Name |
Position |
Dates of Service |
Dawn Tisdale (D) |
Commissioner |
Dec. 1, 2004-Nov. 22, 2007 |
George A. Omas (R) |
Chairman
Commissioner |
Nov. 30, 2001-Dec. 9, 2006
Aug. 8, 1997-Nov. 29,2001 |
Dana B. "Danny" Covington (R) |
Commissioner |
Nov. 2, 1998-Oct. 14, 2005 |
W.H. "Trey" LeBlanc (D) |
Commissioner |
Nov. 24, 1987-Nov. 22, 2001 |
Edward J. Gleiman (I) |
Chairman |
Feb. 23, 1994-Feb. 2, 2001 |
George W. Haley (R) |
Commissioner
Chairman |
Dec. 1, 1993-Sep. 10, 1998
Feb. 14, 1990-Oct. 14, 1993 |
H. Edward Quick, Jr. (D) |
Commissioner |
Dec. 2, 1991-Nov. 22, 1997 |
Wayne A. Schley (R) |
Commissioner |
Dec. 30, 1992-Oct. 14, 1995 |
John W. Crutcher (R) |
Commissioner |
Mar. 9, 1982-Oct. 14, 1993 |
Henry R. Folsom (R) |
Commissioner |
Mar. 9, 1982-Dec. 29, 1992 |
Patti Birge Tyson (D) |
Commissioner |
Sep. 12, 1985-Nov. 22, 1991 |
Janet D. Steiger (R) |
Chairman
Commissioner |
Feb. 3, 1982-Aug. 10, 1989
Oct. 15, 1980-Feb. 2, 1982 |
Henrietta F. Guiton (D) |
Commissioner |
Dec. 20, 1984-Jun. 19, 1987 |
James H. Duffy (D) |
Commissioner |
May 11, 1979-Sep. 11, 1985 |
Simeon M. Bright (D) |
Commissioner |
Dec. 15, 1977-Oct. 12, 1984 |
Clyde S. DuPont (R) |
Commissioner
Chairman
Commissioner |
Jul. 30, 1979-Sep. 14, 1981
Mar. 14, 1975-Jul 29, 1979
Sep. 20, 1974-Mar. 13, 1975 |
A. Lee Fritschler (D) |
Commissioner
Chairman |
Mar. 5, 1981-Aug. 31, 1981
Jul. 31, 1979-Mar. 4, 1981 |
Kieran O'Doherty (NYC) |
Commissioner |
Feb. 20, 1975-Oct. 14, 1980 |
Carlos C. Villarreal (R) |
Commissioner |
Apr. 5, 1973-Feb. 1, 1979 |
Frank P. Saponaro (I) |
Commissioner |
Oct. 15, 1970-Oct. 14, 1977 |
Paul A. Miltich (R) |
Commissioner |
Mar. 13, 1975-Mar. 7, 1977 |
Fred B. Rhodes (R) |
Chairman |
Jan. 18, 1974-Dec. 30, 1974 |
Nathan A. Baily (D) |
Commissioner |
Oct. 15, 1970-Oct. 14, 1974 |
Rod Kreger (R) |
Commissioner |
Aug. 6, 1973-Jan. 7, 1974 |
John L. Ryan (R) |
Chairman
Commissioner |
Aug. 4, 1973-Oct. 31, 1973
Nov. 23, 1970-Aug. 3, 1973 |
William J. Crowley (R) |
Chairman |
Oct. 15, 1970-May 1, 1973 |
Howard Elliott, Jr. (R) |
Commissioner |
Nov. 23, 1970-Feb. 28, 1973 |