John E. Stein (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 29, 2000 - Oct. 18, 2006 |
Alexander V. Tkalin (Russia) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 28, 2000 |
Richard F. Addison (Canada) |
Dec. 1, 1995 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
Jia-Yi Zhou (P.R. China) |
Oct. 17, 1992 - Nov. 30, 1995 |
|
|
Vice-Chairman |
|
|
|
Hak-Gyoon Kim (R. Korea) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
Hideaki Nakata (Japan) |
Oct. 10, 2005 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
|
|
|
Technical
Committee on Monitoring (MONITOR) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Hiroya Sugisaki (Japan) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
Jeffrey M. Napp (U.S.A.) |
Apr. 8, 2005 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
Phillip R. Mundy (U.S.A.) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - Apr. 7, 2005 |
|
|
|
|
Vice-Chairman |
|
|
|
Phillip Mundy (U.S.A.) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
Sei-ichi Saitoh (Japan) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
|
|
|
Physical
Oceanography and Climate Committee (POC) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Michael G. Foreman (Canada) |
Oct. 25, 2004 - present |
Kuh Kim (Republic of Korea) |
Oct. 14, 2001 - Oct. 24, 2004 |
Vyacheslav Lobanov (Russia) |
Oct. 26, 1998 - Oct. 13, 2001 |
Paul H. LeBlond (Canada) |
Dec. 1, 1995 - Oct. 25, 1998 |
Yutaka Nagata (Japan) |
Oct. 17, 1992 - Nov. 30, 1995 |
|
|
|
|
Vice-Chairman |
|
|
|
Ichiro Yasuda (Japan) |
Oct. 10, 2005 - present |
|
|
|
Technical
Committee on Data Exchange (TCODE) |
|
Chairman |
|
|
|
Bernard Megrey (U.S.A.) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
Igor I. Shevchenko (Russia) |
Oct. 14, 2001 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
Robin M. Brown (Canada) |
May 1, 1995 - Oct. 13, 2001 |
|
|
|
|
Vice-Chairman |
|
|
|
Kyu-Kui Jung (R. Korea) |
Nov. 6, 2007 - present |
Bernard A. Megrey (U.S.A.) |
tOct. 10, 2005 - Nov. 5, 2007 |
|
|
|
PICES
Secretariat |
|
Executive Secretary |
|
|
|
Alexander S. Bychkov (Russia) |
June 1, 1999 - present |
W. Doug McKone (Canada) |
Jan. 1, 1993 - Dec. 31, 1998 |
John C. Davis5 (Canada) |
Mar. 24, 1992 - Dec. 31, 1992 |
5 interim Executive Secretary |
|
|
|
|
Deputy Executive Secretary |
|
|
|
Stewart (Skip) M. McKinnell (Canada) |
Sept. 7, 1999 - present |
Alexander S. Bychkov6 (Russia) |
May 1, 1996 - May 31, 1999 |
Motoyasu Miyata6 (Japan) |
Apr. 22, 1993 - Apr. 22, 1996 |
|
6 formerly called “Assistant
Executive Secretary” for the period 1993 - 1999 |
|
|
|
Deputy Executive Secretary
on Administration |
|
|
Christina Chiu |
Jan. 1, 2003 - present |
|
|
|
|
Administrative Assistant |
|
|
Julia Yazvenko |
Jan. 1, 2003 - Dec. 31, 2004 |
Christina Chiu |
Feb. 8, 1993 - Dec. 31, 2002 |
|
|
|
|
Secretary |
|
|
Christie McAlister |
Jan. 1, 1995 - Sept. 30, 2002 |
|
|
|
|
Web and Database
Administrator |
|
|
Julia Yazvenko |
Jan. 1, 2005 - present |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|