1st Congress (1789-1791)
John Langdon (NH)
April 6, 1789 - April 21, 1789
August 7, 1789 - August 9, 1789
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
2nd Congress (1791-1793)
Richard Henry Lee (VA)
April 18, 1792 - October 8, 1792
John Langdon (NH)
November 5, 1792 - December 4, 1792
March 1, 1793 - March 3, 1793
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
3rd Congress (1793-1795)
John Langdon (NH)
March 4, 1793 - December 2, 1793
Ralph Izard (SC)
May 31, 1794 - November 9, 1794
Henry Tazewell (VA)
February 20, 1795 - June 7, 1795
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
4th Congress (1795-1797)
Henry Tazewell (VA)
December 7, 1795 - December 8, 1795
Samuel Livermore (NH)
May 6, 1796 - December 4, 1796
William Bingham (PA)
February 16, 1797 - March 3, 1797
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
5th Congress (1797-1799)
William Bradford (RI)
July 6, 1797 - October 1797
Jacob Read (SC)
November 22, 1797 - December 12, 1797
Theodore Sedgwick (MA)
June 27, 1798 - December 5, 1798
John Laurance (NY)
December 6, 1798 - December 27, 1798
James Ross (PA)
March 1, 1799 - December 1, 1799
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
6th Congress (1799-1801)
Samuel Livermore (NH)
December 2, 1799 - December 29, 1799
Uriah Tracy (CT)
May 14, 1800 - November 16, 1800
John E. Howard (MD)
November 21, 1800 - November 27, 1800
James Hillhouse (CT)
February 28, 1801 - March 3, 1801
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
7th Congress (1801-1803)
Abraham Baldwin (GA)
December 7, 1801 - January 14, 1802
April 17, 1802 - December 13, 1802
Stephen R. Bradley (VT)
December 14, 1802 - January 18, 1803
February 25, 1803 - February 25, 1803
March 2, 1803 - October 16, 1803
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
8th Congress (1803-1805)
John Brown (KY)
October 17, 1803 - December 6, 1803
January 23, 1804 - February 26, 1804
Jesse Franklin (NC)
March 10, 1804 - November 4, 1804
Joseph Anderson (TN)
January 15, 1805 - February 3, 1805
February 28, 1805 - March 2, 1805
March 2, 1805 - December 1, 1805
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
9th Congress (1805-1807)
Samuel Smith (MD)
December 2, 1805 - December 15, 1805
March 18, 1806 - November 30, 1806
March 2, 1807 - October 25, 1807
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
10th Congress (1807-1809)
Samuel Smith (MD)
April 16, 1808 - November 6, 1808
Stephen R. Bradley (VT)
December 28, 1808 - January 8, 1809
John Milledge (GA)
January 30, 1809 - March 3, 1809
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
11th Congress (1809-1811)
John Milledge (GA)
March 4, 1809 - May 21, 1809
Andrew Gregg (PA)
June 26, 1809 - December 18, 1809
John Gaillard (SC)
February 28, 1810 - March 2, 1810
April 17, 1810 - December 11, 1810
John Pope (KY)
February 23, 1811 - November 3, 1811
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
12th Congress (1811-1813)
William Crawford (GA)
March 24, 1812 - March 23, 1813
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
13th Congress (1813-1815)
Joseph B. Varnum (MA)
December 6, 1813 - February 3, 1814
John Gaillard (SC)
April 18, 1814 - November 25, 1814
November 25, 1814 - December 3, 1815
Note: Gaillard was elected after the death of Vice President Elbridge Gerry and continued to serve throughout the Fourteenth Congress, as there was no vice president.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
14th Congress (1815-1817
John Gaillard (SC)
December 4, 1815 - March 3, 1817
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
15th Congress (1817-1819)
John Gaillard (SC)
March 4, 1817 - March 4, 1817
March 6, 1817 - February 18, 1818
March 31, 1818 - January 5, 1819
James Barbour (VA)
February 15, 1819 - December 5, 1819
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
16th Congress (1819-1821)
James Barbour (VA)
December 6, 1819 - December 26, 1819
John Gaillard (SC)
January 25, 1820 - December 2, 1821
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
17th Congress (1821-1823)
John Gaillard (SC)
December 3, 1821 - December 27, 1821
February 1, 1822 - December 2, 1822
February 19, 1823 - November 30, 1823
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
18th Congress (1823-1825)
John Gaillard (SC)
December 1, 1823 - January 20, 1824
May 21, 1824 - March 3, 1825
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
19th Congress (1825-1827)
John Gaillard (SC)
March 9, 1825 - December 4, 1825
Nathaniel Macon (NC)
May 20, 1826 - December 3, 1826
January 2, 1827 - February 13, 1827
March 2, 1827 - December 2, 1827
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
20th Congress (1827-1829)
Samuel Smith (MD)
May 15, 1828 - December 18, 1828
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
21st Congress (1829-1831)
Samuel Smith (MD)
March 13, 1829 - December 10, 1829
May 29, 1830 - December 31, 1830
March 1, 1831 - December 4, 1831
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
22nd Congress (1831-1833)
Samuel Smith (MD)
December 5, 1831 - December 11, 1831
Littleton Tazewell (VA)
July 9, 1832 - July 16, 1832
Hugh L. White (TN)
December 3, 1832 - December 1, 1833
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
23rd Congress (1833-1835)
Hugh L. White (TN)
December 2, 1833 - December 15, 1833
George Poindexter (MS)
June 28, 1834 - November 30, 1834
John Tyler (VA)
March 3, 1835 - December 6, 1835
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
24th Congress (1835-1837)
William R. King (AL)
July 1, 1836 - December 4, 1836
January 28, 1837 - March 3, 1837
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
25th Congress (1837-1839)
William R. King (AL)
March 7, 1837 - September 3, 1837
October 13, 1837 - December 3, 1837
July 2, 1838 - December 18, 1838
February 25, 1839 - December 1, 1839
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
26th Congress (1839-1841)
William R. King (AL)
December 2, 1839 - December 26, 1839
July 3, 1840 - December 15, 1840
March 3, 1841 - March 3, 1841
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
27th Congress (1841-1843)
William R. King (AL)
March 4, 1841 - March 4, 1841
Samuel Southard (NJ)
March 11, 1841 - May 31, 1842
Willie P. Mangum (NC)
May 31, 1842 - December 3, 1843
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
28th Congress (1843-1845)
Willie P. Mangum (NC)
December 4, 1843 - March 3, 1845
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
29th Congress (1845-1847)
Willie P. Mangum (NC)
March 4, 1845 - March 4, 1845
Ambrose H. Sevier (AR)
December 27, 1845
David R. Atchison (MO)
August 8, 1846 - December 6, 1846
January 11, 1847 - January 13, 1847
March 3, 1847 - December 5, 1847
Note: Ambrose H. Sevier was not elected as president pro tempore in an official manner, but "permitted to occupy the chair for the day."
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
30th Congress (1847-1849)
David R. Atchison (MO)
February 2, 1848 - February 8, 1848
June 1, 1848 - June 14, 1848
June 26, 1848 - June 29, 1848
July 29, 1848 - December 4, 1848
December 26, 1848 - January 1, 1849
March 2, 1849 - March 4, 1849
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
31st Congress (1849-1851)
David R. Atchison (MO)
March 5, 1849 - March 5, 1849
March 16, 1849 - December 2, 1849
William R. King (AL)
May 6, 1850 - May 19, 1850
July 11, 1850 - March 3, 1851
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
32nd Congress (1851-1853)
William R. King (AL)
March 4, 1851 - December 20, 1852
David R. Atchison (MO)
December 20, 1852 - March 3, 1853
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
33rd Congress (1853-1855)
David R. Atchison (MO)
March 4, 1853 - December 4, 1854
Lewis Cass (MI)
December 4, 1854 - December 4, 1854
Jesse D. Bright (IN)
December 5, 1854 - December 2, 1855
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
34th Congress (1855-1857)
Jesse D. Bright (IN)
December 3, 1855 - June 9, 1856
Charles E. Stuart (MI)
June 9, 1856 - June 10, 1856
Jesse D. Bright (IN)
June 11, 1856 - January 6, 1857
James M. Mason (VA)
January 6, 1857 - March 3, 1857
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
35th Congress (1857-1859)
James M. Mason (VA)
March 4, 1857 - March 4, 1857
Thomas J. Rusk (TX)
March 14, 1857 - July 29, 1857
Benjamin Fitzpatrick (AL)
December 7, 1857 - December 20, 1857
March 29, 1858 - May 2, 1858
June 14, 1858 - December 5, 1858
January 19, 1859 - January 19, 1859
January 25, 1859 - February 9, 1859
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
36th Congress (1859-1861)
Benjamin Fitzpatrick (AL)
March 9, 1859 - December 4, 1859
December 19, 1859 - January 15, 1860
February 20, 1860 - February 26, 1860
Jesse D. Bright (IN)
June 12, 1860 - June 13, 1860
Benjamin Fitzpatrick (AL)
June 26, 1860 - December 2, 1860
Solomon Foot (VT)
February 16, 1861 - February 17, 1861
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
37th Congress (1861-1863)
Solomon Foot (VT)
March 23, 1861 - July 3, 1861
July 18, 1861 - December 1, 1861
January 15, 1862 - January 15, 1862
March 31, 1862 - May 21, 1862
June 19, 1862 - December 12, 1862
February 18, 1863 - March 3, 1863
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
38th Congress (1863-1865)
Solomon Foot (VT)
March 4, 1863 - December 6, 1863
December 18, 1863 - December 20, 1863
February 23, 1864 - February 23, 1864
March 11, 1864 - March 13, 1864
April 11, 1864 - April 13, 1864
Daniel Clark (NH)
April 26, 1864 - January 4, 1865
February 9, 1865 - February 19, 1865
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
39th Congress (1865-1867)
Lafayette S. Foster (CT)
March 7, 1865 - March 2, 1867
Benjamin F. Wade (OH)
March 2, 1867 - March 3, 1867
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
40th Congress (1867-1869)
Benjamin F. Wade (OH)
March 4, 1867 - March 3, 1869
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
41st Congress (1869-1871)
Henry B. Anthony (RI)
March 23, 1869 - March 28, 1869
April 9, 1869 - December 5, 1869
May 28, 1870 - June 2, 1870
July 1, 1870 - July 5, 1870
July 14, 1870 - December 4, 1870
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
42nd Congress (1871-1873)
Henry B. Anthony (RI)
March 10, 1871 - March 12, 1871
April 17, 1871 - May 9, 1871
May 23, 1871 - December 3, 1871
December 21, 1871 - January 7, 1872
February 23, 1872 - February 25, 1872
June 8, 1872 - December 1, 1872
December 4, 1872 - December 8, 1872
December 13, 1872 - December 15, 1872
December 20, 1872 - January 5, 1873
January 24, 1873 - January 24, 1873
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
43rd Congress (1873-1875)
Matthew H. Carpenter (WI)
March 12, 1873 - March 13, 1873
March 26, 1873 - November 30, 1873
December 11, 1873 - December 6, 1874
December 23, 1874 - January 4, 1875
Henry B. Anthony (RI)
January 25, 1875 - January 31, 1875
February 15, 1875 - February 17, 1875
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
44th Congress (1875-1877)
Thomas W. Ferry (MI)
March 9, 1875 - March 10, 1875
March 19, 1875 - December 20, 1875
December 20, 1875 - March 4, 1877
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
45th Congress (1877-1879)
Thomas W. Ferry (MI)
March 5, 1877 - March 5, 1877
February 26, 1878 - March 3, 1878
April 17, 1878 - December 1, 1878
March 3, 1879 - March 17, 1879
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
46th Congress (1879-1881)
Allen G. Thurman (OH)
April 15, 1879 - November 30, 1879
April 7, 1880 - April 14, 1880
May 6, 1880 - December 5, 1880
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
47th Congress (1881-1883)
Thomas F. Bayard (DE)
October 10, 1881 - October 13, 1881
David Davis (IL)
October 13, 1881 - March 3, 1883
George F. Edmunds (VT)
March 3, 1883 - December 2, 1883
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
48th Congress (1883-1885)
George F. Edmunds (VT)
December 3, 1883 - January 14, 1884
January 14, 1884 - March 3, 1885
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
49th Congress (1885-1887)
John Sherman (OH)
December 7, 1885 - February 26, 1887
John J. Ingalls (KS)
February 26, 1887 - December 4, 1887
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
50th Congress (1887-1889)
John J. Ingalls (KS)
December 5, 1887 - March 3, 1889
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
51st Congress (1889-1891)
John J. Ingalls (KS)
March 7, 1889 - March 17, 1889
April 2, 1889 - December 1, 1889
December 5, 1889 - December 10, 1889
February 28, 1890 - March 18, 1890
April 3, 1890 - March 2, 1891
Charles F. Manderson (NE)
March 2, 1891 - December 6, 1891
Note: In March, 1890, the Senate adopted a resolution stating that presidents pro tempore would hold office continuously until the election of another president pro tempore, rather than being elected for the period in which the vice president was absent. With the exception of the unusual case of the 62nd Congress, this new system has continued to the present.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
52nd Congress (1891-1893)
Charles F. Manderson (NE)
December 7, 1891 - March 3, 1893
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
53rd Congress (1893-1895)
Charles F. Manderson (NE)
March 4, 1893 - March 22, 1893
Isham G. Harris (TN)
March 22, 1893 - January 7, 1895
Matt W. Ransom (NC)
January 7, 1895 - January 10, 1895
Isham G. Harris (TN)
January 10, 1895 - March 3, 1895
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
54th Congress (1895-1897)
William P. Frye (ME)
February 7, 1896 - March 3, 1897
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
55th Congress (1897-1899)
William P. Frye (ME)
March 4, 1897 - December 3, 1899
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
56th Congress (1899-1901)
William P. Frye (ME)
December 4, 1899 - March 3, 1901
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
57th Congress (1901-1903)
William P. Frye (ME)
March 7, 1901 - March 4, 1903
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
58th Congress (1903-1905)
William P. Frye (ME)
March 5, 1903 - March 3, 1905
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
59th Congress (1905-1907)
William P. Frye (ME)
March 4, 1905 - March 3, 1907
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
60th Congress (1907-1909)
William P. Frye (ME)
December 5, 1907 - March 3, 1909
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
61st Congress (1909-1911)
William P. Frye (ME)
March 4, 1909 - April 3, 1911
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
62nd Congress (1911-1913)
William P. Frye (ME)
April 4, 1911 - April 27, 1911
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
August 14, 1911 - August 14, 1911
Charles Curtis (KS)
December 4, 1911 - December 12, 1911
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
January 15, 1912 - January 17, 1912
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
February 12, 1912 - February 14, 1912
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
March 11, 1912 - March 12, 1912
Frank B. Brandegee (CT)
March 25, 1912 - March 26, 1912
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
April 8, 1912 - April 8, 1912
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
April 26, 1912 - April 27, 1912
May 7, 1912 - May 7, 1912
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
May 10, 1912 - May 10, 1912
Henry Cabot Lodge (MA)
May 25, 1912 - May 25, 1912
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
May 30, 1912 - June 3, 1912
June 13, 1912 - July 5, 1912
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
July 6, 1912 - July 31, 1912
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
August 1, 1912 - August 10, 1912
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
August 12, 1912 - August 26, 1912
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
August 27, 1912 - December 15, 1912
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
December 16, 1912 - January 4, 1913
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
January 5, 1913 - January 18, 1913
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
January 19, 1913 - February 1, 1913
Augustus O. Bacon (GA)
February 2, 1913 - February 15, 1913
Jacob H. Gallinger (NH)
February 16, 1913 - March 3, 1913
Note: William Frye resigned as president pro tempore due to ill health and died on August 8, 1911. Electing his successor proved difficult for the Senate, since Senate Republicans, then in the majority, split between the progressive and the conservative factions, each promoting its own candidate. Likewise, the Democrats proposed their own candidate. As a result of this three-way split, no individual received a majority vote. During May and June of 1911, ballot after ballot failed to elect a president pro tempore. Finally, desperate to return to regular business, senators agreed to a compromised solution: Democrat Augustus Bacon would serve for a single day, August 14, 1911, during the vice president's absence. Thereafter, Bacon and four Republicans -- Charles Curtis, Jacob Gallinger, Henry Cabot Lodge, and Frank Brandegee -- would alternate as president pro tempore for the remainder of the 62nd Congress.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
63rd Congress (1913-1915)
James P. Clarke (AR)
March 13, 1913 - March 3, 1915
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
64th Congress (1915-1917)
James P. Clarke (AR)
December 6, 1915 - October 1, 1916
Willard Saulsbury (DE)
December 14, 1916 - March 4, 1917
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
65th Congress (1917-1919)
Willard Saulsbury (DE)
March 5, 1917 - March 3, 1919
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
66th Congress (1919-1921)
Albert B. Cummins (IA)
May 19, 1919 - March 3, 1921
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
67th Congress (1921-1923)
Albert B. Cummins (IA)
March 7, 1921 - December 2, 1923
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
68th Congress (1923-1925)
Albert B. Cummins (IA)
December 3, 1923 - March 3, 1925
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
69th Congress (1925-1927)
Albert B. Cummins (IA)
March 4, 1925 - March 6, 1925
George H. Moses (NH)
March 6, 1925 - March 4, 1927
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
70th Congress (1927-1929)
George H. Moses (NH)
December 15, 1927 - March 3, 1929
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
71st Congress (1929-1931)
George H. Moses (NH)
March 4, 1929 - December 6, 1931
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
72nd Congress (1931-1933)
George H. Moses (NH)
December 7, 1931 - March 3, 1933
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
73rd Congress (1933-1935)
Key Pittman (NV)
March 9, 1933 - January 2, 1935
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
74th Congress (1935-1937)
Key Pittman (NV)
January 7, 1935 - January 4, 1937
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
75th Congress (1937-1939)
Key Pittman (NV)
January 5, 1937 - January 2, 1939
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
76th Congress (1939-1941)
Key Pittman (NV)
January 3, 1939 - November 10, 1940
William H. King (UT)
November 19, 1940 - January 3, 1941
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
77th Congress (1941-1943)
Pat Harrison (MS)
January 6, 1941 - June 22, 1941
Carter Glass (VA)
July 10, 1941 - January 5, 1943
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
78th Congress (1943-1945)
Carter Glass (VA)
January 14, 1943 - January 2, 1945
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
79th Congress (1945-1947)
Kenneth McKellar (TN)
January 6, 1945 - January 2, 1947
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
80th Congress (1947-1949)
Arthur H. Vandenberg (MI)
January 4, 1947 - January 2, 1949
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
81st Congress (1949-1951)
Kenneth McKellar (TN)
January 3, 1949 - January 2, 1951
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
82nd Congress (1951-1953)
Kenneth McKellar (TN)
January 3, 1951 - January 2, 1953
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
83rd Congress (1953-1955)
Styles Bridges (NH)
January 3, 1953 - January 4, 1955
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
84th Congress (1955-1957)
Walter F. George (GA)
January 5, 1955 - January 2, 1957
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
85th Congress (1957-1959)
Carl T. Hayden (AZ)
January 3, 1957 - January 6, 1959
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
86th Congress (1959-1961)
Carl T. Hayden (AZ)
January 7, 1959 - January 2, 1961
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
87th Congress (1961-1963)
Carl T. Hayden (AZ)
January 3, 1961 - January 8, 1963
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
88th Congress (1963-1965)
Carl T. Hayden (AZ)
January 9, 1963 - January 3, 1965
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
89th Congress (1965-1967)
Carl T. Hayden (AZ)
January 4, 1965 - January 9, 1967
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
90th Congress (1967-1969)
Carl T. Hayden (AZ)
January 10, 1967 - January 2, 1969
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
91st Congress (1969-1971)
Richard B. Russell (GA)
January 3, 1969 - January 20, 1971
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
92nd Congress (1971-1973)
Richard B. Russell (GA)
January 21, 1971 - January 21, 1971
Allen J. Ellender (LA)
January 22, 1971 - July 27, 1972
James O. Eastland (MS)
July 28, 1972 - January 2, 1973
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
93rd Congress (1973-1975)
James O. Eastland (MS)
January 3, 1973 - January 13, 1975
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
94th Congress (1975-1977)
James O. Eastland (MS)
January 14, 1975 - January 3, 1977
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
95th Congress (1977-1979)
James O. Eastland (MS)
January 4, 1977 - December 27, 1978
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
96th Congress (1979-1981)
Warren G. Magnuson (WA)
January 15, 1979 - December 4, 1980
Milton R. Young (ND)
December 5, 1980 - December 5, 1980
Warren G. Magnuson (WA)
December 6, 1980 - January 4, 1981
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
97th Congress (1981-1983)
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 5, 1981 - January 2, 1983
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
98th Congress (1983-1985)
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 3, 1983 - January 2, 1985
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
99th Congress (1985-1987)
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 3, 1985 - January 5, 1987
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
100th Congress (1987-1989)
John C. Stennis (MS)
January 6, 1987 - January 2, 1989
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
101st Congress (1989-1991)
Robert C. Byrd (WV)
January 3, 1989 - January 2, 1991
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
102nd Congress (1991-1993)
Robert C. Byrd (WV)
January 3, 1991 - January 4, 1993
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
103rd Congress (1993-1995)
Robert C. Byrd (WV)
January 5, 1993 - January 3, 1995
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
104th Congress (1995-1997)
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 4, 1995 - January 6, 1997
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
105th Congress (1997-1999)
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 7, 1997 - January 6, 1999
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
106th Congress (1999-2001)
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 7, 1999-January 3, 2001
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
107th Congress (2001-2003)
Robert C. Byrd (WV)
January 3, 2001 - January 20, 2001
Strom Thurmond (SC)
January 20, 2001-June 6, 2001
Robert C. Byrd (WV)
June 6, 2001 - January 3, 2003
Note: From January 3 to January 20, 2001 the Democrats held the majority, due to the deciding vote of outgoing Democratic Vice President Al Gore. Senator Robert C. Byrd became president pro tempore at that time. Starting January 20, 2001, the incoming Republican Vice President Richard Cheney held the deciding vote, giving the majority to the Republicans. Senator Strom Thurmond resumed his role as president pro tempore. On May 24, 2001, Senator James Jeffords of Vermont announced his switch from Republican to Independent status, effective June 6, 2001. Jeffords announced that he would caucus with the Democrats, changing control of the evenly divided Senate from the Republicans to the Democrats. On June 6, 2001, Robert C. Byrd once again became president pro tempore. On that day, the Senate adopted S. Res. 103, designating Senator Thurmond as President Pro Tempore Emeritus.
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
108th Congress (2003-2005)
Theodore (Ted) Stevens (AK)
Tenure: January 3, 2003 - January 3, 2005
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
109th Congress (2005-2007)
Theodore (Ted) Stevens (AK)
Tenure: January 4, 2005 - January 4, 2007
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------
110th Congress (2007-2009)
Robert C. Byrd (WV)
Tenure: January 4, 2007 -
--------------------------------------------------------------------------------