|
|
|
Members in Prior Congresses (2005-2006)
Use the drop down menu below to view membership information for a particular Congress.
committee Members in the 109th Congress |
SHERWOOD L. BOEHLERT (New York), Chairman
Republican Members |
- Ralph M. Hall , Texas
- Lamar S. Smith, Texas
- Curt Weldon, Pennsylvania
- Dana Rohrabacher, California
- Ken Calvert, California
- Roscoe G. Bartlett, Maryland
- Vernon J. Ehlers, Michigan
- Gil Gutknecht, Minnesota
- Frank D. Lucas, Oklahoma
- Judy Biggert , Illinois
- Wayne T. Gilchrest, Maryland
- W. Todd Akin, Missouri
|
-
Timothy V. Johnson, Illinois
-
J. Randy Forbes, Virginia
-
Jo Bonner, Alabama
-
Tom Feeney, Florida
-
Randy Neugebauer, Texas
-
Bob Inglis, South Carolina
-
David G. Reichert, Washington
-
Michael E. Sodrel, Indiana
-
John J.H. "Joe" Schwarz, Michigan
-
Michael T. McCaul, Texas
-
Mario Diaz-Balart, Flordia
|
BART GORDON (Tennessee), Ranking Democratic Member |
- Jerry F. Costello, Illinois
- Eddie Bernice Johnson, Texas
- Lynn C. Woolsey, California
- Darlene Hooley, Oregon
- Mark Udall, Colorado
- David Wu, Oregon
- Michael M. Honda, California
- Brad Miller, North Carolina
- Lincoln Davis, Tennessee
- Daniel Lipinski, Illinois
|
|
- (January 6, 2005) Mr. Gordon chosen Ranking Member (H. Res. 33)
- (January 26, 2005) Members appointed (H. Res. 49).
- (February 3, 2005) Additional Members appointed. Ms. Hooley reclaimed her seniority following service on the Budget Committee. (H. Res. 62).
- (February 16, 2005) Ms. Lofgren resigned from the Committee.
- (June 8, 2005) Mr. Moore appointed to the Committee (H. Res. 307).
- (February 16, 2006) Mr. Carnahan resigned from the Committee to serve on the Committee on International Relations.
- (May 4, 2006) Ms. Matsui appointed to the Committee (H. Res. 796).
|
SUBCOMMITTEE ON RESEARCH |
Bob Inglis, Chairman |
- Mr. Smith
- Mr. Weldon
- Ms. Rohrabacher
- Mr. Gutknecht
- Mr. Lucas
- Mr. Akin
|
- Mr. Johnson
- Mr. Reichert
- Mr. Sodrel
- Mr. McCaul
- (Vacancy)
- Mr. Boehlert
|
Darlene Hooley, Ranking Democratic Member |
|
|
SUBCOMMITTEE ON SPACE AND AERONAUTICS |
Ken Calvert , Chairman |
- Mr. Hall
- Mr. Smith
- Ms. Rohrabacher
- Mr. Bartlett
- Mr. Lucas
- Mr. Forbes
|
- Mr. Bonner
- Mr. Feeney
- Mr. McCaul
- Mr. Diaz-Balart
- Mr. Boehlert
|
Mark Udall, Ranking Democratic Member |
|
|
SUBCOMMITTEE ON ENVIRONMENT, TECHNOLOGY AND STANDARDS |
Vernon J. Ehlers, Chairman |
- Mr. Gutknecht
- Ms. Biggert
- Mr. Gilchrest
- Mr. Johnson
|
- Mr. Reichert
- Mr. Schwarz
- Mr. Diaz-Balart
- Mr. Boehlert
|
David Wu, Ranking Democratic Member |
|
|
SUBCOMMITTEE ON ENERGY |
Judy Biggert, Chairman |
- Mr. Hall
- Mr. Weldon
- Mr. Bartlett
- Mr. Ehlers
- Mr. Akin
- Mr. Bonner
|
- Mr. Inglis
- Mr. Reichert
- Mr. Sodrel
- Mr. Schwarz
- Mr. Neugebauer
- Mr. Boehlert
|
Michael M. Honda, Ranking Democratic Member |
|
|
|
|
|
|