Commissioner | Term (ending October 26) |
---|---|
(CH = Chairman) | (* Recess Appointment) |
Richard O. Simpson (CH) | May 14, 1973 - October 1975 Served until June 1, 1976 |
Lawrence M. Kushner | May 14, 1973 - October 1976 Served until October 21, 1977 |
Constance B. Newman | May 14, 1973 - October 1978 Resigned February 26, 1976 |
Barbara Hackman Franklin | May 14, 1973 - October 1979 Resigned February 18, 1979 |
R. David Pittle | October 10, 1973 - October 1977 October 1977 - October 1982 (Reappointment) Resigned October 1, 1982 |
S. John Byington (CH) | June 2, 1976 - October 1978 Resigned June 30, 1978 |
Thaddeus Garrett, Jr. | November 18, 1976 - October 1977 * Resigned October 14, 1977 |
Susan B. King (CH) | March 6, 1978 - October 1984 Named Chairman July 1, 1978 Resigned January 31, 1981 |
Edith Barksdale Sloan | March 20, 1978 - October 1983 Served until November 18, 1983 |
Samuel D. Zagoria | November 10, 1978 - October 1985 Resigned January 22, 1984 |
Stuart M. Statler | August 13, 1979 - October 1986 Resigned June 1, 1986 |
Nancy Harvey Steorts (CH) | August 4, 1981 - October 1984 Served until December 30, 1984 |
Terrence Scanlon (CH) | March 30, 1983 - October 1989 December 31, 1984 - December 20, 1985 (* CH) Named Chairman July 17, 1986 Resigned January 3, 1989 |
Saundra Brown Armstrong | November 22, 1983 - October 1990 Resigned August 8, 1986 |
Carol G. Dawson | July 6, 1984 - November 20, 1985 * Confirmed March 5, 1985 November 21, 1985 - October 1992 (Reappointment) Served until October 27, 1993 |
Anne Graham | December 27, 1985 - October 1991 Served until December 9, 1991 |
Jacqueline Jones-Smith (CH) | November 27, 1989 - October 1996 Resigned October 8, 1994 |
Mary Sheila Gall | December 9, 1991 - October 20, 1998 Served until July 6, 1999 July 7, 1999 - October 2005 (Reappointment) Resigned October 1, 2004 |
Ann Brown (CH) | March 10, 1994 - October 1999 October 27, 1999 - October 2006 (Reappointment) Resigned November 1, 2001 |
Thomas Hill Moore | May 1, 1995 - October, 1996 October 1996 - October 2003 (Reappointment) November 2, 2001 - August 1, 2002 (Acting CH) Confirmed May 21, 2004 March 3, 2004 - October, 2010 (Reappointment) |
Harold Stratton (CH) | August 2, 2002 - October 2006 Resigned July 15, 2006 |
Nancy Nord | May 12, 2005 - October 2005 Confirmed April 28, 2005 October 2005 - October 2012 (Reappointment) July 16, 2006 - Present (Acting CH) |