Chief Administrative Officers of the House
(1995 to Present)
A House of Representatives officer from 1995 to the present, the Chief Administrative Officer (CAO) position was authorized by H. Res. 6 of the 104th Congress (1995-1997). The CAO is elected at the start of each Congress and oversees financial and administrative functions of the House previously administered by the Offices of the Postmaster and Doorkeeper. Under the current House Rule II, the CAO manages House computer systems, finances, human resources, media, and procurement.
The predecessor to the CAO was the Director of Non-Legislative and Financial Services.
Established by H. Res. 423 of the 102nd Congress (1991-1993), the Director reported
to the House Administration Committee. This appointed position was eliminated
at the end of the 103rd Congress (1993-1995). Unlike the Director of Non-Legislative
and Financial Services, the CAO reports directly to the Speaker of the House.
Congress (Years) |
Director of Non-Legislative and Financial Services, State or Territory1 |
Date Appointed |
---|---|---|
102nd (1991-93) | Leonard P. Wishart, III, NJ | Oct. 23, 1992 |
103rd (1993-95) | Leonard P. Wishart, III, NJ2 | Jan. 5, 1993 |
Randall B. Medlock | Jan. 19943 | |
Congress (Years) | Chief Administrative Officer, State or Territory | Date Elected |
104th (1995-97) | Scot M. Faulkner, WV4 | Jan. 4, 1995 |
Jeff Trandahl, SD | Nov. 22, 19965 | |
105th (1997-99) | Jeff Trandahl, SD | Jan. 9, 19976 |
James M. Eagen, III, PA | July 31, 19977 | |
106th (1999-2001) | James M. Eagen, III, PA | Jan. 6, 1999 |
107th (2001-03) | James M. Eagen, III, PA | Jan. 3, 2001 |
108th (2003-05) | James M. Eagen, III, PA | Jan. 7, 2003 |
109th (2005-07) | James M. Eagen, III, PA | Jan. 4, 2005 |
110th (2007-09) | James M. Eagen, III, PA | Jan. 4, 20078 |
Daniel P. Beard, MD | Feb. 15, 20079 | |
111th (2009-11) | Daniel P. Beard, MD | Jan. 6, 2009 |
Sources: Biographical Directory of the United States Congress (2005); Congressional Directory, various editions; Congressional Record, various editions; H. Rept. No. 97-HOC-12 (September 24, 1997).
1. Specific state information is provided when known.
2. Resigned January 10, 1994; resignation accepted
January 21, 1994. See the Congressional Record, 103rd Cong. 2nd sess. (February
3, 1994): 282.
3. A specific appointment date could not be located. For the approximate appointment date, see the CQ Almanac (1994) overview of the 103rd Congress: 13; and Roll Call, 17 January 1994.
4. Resigned November 22, 1996. CQ Almanac (1996) 104th Congress, 2nd sess.: 1-20.
5. Appointed November 22, 1996. "Congressional
(Speaker) Press Release," November 22, 1996. Roll Call, 25 November
1996: 1; 16.
6. Appointed January 9, 1997, "to act as and
to exercise temporarily" the CAO duties. See the Congressional Record,
105th Cong., 1st sess. (January 9, 1997): 76. Resigned July 1997.
7. Elected by H. Res. 207, on July 31, 1997. See Congressional Record, 105th Cong., 1st sess., (July 31, 1997): 6669.
8. Resigned February 14, 2007. See, Congressional Record, House, 110th Cong., 1st sess., (February 6, 2007): H1230.
9. Elected by H. Res. 129, on February 6, 2007. See, Congressional Record, 110th Cong., 1st sess., (February 6, 2007): H1230.