Press Release - CCHE and Other Appointments
OFFICE OF GOV. BILL RITTER, JR.
FOR IMMEDIATE RELEASE
TUESDAY, JULY 15, 2008
CONTACT:
Evan Dreyer, 720.350.8370, evan.dreyer@state.co.us
GOV. RITTER NAMES NEW MEMBERS TO CCHE AND OTHER BOARDS
Gov. Bill Ritter announced today he has appointed Barbara J. Scott of Colorado Springs to the Colorado Commission on Higher Education, and named several other Coloradans to a variety of boards and commissions.
Scott is president and CEO of Peak Vista Community Health Centers. Prior to that, she worked for the Grand Rapids Area Chamber of Commerce in Michigan as a program manager and then as executive director of Leadership Grand Rapids, an umbrella program designed to develop individual leadership skills within the community. Scott obtained her B.A. from Luther College in Iowa, and in 1992 graduated from the Johnson and Johnson Healthcare Executive Program at the UCLA Anderson Graduate School of Management.
The 11-member Colorado Commission on Higher Education sets policies for all state-supported institutions of higher education. Terms are for four years, and Senate confirmation is required.
Gov. Ritter also announced several other appointments today:
State Board of Nursing
Deborah L. Archuleta of Pueblo
Candace E. Berardinelli of Littleton
Curtis Powells of Aurora
Toni Gibbons of Highlands Ranch
Archuleta fills a vacancy caused by the resignation of Sharon Pappas of Arvada, and her term expires July 1, 2009. Terms for the other three appointees expire July 1, 2011.
State Board of Pharmacy
Mary K. Arceneaux of Cortez, for a term expiring July 1, 2012.
Denver Metropolitan Football Stadium District Board of Directors
Joy S. Burns of Englewood and Roy Palmer of Highlands Ranch, reappointed to terms expiring May 23, 2012.
Statewide Internet Portal Authority
Jack R. Arrowsmith of Castle Rock, reappointed to a term expiring June 1, 2012.