Captain John Stuart, 7th Infantry - March 1833 to June 1834
(Troops withdrawn June 16, 1834; re-occupied July 27, 1838.)
Captain B.L.E Bonneville, 7th Infantry - July 1838 to October 1838
Captain W.G. Belknap, 3rd Infantry - October 1838 to September 1840
Captain W.W. Lear, 4th Infantry - September 1840 to September 1842
Captain William Hoffman, 6th Infantry - September 1842 to May 1843
Captain J.D. Searight, 6th Infantry - May 1843 to November 1843
Captain William Hoffman, 6th Infantry - November 1843 to August 1845
Captain B.L.E. Bonneville, 6th Infantry - August 1845 to December 1845
Captain William Hoffman, 6th Infantry - December 1845 to January 1846
Captain B.L.E. Bonneville, 6th Infantry - January 1846 to July 1846
Captain E.B Alexander, A.Q.M. - July 1846 to October 1846
Lieut. J.W.B. Gardiner, 1st Dragoons - October 1846 to May 1847
Lieut. F.F. Flint, 6th Infantry - May 1847 to November 1848
Captain C.C. Sibley, 5th Infantry - November 1848 to July 1850
(Troops withdrawn July 2, 1850; re-occupied March 1, 1851.)
Captain C.C. Sibley, 5th Infantry - March 1851 to June 1851
Captain R.C. Gatlin, 7th Infantry - June 1851 to May 1852
Col. Henry Wilson, 7th Infantry - May 1852 to October 1852
Major George Andrews, 7th Infantry - October 1852 to May 1853
Col. Henry Wilson, 7th Infantry - May 1853 to July 1853
Captain H.I. Hunt, 2nd Artillery - July 1853 to August 1853
Captain T.H. Holmes, 7th Infantry - August 1853 to October 1853
Lieut. Franklin Gardner, 7th Infantry - October 1853 to November 1853
Col. Henry Wilson, 7th Infantry - November 1853 to May 1855
Lieut. J.H. Potter, 7th Infantry - May 5, 1855 to May 22, 1855
Captain S.G. French, A.Q.M. - May 1855 to December 1855
Captain R.C. Gatlin, 7th Infantry - December 1855 to January 1856
Major Isaac Linde, 7th Infantry - January 1856 to March 1856
Captain R.C. Gatlin, 7th Infantry - March 1856 to December 1856
Major Isaac Linde, 7th Infantry - December 1856 to June 1857
Captain R.C. Gatlin, 7th Infantry - June 1857 to August 1857
Captain LaFayette McLaws, 7th Infantry - August 1857 to Septemer 1857
Captain S.G. Simmons, 7th Infantry - September 1857 to February 1858
Lieut. E.J. Brooks, 7th Infantry - February 1858 to March 1858
Captain D.D. Sackett, 1st Cavalry - March 1858 to June 1859
Captain W.W. Burns, Comm'y Sut. - June 1859 to July 1859
Captain E.W. Crittenden, 1st Cavalry - July 1859 to September 1859
Captain S.D. Sturgis, 1st Cavalry - September 1859 to April 1861
(U.S. Troops withdrawn April 23, 1861; re-occupied September 1, 1863.)
Captain W.W. Cloud, 1st Kansas Cavalry - Sept. 1863 to December 1863
Col. John Edwards, 18th Iowa Infantry - Dec. 1863 to March 21, 1864
Lieut. Col. A.W. Bishop, 1st Ark. Cavalry - March 1864 to May 1864
Col. W.R. Judson, 6th Kansas Cavalry - May 1864 to June 1865
Lieut. Col. J.B. Wheeler, 12th Kansas Infantry - Jan. 1865 to Feb. 1865
Brig. Gen. Cyrus Bussey, U.S. Volunteers - Feb. 1865 to Sept. 1865
Col. M.M. Trumbull, 9th Iowa Cavalry - Sept. 1865 to Feb. 1866
Col. Paul Harwood, 57th U.S.C.T. - February 1866 to May 1866
Captain R.W. Barnard, 19th U.S. Infantry - May 1866 to September 1866
Captain S.S. Culberson, 19th U.S. Infantry - Sept. 1866 to Nov. 1866
Captain William John Lyster, 19th U.S. Infantry - Nov. 1866 to Jan. 1867
Captain J.B. Mulligan, 19th U.S. Infantry - January 1867 to February 1867
Col. D.F. Jones, 19th U.S. Infantry - February 1867 to October 1867
Lieut. Col. P. Lugenbeel, 19th U.S. Infantry - October 1867 to April 1969
Captain John J. Upham, 6th U.S. Infantry - April 1869 to June 1869
Captain Montgomery Bryant, 6th U.S. Infantry - June 1869 to Nov. 1870
1st Lieut. F.W. Thibaut, 6th U.S. Infantry - Nov. 1870 to Jan. 1870
Captain Montgomery Bryant, 6th U.S. Infantry - January 1871 to July 1871
1st Lieut. F.W. Thibaut, 6th U.S. Infantry - July 1871 to September 1871
U.S. Troops were finally withdrawn September 1871, and the military reservation was relinquished to the Interior Department for disposition, under act of Congress, approved February 14th, 1871, by War Department Letter of March 24th, 1871.