Press Release- Aug 29, 2007
OFFICE OF GOV. BILL RITTER, JR.
FOR IMMEDIATE RELEASE
WEDNESDAY, AUG. 29, 2007
CONTACT: Evan Dreyer, 720.350.8370
GOV. RITTER NAMES 30 COLORADANS TO VARIOUS STATEWIDE BOARDS AND COMMISSIONS
Gov. Bill Ritter today announced that he has named more than 30 Coloradans to a variety of statewide boards and commissions. For more information about Colorado boards and commissions, or to obtain an application, visit the Boards and Commissions website, e-mail boards@state.co.us, or call 303.866.6380.
Colorado Banking Board
Gov. Ritter has nominated the following people to the nine-member Colorado Banking Board, all for terms expiring July 1, 2011, with Senate confirmation required:
Stephen A. Sherlock of Lamar (re-appointed)
Dan R. Ford of Bayfield
Rick Padilla of Greenwood Village
Adam P. Coyle of Parker
Economic Development Commission
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following people to the nine-member Economic Development Commission, all for terms expiring at the pleasure of the Governor:
William T. Sisson of Grand Junction (re-appointed)
Wellington E. Webb of Denver;
Brent Orr of Wray
Richard L. Monfort of Greeley (re-appointed)
Don Elliman, director of the Colorado Office of Economic Development and International Trade
Board of Trustees for Western State College of Colorado
Gov. Ritter has nominated the following person to the 11-member Board of Trustees for Western State College of Colorado, with Senate confirmation required:
Sandra L. Mark of Gunnison, for a term expiring Dec. 31, 2009
Board of Trustees for The University of Northern Colorado
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following person to the nine-member Board of Trustees for the University of Northern Colorado:
Darlene J. LeDoux of Lakewood, for a term expiring Dec. 31, 2007, to fill the vacancy left by the resignation of Gary M. Reiff of Englewood
Higher Education Competitive Research Authority Board of Directors
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following person to the Higher Education Competitive Research Authority Board of Directors:
David Skaggs, executive director of the Colorado Department of Higher Education, for a term expiring Aug. 21, 2011
State Capitol Building Advisory Committee
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following people to the 12-member State Capitol Building Advisory Committee, all for terms expiring July 1, 2009:
Richard G. Weingardt of Denver (re-appointed)
Diann L. Sill of Central City (re-appointed)
Georgianna Contiguglia of Denver
Correctional Industries Advisory Committee
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following people to the 11-member Correctional Industries Advisory Committee, all for terms expiring Sept. 18, 2010:
A. Neal Hall of Penrose
Douglas S. Snyder of Canon City
Regional Air Quality Council
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following person to the 14-member Regional Air Quality Council:
The Hon. Bennet Manvel of Fort Collins, for a term expiring at the pleasure of the Governor
Colorado Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing
Gov. Ritter has nominated the following people to the seven-member Colorado Commission for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing, with Senate confirmation required:
Shelley J. Strickfaden of Morrison, for a term expiring July 1, 2008
Joseph M. Benedetto of Northglenn, for a term expiring July 1, 2010 (re-appointed)
NancyJean B. Eubanks of Denver, for a term expiring July 1, 2010
Deborah G. Mohney of Boulder, for a term expiring July 1, 2010 (re-appointed)
Board of Landscape Architects
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following people to the five-member Board of Landscape Architects:
Jennifer D. Staroska-McCoy of Denver, for a term expiring Aug. 4, 2009
James F. Ramos of Lafayette, for a term expiring Aug. 4, 2010
Todd Williams of Morrison, for a term expiring Aug. 4, 2010
Ted J. Ciavonne of Grand Junction, for a term expiring Aug. 4, 2011
Heather E. Jones of Denver, for a term expiring Aug. 4, 2010
Mined Land Reclamation Board
Gov. Ritter has nominated the following people to the seven-member Mined Land Reclamation Board, all for terms expiring March 1, 2011, with Senate confirmation required:
Ira J. Paulin of Holly (re-appointed)
Barbara Green of Denver
Ray E. Peterson of La Salle
Colorado Health Facilities Authority Board of Directors
Gov. Ritter has nominated the following people to the seven-member Colorado Health Facilities Authority Board of Directors, all for terms expiring June 30, 2011, with Senate confirmation required:
Ann C. Kiley of Denver (re-appointed)
George "Skip" Gray III of Denver
Governor's Advisory Council for Persons With Disabilities
Gov. Ritter has appointed the following person to the Governor's Advisory Council for Persons With Disabilities, for a term expiring at the pleasure of the Governor:
State Rep. Morgan L. Carroll of Aurora