|
Mary E. Peters
Secretary of Transportation
Mary E. Peters was nominated by President George W. Bush on September 5, 2006, and confirmed by the U.S. Senate as the 15th Secretary of Transportation on September 30, 2006, after spending more than two decades crafting solutions to our nation's toughest transportation challenges.
More about Mary E. Peters... | Speeches |
|
Quintin C. Kendall
Chief of Staff
Quintin C. Kendall was appointed Chief of Staff at the U.S. Department of Transportation in January 2008.
More about Quintin C. Kendall... |
|
Vice Admiral Thomas J. Barrett
Deputy Secretary of Transportation
Vice Admiral Thomas J. Barrett, USCG (Ret.) was confirmed as the Deputy Secretary of Transportation on August 8, 2007.
More about Vice Admiral Thomas J. Barrett... |
|
Tyler Duvall
Acting Under Secretary for Policy
Assistant Secretary for Transportation Policy
Tyler Duvall became Acting Under Secretary for Policy effective February 1, 2008. He is also the Assistant Secretary for Transportation Policy in the Office of the Secretary at the U.S. Department of Transportation.
More about Tyler
Duvall... |
|
D.J. Gribbin
General Counsel
D.J. Gribbin was sworn in as the General Counsel on June 22, 2007.
More about D.J. Gribbin... |
|
Michael W. Reynolds
Acting Assistant Secretary for Aviation and International Affairs
Michael W. Reynolds was appointed by President Bush as Deputy Assistant Secretary of Transportation for Aviation and International Affairs in October 2002.
More about Michael W. Reynolds... |
|
Daniel G. Mintz
Chief Information Officer
Daniel G. Mintz currently serves as the Chief Information Officer (CIO) for the United States Department of Transportation (DOT).
More about Daniel G. Mintz... |
|
Phyllis F. Scheinberg
Assistant Secretary for Budget & Programs and Chief Financial Officer
Phyllis F. Scheinberg was nominated by the President and confirmed by the Senate on April 29, 2005, to be the Assistant Secretary for Budget and Programs/Chief Financial Officer for the U.S. Department of Transportation (DOT).
More about Phyllis F. Scheinberg... |
|
Linda J. Washington
Assistant Secretary for Administration
On May 25, 2007, Linda Jacobs Washington was appointed as the Assistant Secretary for Administration.
More about Linda J. Washington... |
|
Simon C. Gros
Assistant Secretary for Governmental Affairs
Simon C. Gros is the Assistant Secretary for Governmental Affairs at the U.S. Department of Transportation.
More about Simon C. Gros... |
|
Robert A. Sturgell
Acting Administrator, Federal Aviation Administration
Sturgell was sworn in as the 12th Deputy Administrator of the Federal Aviation Administration on March 24, 2003.
More about Robert A. Sturgell... |
|
Thomas J. Madison, Jr.
Administrator, Federal Highway Administration
Thomas J. Madison, Jr. was confirmed by the United States Senate to be Administrator of the Federal Highway Administration at the U.S. Department of Transportation on August 1, 2008. He was sworn in as Administrator on August 18, 2008.
More about Thomas J. Madison, Jr... |
|
John H. Hill
Administrator, Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration
John H. Hill was nominated by President George W. Bush to become Administrator of the Federal Motor Carrier Safety Administration (FMCSA) on May 16, 2006.
More about John H. Hill... |
|
Joseph H. Boardman
Administrator, Federal Railroad Administration
Nominated by President George W. Bush on March 17, 2005 and confirmed by the
United States Senate on April 28, 2005, Joseph H. Boardman is the eleventh Federal
Railroad Administrator.
More about Joseph H. Boardman... |
|
James S. Simpson
Administrator, Federal Transit Administration
Mr. James S. Simpson was sworn in as the Federal Transit Administrator on August 10, 2006.
More about James S. Simpson... |
|
Sean Connaughton
Maritime Administrator
Sean Connaughton was nominated by President Bush to be the Maritime
Administrator on June 27, 2006, and was confirmed by the Senate
on August 3, 2006.
More
about Sean Connaughton... |
|
Nicole Nason
Administrator, National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Ms. Nason began her duties on May 31, 2006.
More about Nicole Nason... |
|
Calvin Scovel
Inspector General, Office of the Inspector General
Calvin Scovel is the Inspector General for the U.S. Department of Transportation.
More about Calvin Scovel... |
|
Carl T. Johnson
Administrator, Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration
On January 9, 2008, U.S. Transportation Secretary Mary E. Peters announced Carl T. Johnson as the second Administrator of the Pipeline and Hazardous Materials Safety Administration (PHMSA).
More about Carl T. Johnson... |
|
Paul Brubaker
Administrator, Research and Innovative Technology Administration
Paul Brubaker was nominated by President George W. Bush to serve as Administrator of the U.S. Department of Transportation’s (DOT) Research and Innovative Technology Administration (RITA) on June 18, 2007.
More about Paul Brubaker... |
|
Collister ("Terry") Johnson, Jr.
Administrator, Saint Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation
Collister (“Terry”) Johnson, Jr. was sworn in by U.S. Secretary of Transportation Mary E. Peters on October 7, 2006 as the ninth Administrator of the Saint Lawrence Seaway Development Corporation (SLSDC).
More about Collister ("Terry") Johnson, Jr.... |