Marshal
|
DATE |
VICE
|
|
Southern District of California |
NORIEGA, Pablo |
September 30, 1850 (S) |
Original Appointment |
HUNTER, Edward |
August 4, 1854 (S) |
Noriega (Resigned) |
PENNIE, James C. |
April 21, 1857 (R) May 17, 1858 (S)
|
Hunter (Resigned) |
BARROWS, Henry D. |
April 9, 1861 (R) July 22, 1861 (S) January 12, 1866 (S)
|
Pennie (Removed) |
|
District of California |
RAND, Charles W. |
July 27, 1866 (S) |
Himself as Marshal of Northern District of California |
MORRIS, William G. |
April 5, 1870 (S) |
|
MARCELLUS, Edward P. |
December 19, 1873 (S) |
Morris (No Reason Given) |
POOLE, A.W. |
January 22, 1878 (S) |
Marcellus (Term Expired) |
DREW, Moses M. |
February 20, 1882 (S) |
Poole (Term Expired) |
FRANKS, John C. |
February 19, 1886 (S) |
Drew (Term Expired) |
|
Northern District of California |
FRANKS, John C. |
August 5, 1886 |
Himself as Marshal of District of California |
LONG, William G. |
February 27, 1890 (S) |
Franks (Term Expired) |
BALDWIN, Barry |
May 29, 1894 (S) |
Long (Term Expired) |
SHINE, John H. |
April 21, 1898 (S)
May 7, 1902 (S) |
Baldwin (Term Expired) |
Holohan, James B. |
January 13, 1914 (C.A.) March 2, 1914 (C)
July 6, 1918 (C) |
Elliott (Removed) |
ESOLA, Frederick L. |
February 8, 1924 (C) March 5, 1928 (C)
February 27, 1932 (C) |
Holohan (Term Expired) |
VICE, George |
September 18, 1933 (R)February 3, 1934 (C) March 21, 1938 (C)
November 5, 1943 (C) |
Esola (Resigned) |
ROSEEN, John A. |
February 12, 1949 (C.A.) |
Vice (Retired) |
CARRINGTON, Edward J. |
August 5, 1950 (C) |
Roseen (C.A.) |
ROSEEN, John A. |
August 9, 1951 (C.A.) April 8, 1952 (C)
|
Carrigan (Removed) |
BELL, Frank O. |
July 17, 1953 (C) April 16, 1957 (C)
|
Roseen (Resigned) |
HESLEP, Edward A. |
June 28, 1961 (C) November 3, 1966 (C)
|
Bell (Term Expired) |
|
Central District of California |
O'BRIEN, George E. |
September 18, 1966 (C) |
Himself as Marshal of Southern District. Transferred by PL 89-372;
effective September 18, 1966. |
FREEMAN, Edward R. |
June 9, 1969 (C.A.) |
O'Brien (Retired) |
CAMPBELL, Gaylord L. |
October 2, 1969 (C) November 28, 1973 (C)
|
Freeman (C.A.) |
VILLAESCUSA, Lois G. |
December 15, 1977 (C) |
Campbell (Resigned) |
VOKES, Thomas R. |
January 13, 1981 (C.A.) |
Villaescusa (Resigned) |
ADAMS, Mike |
March 17, 1982 (C.A.) |
|
GONZALEZ, Julio |
July 22, 1982 (C) |
|
CICCHINO, Samuel |
January 3, 1988 (C.A.) |
Gonzalez (Resigned) |
MEACHAM, Craig |
February 9, 1990 (C) |
|
PEREZ, Jose Antionio "Tony" |
August 1, 1994 (Acting) |
Meacham (Resigned) |
RAMON, Michael R. |
October 5, 1994 (A.G.) October 11, 1994 (C) |
Perez |
PEREZ, Jose Antionio "Tony" |
1998 (Acting) |
Ramon |
PEREZ, Jose Antionio "Tony" |
April 25, 2000 |
Acting Appointment Changed |
TORRES, Adam N. |
5/14/03 |
|
|