Upon the signing of the Social Security Act on August 14, 1935,
a three-person Social Security Board was created to run the new
program. Although one member was designated
as the Chairman, all three members had equal status and each had
one vote in Board decisions. The first Chairman of the Board
was John Winant (a former Governor of New Hampshire). Winant was
Chairman from August 1935 until February 1937. Arthur J. Altmeyer
became Chairman of the Board in 1937, until 1946. In 1946 a reorganization
took place and the Social Security Board was replaced by the Social
Security Administration (SSA), with a single Commissioner as head
of the SSA. Arthur J. Altmeyer, the incumbent Chairman of the Board,
became the first Commissioner of Social Security. (See
information on Social Security Commissioners.)
Member
|
Term of Service
|
|
From
|
To
|
|
August 23, 1935*
November 16, 1936
|
September 30, 1936
February 19, 1937
|
|
August 23, 1935* (Member)
September 30, 1936 (Acting Chairman)
February 19, 1937 (Chairman)
|
September 30, 1936
November 16, 1936
July 16, 1946
|
|
August 23, 1935*
|
August 14, 1937
|
|
August 6, 1937*
|
July 16, 1946
|
|
August 18, 1937*
|
December 10, 1938
|
|
December 30, 1938
|
July 16, 1946
|
* Confirmed by Senate
|
|
|
|